Olvera v. Driven Sports, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shantell Olvera
Defendant: Driven Sports, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04830
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (115 in 3:13-cv-04830-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Entire Action filed by Melvin Bishop, Bryan Noffsinger, Henry Chorlian II, Julian Kadarian, Duong Le, Jeff Crites, William Hall Jr, Marcus Wagner, James Ventre Jr., Shantell Olvera, Roberto Iriondo, Mark Wolfe, Erik Sickinger. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/7/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset from 9/3/2015 to 11/10/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 For Dismissal (as to Bodybuilding only) filed by James Ventre Jr. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 73 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Continuing Hearing Date to November 4, 2014) filed by Melvin Bishop, etc. Responses due by 10/7/2014. Replies due by 10/17/2014. Motion Hearing reset for 11/4/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Permitting Plaintiffs to File the Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by General Nutrition Center, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/8/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production of Confidential, Proprietary, or Private Information filed by Melvin Bishop, Bryan Noffsinger, Henry Chorlian II, Julian Kadarian, Duong Le, Jeff Crites, William Hall Jr, Marcus Wagner, James Ventre Jr., Shantell Olvera, Roberto Iriondo, Mark Wolfe, Erik Sickinger. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (34 in 3:13-cv-05239-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on Leadership Structure and Guidelines to Limit Costs and Expenses filed by Marcus Wagner. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/14. All future filings shall be filed under Case C13-4830 EMC (lead consolidated case). (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration by Driven Sports, Inc. filed by Driven Sports, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olvera v. Driven Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantell Olvera
Represented By: Jordan L. Chaikin
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driven Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?