Dodson et al v. Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dodson, Alvin Todd, Henry Thompson, Mary Thompson, Brian Stone, Robbie Simmons, Thomas Comiskey, Toni Kibbee, Rosemarie Valdez, Louis Pace, Tina White, Johnny Martinez, Keith Hawkins and Patricia Kaufman
Defendant: Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. and Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv04984
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEVER AND TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 291 Motion to Sever. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 286 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 145 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 227 Motion to Strike ; denying 228 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO STRIKE re 228 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Susan Kegley filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.; 227 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Michael DiBartolomeis filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Motion Hearings set for 8/18/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 213 Motion for Clarification re: 191 Discovery Minute Order. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER TO REFILE DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEALre 207 Declaration in Support, filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 187 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify the June 8, 2015 Scheduling Order filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 160 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS re 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 8, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SCHEDULING ORDER re 154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 152 Motion Hearing on Third Amended Complaint Briefing Schedule and Remaining Briefing on Class Certification filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 130 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 149 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 131 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Alan Kaufman, Toni Kibbee, Diane Kucharski, Ericka Anderson, Tina White, Robbie Simmons, Kurt Anderson, Julie Davidoff, Jerry Kucharski, Melody Todd, Tracey Palmer, Sara Stone, Keith Hawkins, Thomas Comiskey, Brian Stone, Patricia Kaufman, Johnny Martinez, Alvin Todd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 9, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER In Regard to Page Limitations Associated with Motion for Class Certification filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 3, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 112 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ECF NO. 110) filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 20, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Discovery Order re: 102 MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/6/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re 102 MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/2/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER RE: MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY re 102 MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Discovery Order re: 99 Joint Discovery Letter Brief ON COMPELLING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF CHEMICAL FORMULATION/INGREDIENTS INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/2/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE DISCOVERY REFERRAL re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/21/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Terminating as Moot: 83 MOTION Modify October 20, 2014 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DISCOVERY ORDER re 82 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re Clarification of November 17, 2014 Discovery Order filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DISCOVERY ORDER re 79 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Alan Kaufman, Toni Kibbee, Diane Kucharski, Ericka Anderson, Tina White, Robbie Simmons, Kurt Anderson, Julie Davidoff, Jerry Kucharski, Melody Todd, Tracey Palmer, Sara Stone, Keith Hawkins, Thomas Comiskey, Brian Stone, Patricia Kaufman, Johnny Martinez, Alvin Todd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 56 Case Management Scheduling Order; Stipulation and Order to Modify the June 4, 2014, Scheduling Order filed by Alan Kaufman, Toni Kibbee, Diane Kucharski, Ericka And erson, Tina White, Robbie Simmons, Kurt Anderson, Julie Davidoff, Jerry Kucharski, Melody Todd, Tracey Palmer, Sara Stone, Keith Hawkins, Thomas Comiskey, Brian Stone, Patricia Kaufman, Johnny Martinez, Alvin Todd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 73 Stipulation filed by Debra Evangelista. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 71 Stipulation filed by Barbara Warren, Joseph Saline. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 66 Stipulation, filed by Alan Kaufman, Toni Kibbee, Diane Kucharski, Ericka Anderson, Tina White, Robbie Simmons, Kurt Anderson, Barbara Warren, Julie Davidoff, Jerry Kucharski, Debra Evangelista, Melody Todd, Joseph Saline, Tracey Palmer, Sara Stone, Keith Hawkins, Thomas Comiskey, Brian Stone, Patricia Kaufman, Johnny Martinez, Alvin Todd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 64 Stipulation filed by Diane Pace, Louis Pace, Rosemarie Valdez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 Stipulation, filed by Toni Kibbee, Louis Pace, Tina White, Robbie Simmons, Thomas Comiskey, Rosemarie Valdez, Brian Stone, Patricia Kaufman, Keith Hawkins, Alvin Todd, Johnny Martinez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Toni Kibbee, Louis Pace, Henry Thompson, Tina White, Robbie Simmons, Thomas Comiskey, Rosemarie Valdez, Brian Stone, Ma ry Thompson, Patricia Kaufman, Keith Hawkins, Michael Dodson, Johnny Martinez, Alvin Todd. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 18 Motion to Dismiss; denying 19 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 19 MOTION to Strike 4 Amended Complaint, filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc., 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO FEBRUARY 6, 2014 AND FOR DEFENDANTS' REPLIES TO FEBRUARY 19, 2014 re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Michael Dodson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/6/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson et al v. Tempur-Sealy International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dodson
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Todd
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Thompson
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Thompson
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Stone
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Simmons
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Comiskey
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Kibbee
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Valdez
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Pace
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina White
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Martinez
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hawkins
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kaufman
Represented By: Allen Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempur-Sealy International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?