Gieseke et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy C. Gieseke and Donald Gieseke
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04772
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 9, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Dorothy C. Gieseke, Donald Gieseke. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/5/2016 at 2:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; GRANTING MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 27 Motion to Dismiss; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss; denying 30 Request for Attorneys' Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 30 MOTION filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.; 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.; 27 MOTION to Dismiss F irst Amended Complaint filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Denied as moot: 37 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
February 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DENYING MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; denying 8 Motion for Hearing; granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARINGS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.; 8 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens; Attorneys' Fees filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.; 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gieseke et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy C. Gieseke
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Gieseke
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Claire Y. Dossier
Represented By: Brian Stratton Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Claire Y. Dossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Claire Y. Dossier
Represented By: Brian Stratton Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?