Jacqueline Benjamin, et al.-v-B & H Education, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Benjamin, Bryan Gonzalez and Taiwo Koyejo
Defendant: B & H Education, Inc., Rashed Elyas, Michael Flecker and Nagui Elyas
Case Number: 3:2013cv04993
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING 108 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by B & H Education, Inc.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/3/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 81 Stipulation Re Summary Judgment Briefing and Deadlines.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 72 Stipulation Regarding Schedule for Filing Cross Motions for Summary Judgment.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 70 Stipulation of Dismissal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 68 Stipulation Regarding Discovery.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 65 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 59 Stipulation to Extend Time to Amend the Pleadings.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 56 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss.(vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 33 Stipulation selecting Private Mediation.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Enlargement Of Time To File Case Management Statement filed by Rashed Elyas, B & H Education, Inc., Nagui Elyas, Michael Flecker. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/30/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 6 Proposed Order filed by Taiwo Koyejo, Jacqueline Benjamin, Bryan Gonzalez Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/9/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacqueline Benjamin, et al.-v-B & H Education, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Benjamin
Represented By: Leon Greenberg
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Gonzalez
Represented By: Leon Greenberg
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taiwo Koyejo
Represented By: Leon Greenberg
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & H Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashed Elyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Flecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagui Elyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?