Slack et al v. International Union of Operating Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza and David Slack
Defendant: Kevin J. Albanese, Perry Artates, Associated Third Party Administrators, Michael Brandt, III, James T. Callahan, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, Mike Croll, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Justin Diston, Dennis Dorton, Robert Doud, Mark Fitzgerald, Michael Gallagher, Vincent Giblin, Chad Goodfellow, Jim Graham, Stanley Green, Steve Harris, Robert T. Heenan, Phillip Herring, Brian E. Hickey, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 3, International Union of Operating Engineers, Gary Iwamoto, Michael J. Johnson, Walt Johnson, Jerry Kalmar, Rodger Kaminska, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Daren Konopaski, Andrew Lagosh, Greg Lalevee, Leonard Leong, Ronald McClain, Terrance E. McGowan, Daniel J. McGraw, Pane Meatoga, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, OE Federal Credit Union, OE Hawaiian Industry Stabilaztion Fund, Ronald Oshiro, Bradley Parres, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Louis G. Rasetta, Peter Robb, Patrick L. Sink, Luther Slack, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain, Jim Sullivan, James M. Sweeney, Kathleen Thurston, Nate Tucker, William C. Waggoner, Larry Watson, Lance Wilhelm and Corey Yamashita
Petitioner: Greg Scher
Respondent: Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Ingersoll and Dan Reding
Not Classified By Court: Amalgamated Bank
3Rd Party Defendant: Fred Herschbach
Case Number: 3:2013cv05001
Filed: October 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Filing 358 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Vacate Joint Bill of Costs (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 357 CLERK'S Letter Spreading #356 Mandate to Counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER of USCA granting motion for voluntary dismissal as to #344 Notice of Appeal, filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 19, 2016 Filing 355 Costs Taxed in the amount of $48,580.84, Re: ECF No. 351, against Plaintiffs. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: #352 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 1/26/2017. Replies due by 2/16/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/17/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 353 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #351 Bill of Costs, #352 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 352 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/21/2016. Replies due by 11/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie Vol. I, #3 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie Vol. II, #4 Declaration of Kenneth C. Absalom, #5 Proposed Order)(Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 351 BILL OF COSTS Jointly Submitted by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. Objections due by 11/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 25, 2016 Filing 350 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lee A. Weiss (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #340 Administrative Motion to take the Deposition of Debbie S. Morgan in connection with the motion for attorneys' fees. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 348 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-7-16, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #345 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017. (Related documents(s) #345 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 347 USCA Case Number 16-16524 for #344 Notice of Appeal filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
August 31, 2016 Filing 346 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on July 7, 2016 before Judge Edward M. Chen, (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 31, 2016 Filing 345 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 7, 2016 before Edward M. Chen by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 29, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. Appeal of Judgment #336 (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-10724562.) CORRECTION OF DOCUMENT #343 (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 8/29/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-16524)
August 29, 2016 Filing 343 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. Appeal of Judgment #336 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10724562 paid.) (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Westmore for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/23/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 341 RESPONSE (re #340 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Take Deposition of Debbie S. Morgan Pursuant To Previously Issued Deposition Subpoena ) filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant, Esq.)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 15, 2016 Filing 340 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Take Deposition of Debbie S. Morgan Pursuant To Previously Issued Deposition Subpoena filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. Responses due by 8/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie, #2 Declaration of George R. Nemiroff, #3 Proposed Order)(Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #338 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO BRING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND BILL OF COSTS filed by Richard Piombo, Thomas Holsman, F. G. Crosthwaite, Kevin J. Albanese, John M. Humber. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 338 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO BRING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND BILL OF COSTS filed by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 337 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating all dates. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 336 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #333 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO BRING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES filed by Richard Piombo, Thomas Holsman, F. G. Crosthwaite, Kevin J. Albanese, John M. Humber. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 334 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to July 20, 2016 Order by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 333 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO BRING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES filed by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding #326 7/11/16 and #328 7/14/16 Discovery Letter Briefs regarding third party Deborah Morgan's availability for deposition. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER Granting #268 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying as Moot #259 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication (PUBLIC/REDACTED VERSION). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen GRANTING Defendant's #268 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's #259 Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication (filed UNDER SEAL). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2016 Filing 329 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Mark Moore (Moore, James) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 14, 2016 Filing 328 Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Defendants' Discovery Letter to Judge Westmore [Docket No. 326] filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen vacating hearing and deferring ruling on #311 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 11, 2016 Filing 326 Letter from Defendants to Hon. Kandis A. Westmore . (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 8, 2016 Filing 325 Declaration of J. Mark Moore in Support of #311 Corrected MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David S. Blitzstein, #324 Reply to Opposition/Response, SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF J. MARK MOORE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT DAVID S. BLITZSTEIN filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) #311 , #324 ) (Moore, James) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 8, 2016 Filing 324 REPLY (re #311 Corrected MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David S. Blitzstein ) PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT DAVID S. BLITZSTEIN filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 7, 2016 Filing 323 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2016 (Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Total Time in Court 1 hour 30 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Wyatt. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re #292 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and #303 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 1, 2016 Filing 321 RESPONSE (re #311 Corrected MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David S. Blitzstein ) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT DAVID S. BLITZSTEIN filed byRussell E. Burns, Carl Goff, Dan Reding. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Blitzstein, #2 Declaration of George R. Nemiroff)(Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 320 ERRATA re #319 Declaration in Support, of Motion to Seal by Amalgamated Bank. (Guite, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 319 Declaration of James T. Freel in Support of #315 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #314 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAmalgamated Bank. (Related document(s) #315 , #314 ) (Guite, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 318 Declaration of James T. Freel in Support of #315 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #314 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAmalgamated Bank. (Related document(s) #315 , #314 ) (Guite, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 28, 2016 Filing 317 NOTICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack re #315 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #313 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , CONFIRMING COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S ORDERS [DKT. NOS. 313, 315] (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 316 NOTICE by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo re #314 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND PROOF OF SERVICE (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re #303 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re #292 Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #258 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 21, 2016 Filing 312 Declaration of David A. Rosenfeld in Response re #303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers. (Babu, Shaamini) (Filed on 6/21/2016) Modified on 6/22/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2016 Filing 311 Corrected MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David S. Blitzstein filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/1/2016. Replies due by 7/8/2016. (Moore, James) (Filed on 6/17/2016) Modified on 6/20/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2016 Filing 310 Declaration of J. Mark Moore in Support of #309 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Defendants' Expert David S. Blitzstein filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) #309 ) (Moore, James) (Filed on 6/17/2016) Modified on 6/20/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2016 Filing 309 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT DAVID S. BLITZSTEIN filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/1/2016. Replies due by 7/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, James) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 308 Brief re #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, #269 Brief, SEARCHABLE PDF Copy of ECF 269 submitted upon Court instruction filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 , #269 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 307 Declaration of Monica R. Briseno in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, #306 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 , #306 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 306 REPLY (re #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 14, 2016 Filing 305 REPLY (re #303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 304 RESPONSE (re #303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Joint Opposition and Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica R. Briseno In Support of Defendants Joint Opposition and Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Stipulation regarding Exhibit ZZZ, #4 Declaration, #5 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Combined Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Adjudication and in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Redacted, Filed Version of Plaintiffs Combined Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Adjudication and in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2016 Filing 302 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant in Support of #258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #298 Opposition/Response to Motion, [FILING CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN PUBLIC RECORD AFTER RESCISSION OF "CONFIDENTIAL" DESIGNATION] filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) #258 , #298 ) (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 301 Declaration of J. MARK MOORE in Support of #298 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) #298 ) (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 300 Declaration of EXPERT WITNESS PROFESSOR RICHARD PUNTILLO in Support of #298 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) #298 ) (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 299 Declaration of Lee A. Weiss in Support of #298 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) #298 ) (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 298 RESPONSE (re #259 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudiation of Issue, #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ) [REDACTED VERSION] filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part #294 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Set Expert Deposition or, in the Alternative, to Modify Briefing Schedule. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 19, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #259 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudiation of Issue; #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 296 RESPONSE (re #294 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Adjust Summary Judgment Motion Schedule, or, in the alternative, Set Expert Witness Deposition Date re #266 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George R. Nemiroff in Support of Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion)(Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER regarding Debbie Morgan's May 23, 2016 Deposition. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/17/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 294 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Adjust Summary Judgment Motion Schedule, or, in the Alternative, Set Expert Witness Deposition Date re #266 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. Responses due by 5/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lee Weiss in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 5/16/2016) Modified on 5/17/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2016 Filing 293 ERRATA re #262 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 292 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 7, 9-11 of McKenzie Declaration in support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED version of Exhibits, #4 UNREDACTED version of Exhibits)(McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 291 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie (Volume III) in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, #269 Brief, #289 Declaration in Support, #288 Declaration in Support, with identified exhibits redacted to be filed under seal filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 , #269 , #289 , #288 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 290 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie (Volume 3) in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication with identified exhibits redacted to be filed under seal filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 289 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie (Volume 2) in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication with identified exhibits redacted to be filed under seal filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 288 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie (Volume 1) in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication with identified exhibits redacted to be filed under seal filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 287 Declaration of Greg Trento (Volume 3) in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 286 Declaration of Greg Trento (Volume 2) in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 285 Declaration of Greg Trento (Volume 1) in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 284 Declaration of David Blitzstein in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 283 Declaration of Cary Franklin in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 282 Declaration of Richard Piombo in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 281 Declaration of John Humber in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 280 Declaration of Thomas Holsman in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 279 Declaration of F.G. Crosthwaite in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 278 Declaration of Kevin Albanese in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 277 Declaration of Dan Reding in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 276 Declaration of Carl Goff in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 275 Declaration of Russell Burns in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 274 Declaration of Richard Sichel in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 273 Declaration of Scott Whalen in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 272 Declaration of John Wasnock in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 271 Declaration of T. Robert Miller in Support of #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 270 Proposed Order re #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 269 Brief re #268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #268 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 268 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/2/2016. Replies due by 6/9/2016. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #263 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Deposition of Debbie Shank Morgan after Fact Discovery Cutoff filed by Richard Piombo, F. G. Crosthwaite, Kevin J. Albanese, John M. Humber, Thomas Holsman, Carl Goff, Dan Reding, Russell E. Burns. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 7, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #259 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudiation of Issue. Responses due by 5/5/2016. Replies due by 6/2/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part #261 Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time and to Set Briefing Schedule.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 265 RESPONSE (re #261 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Set Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Moore, James) (Filed on 4/5/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2016 Filing 264 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 263 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Deposition of Debbie Shank Morgan after Fact Discovery Cutoff filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/5/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2016 Filing 262 RESPONSE (re #258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Joint Opposition and Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byKevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica R. Briseno In Support of Defendants Joint Opposition and Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 261 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Set Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. Responses due by 4/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/4/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2016 Filing 260 Declaration of Lee A. Weiss in Support of #259 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudiation of Issue filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F, #2 Exhibit G - I, #3 Exhibit J - L, #4 Exhibit M - O, #5 Exhibit P - U, #6 Exhibit V - X, #7 Exhibit Y - Z, #8 Exhibit A2 - C2)(Related document(s) #259 ) (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 259 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudiation of Issue filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/14/2016. Replies due by 4/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration placeholder for Declaration of H. Scott Leviant in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication [see Admin. Motion to File Under Seal - Docket no. 258])(Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant in support of Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal, #3 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication [containing "CONFIDENTIAL" exhibits only - no redaction possible])(Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 29, 2016 Filing 257 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Discovery Hearing held on 3/29/2016.Total Time in Court 50 mins.. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2016)
March 23, 2016 Filing 256 CLERK'S NOTICE- A telephonic conference has been set for March 29, 2016 at 10:00 am. The call-in information remains the same.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #253 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY DEADLINES ONLY filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/23/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 254 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant in Support of #253 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #207 Case Management Scheduling Order,,,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY DEADLINES ONLY filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) #253 ) (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 253 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #207 Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings to Continue Expert Witness Discovery Deadlines Only filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 3/22/2016) Modified on 3/23/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2016 Filing 252 Letter from Defendants Regarding Deposition of Debbie Shank Morgan . (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Discovery Hearing held on 2/17/2016.Total Time in Court 36 minutes. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 250 CLERK'S NOTICE- A telephonic discovery hearing with Magistrate Judge Westmore, will take place on February 17, 2016, at 3:00 pm. Counsel has been e-mailed the call-in information.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) Discovery Hearing set for 2/17/2016 before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 249 Letter from Attorneys for Defendants Burns, Goff, and Reding to Honorable Judge Westmore. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
December 18, 2015 Filing 248 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 12/15/2015. Parties agree to change the jury trial to bench trial. 3-week Bench Trial set for 10/17/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/18/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/19/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/21/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/24/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/25/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/26/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/28/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 10/31/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 11/1/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 11/2/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Bench Trial set for 11/4/2016 08:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. FTR Time 11:19-11:32. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 247 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SECOND filed by Russell E. Burns, Carl Goff, Dan Reding. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding the Parties' #244 11/5/15 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 10, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 244 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Defendants' Request for Leave to Take the Deposition of Debbie Shank Morgan filed by Russell E. Burns, Carl Goff, Dan Reding. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Mark Moore Notice of Change of Firm and Contact Information for Attorney J. Mark Moore (Moore, James) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 242 CLERK'S NOTICE. Status Conference reset from 12/3/2015 to 12/15/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 12/8/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 241 CLERK'S NOTICE. Status Conference reset for 12/3/2015 from 1:30 p.m. to 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 11/25/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 240 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding Defendants' Motion to Depose Debbie Shank Morgan (Docket #235). Parties shall refer to this Court's standing order regarding discovery dispute and shall meet and confer and to file a joint letter by November 5, 2015 if dispute is not resolved. Defendants' motion seeking leave to depose Debbie Shake Morgan (Docket #235) is hereby stricken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 239 REPLY (re #235 MOTION to Take Deposition from Debbie Shank Morgan , Motion Seeking to Leave to Depose ) DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PROCEDURAL OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO DEPOSE DEBBIE SHANK MORGAN (Dkt. 235) FILED IN VIOLATION OF THIS COURTS CIVIL STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY filed byRussell E. Burns, Carl Goff, Dan Reding. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 238 NOTICE of Change of Address by Howard Scott Leviant (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 21, 2015 Filing 237 OBJECTIONS to re #235 MOTION to Take Deposition from Debbie Shank Morgan , Motion Seeking to Leave to Depose PROCEDURAL OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO DEPOSE DEBBIE SHANK MORGAN (Dkt. 235), FILED IN VIOLATION OF THIS COURTS CIVIL STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 236 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Motion Hearing (235) Motion to Take Deposition from Debbie Morgan and Status Conference for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 11/25/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 235 MOTION to Take Deposition from Debbie Shank Morgan , Motion Seeking to Leave to Depose filed by Russell E. Burns, Carl Goff, Dan Reding. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/2/2015. Replies due by 11/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Nemiroff with Exhibits 1-10)(Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 234 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/10/14, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #227 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2015. (Related documents(s) #227 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 15, 2015 Filing 233 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey K Berns (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 15, 2015 Filing 232 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/19/2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, telephone number 415-264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #228 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2015. (Related documents(s) #228 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 231 JUDGMENT as to Defendants IUOE, Callahan and Giblin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #229 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: 54(B) JUDGMENT filed by Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers, James T. Callahan. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 229 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: 54(B) JUDGMENT filed by James T. Callahan, Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 54(B) JUDGMENT, #2 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 54(B))(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by International Union of Operating Engineers for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 3 for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
July 28, 2015 Filing 226 NOTICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLASS ALLEGATIONS (Moore, James) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 225 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Laura Susan Trice (Trice, Laura) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 224 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 7/2/15 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE (Docket #215) pursuant to DEFENDANTS' VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Docket #223. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 223 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANTS' THIRD PARTY (IMPLEADER) COMPLAINT AGAINST FRED HERSHBACH by Russell E. Burns, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Ingersoll, Dan Reding (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #219 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS THE THIRD THROUGH EIGHTH AND TENTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF IN THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/29/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #220 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DATE TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by Fred Herschbach, Steve Ingersoll, Pete Figueiredo, Dan Reding, Carl Goff, Russell E. Burns. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/26/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 220 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DATE TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by Russell E. Burns, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Fred Herschbach, Steve Ingersoll, Dan Reding. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 219 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS THE THIRD THROUGH EIGHTH AND TENTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF IN THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 218 REPLY (re #215 MOTION to Strike #212 Third Party Complaint Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Third Party Complaint Against Fred Herschbach [Fed. R. Civ. P. 14(a)(4)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST FRED HERSCHBACH filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 1, 2015 Filing 217 Brief re #215 MOTION to Strike #212 Third Party Complaint Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Third Party Complaint Against Fred Herschbach [Fed. R. Civ. P. 14(a)(4)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Opposition to Motion To Strike (Corrected) filed byRussell E. Burns, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Ingersoll, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #215 ) (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Filing 216 Brief re #215 MOTION to Strike #212 Third Party Complaint Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Third Party Complaint Against Fred Herschbach [Fed. R. Civ. P. 14(a)(4)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Opposition to Motion to Strike filed byRussell E. Burns, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Ingersoll, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) #215 ) (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 215 MOTION to Strike #212 Third Party Complaint Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Third Party Complaint Against Fred Herschbach [Fed. R. Civ. P. 14(a)(4)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2015 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/1/2015. Replies due by 6/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, James) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 214 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Fred Herschbach. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 213 Proposed Summons. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 212 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Fred Herschbach. Filed byDan Reding, Steve Ingersoll, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Russell E. Burns. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #210 Stipulation for protective order (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 210 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 209 DEFENDANT MANAGEMENT TRUSTEES' ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 208 JOINT ANSWER to Amended Complaint SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT byRussell E. Burns, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Ingersoll, Dan Reding. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Discovery due by 4/14/2016. 3-week Jury Trial set for 10/17/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/25/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 10/31/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 206 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/2/2015. Status Report due by 11/25/2015. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. FTR Time 11:04-11:18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2015) Modified on 4/3/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Selection set for 10/17/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #204 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 204 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Lee A Weiss filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 203 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 201 Stipulation (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 23, 2015 Filing 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 23, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE of Change of Address by Monica R Briseno for Cox, Castle & Nicholson LLP (Briseno, Monica) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part # 187 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
February 19, 2015 Filing 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2015. re # 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard Piombo, F. G. Crosthwaite, Steve Ingersoll, Pete Figueiredo, Kevin J. Albanese, John M. Humber, Thomas Holsman, Carl Goff, Dan Reding, Russell E. Burns. Under submissionCourt Reporter Name or FTR Time Rhonda Aquilina. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 197 REPLY (re # 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint ) filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 196 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset rom 3/19/2015 to 4/2/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 195 RESPONSE (re # 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 194 RESPONSE (re # 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 183 Clerk's Notice, (Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 192 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (filed contemporaneously with Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 183 Clerk's Notice, (Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 190 Proposed Order re # 188 Brief, # 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 189 Declaration of Thomas Holsman in Support of # 188 Brief, # 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) # 188 , # 187 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 188 Brief re # 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byKevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. (Related document(s) # 187 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/15/2015. Replies due by 1/29/2015. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Revised Hearing Date for Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard Piombo, Thomas Holsman, F. G. Crosthwaite, Kevin J. Albanese, John M. Humber. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 185 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie in Support of # 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Revised Hearing Date for Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byKevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Related document(s) # 184 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Revised Hearing Date for Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 183 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/18/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard Piombo, Thomas Holsman, F. G. Crosthwaite, Kevin J. Albanese, John M. Humber. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 181 Declaration of Dwayne P. McKenzie in Support of # 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Second Amended Complaint filed byKevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (Related document(s) # 180 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Second Amended Complaint filed by Kevin J. Albanese, F. G. Crosthwaite, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Richard Piombo. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 179 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended, filed by leave of Court) against Kevin J. Albanese, Russell E. Burns, F. G. Crosthwaite, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Richard Piombo, Dan Reding. Filed byJohn Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 177 Stipulation to continue CMC to 12/4/14 at 10:30 a.m. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2014. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 175 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, (Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of H. Scott Leviant)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss With Leave to Amend - # 99 # 106 # 107 # 109 # 114 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 173 re Continuance of the August 14, 2014, Case Management Conference filed by Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Randall Ching, Rodney Nohara, Lance Wilhelm, Chad Goodfellow, John M. Humber, Robert Doud, Ronald Oshiro, Kenneth Kobatake, James E. Murray, Lance Inouye, Peter Robb, Richard Piombo, Gary Iwamoto, Andy Ragasa, Kathleen Thurston, Kevin J. Albanese, Walt Johnson, Leonard Dempsey, Thomas Holsman, Ken Kawamoto, Leonard Leong, Corey Yamashita Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/25/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 174 Declaration in Support of # 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Continuance of the August 14, 2014, Case Management Conference filed byKevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (Related document(s) # 173 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Continuance of the August 14, 2014, Case Management Conference filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 172 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 8/14/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 171 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 7/10/2014) re # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE filed by Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers, James T. Callahan, # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike filed by Randall Ching, Rodney Nohara, Alvin Kobayashi, Lance Wilhelm, Chad Goodfellow, Ronald Oshiro, Kenneth Kobatake, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Peter Robb, Andy Ragasa, Kathleen Thurston, Leonard Dempsey, Ken Kawamoto, Leonard Leong, Corey Yamashita, # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Justin Diston, Pane Meatoga, Nate Tucker, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Pete Figueiredo, Mike Croll, Jim Sullivan, Dan Reding, Carl Goff, Russell E. Burns, # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by OE Federal Credit Union, # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike filed by Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, John M. Humber, Robert Doud, James E. Murray, Lance Inouye, Richard Piombo, Kevin J. Albanese, Walt Johnson, Thomas Holsman. Under submission(Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Moving Hearing Date from July 3, 2014 to July 10, 2014 filed by Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers, James T. Callahan, Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Moving Hearing Date from July 3, 2014 to July 10, 2014 , # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE , # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) , # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Moving Hearing Date from July 3, 2014 to July 10, 2014 filed by James T. Callahan, Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers. (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 168 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FROM 7/11/14 back to 7/3/14 at 2:30 p.m. (since parties cannot agree on a new date.) Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE , # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) , # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack re 166 Clerks Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE , # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) , # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FOR CERTAIN DATES (Moore, James) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 166 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION FROM 7/3/14 AT 1:30 P.M. TO FRIDAY 7/11 AT 10:30 A.M. Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE , # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) , # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 165 Certificate of Interested Entities by Russell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Jim Graham, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Andrew Lagosh, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker identifying Corporate Parent Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO for Andrew Lagosh, Carl Goff, Dan Reding, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain, Jim Graham, Jim Sullivan, Justin Diston, Mike Croll, Nate Tucker, Pane Meatoga, Pete Figueiredo, Russell E. Burns, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 164 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FROM 6/19/14 to 7/3/14 at 1:30 p.m. Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE , # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) , # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 163 OBJECTIONS to re # 161 Objection, PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION AND REQUEST TO STRIKE NON-UNION TRUSTEE DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS (DKT. 161) FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 7-3(c) by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 162 Proposed Order re # 161 Objection, to Declaration of H. Scott Leviant by Kevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 161 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of H. Scott Leviant by Kevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 160 Declaration of Jolsna M. John in Support of # 159 Reply to Opposition/Response, # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike filed byRandall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (Related document(s) # 159 , # 114 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 159 REPLY (re # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike ) filed byRandall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 158 REPLY (re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike ) filed byKevin J. Albanese, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Robert Doud, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Walt Johnson, James E. Murray, Richard Piombo. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 157 RESPONSE (re # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ) Reply filed byOE Federal Credit Union. (Worthge, Mark) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 156 REPLY (re # 106 MOTION to Dismiss and, in the alternative, to Strike ) filed by James T. Callahan, Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers. (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 155 REPLY (re # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byRussell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Jim Graham, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Andrew Lagosh, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Requesting Continuance of June 19, 2014 Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 153 Declaration of J. Mark Moore in Support of # 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Requesting Continuance of June 19, 2014 Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) # 152 ) (Moore, James) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Requesting Continuance of June 19, 2014 Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 151 Response re # 144 Objection, byRussell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Jim Graham, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Andrew Lagosh, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 150 RESPONSE (re # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 149 RESPONSE (re # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE ) filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 148 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant in Support of # 145 Opposition/Response to Motion, # 146 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Related document(s) # 145 , # 146 ) (Moore, James) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 147 RESPONSE (re # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ) filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 146 RESPONSE (re # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike of Defendants Randall Ching, et al filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 145 RESPONSE (re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike of Defendants Kevin J. Albanese, et al filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 144 OBJECTIONS re # 140 Joinder, # 141 Joinder, PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO AND REQUESTS TO STRIKE 1) LOCAL 3 DEFENDANTS' "STATEMENT OF JOINDER TO CO-DEFENDANT KEVIN ALBANESE, ET AL MOTION TO STRIKE" (Dkt. 141), and 2) "DEFENDANT RUSSELL E. BURNS' STATEMENT OF JOINDER TO CO-DEFENDANT IUOE'S MOTION TO DISMISS, AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE" (Dkt. 140) by David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 143 ERRATA re # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike by Kevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 142 Joinder re # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Jim Graham, Andrew Lagosh, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 141 Joinder re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike by Russell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 140 Joinder re # 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE by Russell E. Burns. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (up to 30 pages) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 29 Amended Complaint to Strike Names of Defendants James D. Spain, Andrew Lagosh, Dennis Dorton, Stanley Green, Jim Graham, Glenn Smith, and Michael Brandt III from Paragraph 84 of the First Amended Compl filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 137 Proposed Order re # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 136 Errata, Revised Order to First Proposed Order # 120 by Randall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 136 ERRATA re # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , Terminate Motions,, by Randall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 135 JOINDER re # 107 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 5/15/2014) Modified on 5/16/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2014 Filing 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 29 Amended Complaint,,,, to Strike Names of Defendants James D. Spain, Andrew Lagosh, Dennis Dorton, Stanley Green, Jim Graham, Glenn Smith, and Michael Brandt III from Paragraph 84 of the First Amended Complaint filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Absalom of George R. Nemiroff (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Absalom (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 131 DECLARATION of George R. Nemiroff in Opposition to # 130 Opposition/Response to Motion, # 129 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss [Docket no. 107] filed byRussell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Related document(s) # 130 , # 129 ) (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 130 RESPONSE (re # 129 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss [Docket no. 107] ) DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION filed byRussell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss [Docket no. 107] filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant, # 2 Proposed Order)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss Defendant Russell E. Burns From Certain State Law Claims in the First Amended Complaint filed by Russell E. Burns. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. Glenn Smith served on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. Glenn Smith (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 5/2/2014) Modified on 5/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2014 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. James D. Spain served on 4/29/2014, answer due 5/20/2014. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 5/2/2014) Modified on 5/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2014 Filing 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza. Andrew Lagosh served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 5/2/2014) Modified on 5/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE by OE Federal Credit Union Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Tavlian, Talar) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita re # 118 Declaration in Support,,, # 120 Proposed Order, # 119 Declaration in Support,,, Terminate Motions,, # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , Terminate Motions,, # 121 Certificate of Interested Entities, # 113 Proposed Order, # 117 Declaration in Support,,, # 112 Proposed Order, # 116 Declaration in Support,,, # 122 Notice of Appearance, # 111 Request for Judicial Notice,, # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by John Stonewall Miller, Jr (Miller, John) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 ***Motions terminated: # 115 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof MOTION to Strike # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Randall Ching, Rodney Nohara, Alvin Kobayashi, Lance Wilhelm, Chad Goodfellow, Ronald Oshiro, Kenneth Kobatake, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Peter Robb, Andy Ragasa, Kathleen Thurston, Leonard Dempsey, Ken Kawamoto, Leonard Leong, Corey Yamashita. #114 is the actual motion. #115 is Memorandum. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 ***Motions terminated: # 110 MOTION to Dismiss Memorrandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Strike # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Memorrandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Jeffrey Clyde, Richard Piombo, Thomas Holsman, F. G. Crosthwaite, Robert Doud, Kevin J. Albanese, Walt Johnson, James E. Murray, Lance Inouye, John M. Humber. #109 is the actual motion. #110 is the memorandum. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 121 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kevin J. Albanese, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Robert Doud, Chad Goodfellow, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 120 Proposed Order re # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike by Randall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 119 Declaration of Ronald Oshiro in Support of # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 115 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof MOTION to Strike # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed byRandall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (Related document(s) # 114 , # 115 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 118 Declaration of Peter Robb in Support of # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 115 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof MOTION to Strike # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed byRandall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (Related document(s) # 114 , # 115 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 117 Declaration of Kenneth Kobatake in Support of # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 115 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof MOTION to Strike # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed byRandall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (Related document(s) # 114 , # 115 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 116 Declaration of Ken Kawamoto in Support of # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 115 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof MOTION to Strike # 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed byRandall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (Related document(s) # 114 , # 115 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 115 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support re MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike # 114 filed by Randall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2014 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint , MOTION to Strike filed by Randall Ching, Leonard Dempsey, Chad Goodfellow, Lance Inouye, Gary Iwamoto, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Leonard Leong, Rodney Nohara, Ronald Oshiro, Andy Ragasa, Peter Robb, Kathleen Thurston, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/22/2014. Replies due by 6/5/2014. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 113 Proposed Order re # 111 Request for Judicial Notice,, by Kevin J. Albanese, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Robert Doud, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Walt Johnson, James E. Murray, Richard Piombo. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 112 Proposed Order re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike by Kevin J. Albanese, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Robert Doud, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Walt Johnson, James E. Murray, Richard Piombo. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 111 Request for Judicial Notice re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike , # 110 MOTION to Dismiss Memorrandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Strike # 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Memorrandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byKevin J. Albanese, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Robert Doud, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Walt Johnson, James E. Murray, Richard Piombo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) # 109 , # 110 ) (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 110 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike # 109 filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Robert Doud, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Walt Johnson, James E. Murray, Richard Piombo. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/22/2014. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2014 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the First Amended Complaint , MOTION to Strike filed by Kevin J. Albanese, Jeffrey Clyde, F. G. Crosthwaite, Robert Doud, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Lance Inouye, Walt Johnson, James E. Murray, Richard Piombo. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/22/2014. Replies due by 6/5/2014. Responses due by 5/8/2014. Replies due by 5/15/2014. (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 108 Declaration of George R. Nemiroff in Support of # 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byRussell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) # 107 ) (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Russell E. Burns, Mike Croll, Justin Diston, Pete Figueiredo, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Steve Ingersoll, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/22/2014. Replies due by 6/5/2014. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE filed by James T. Callahan, Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/8/2014. Replies due by 5/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Absalom Notice of Appearance By George R. Nemiroff (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Absalom (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss Defendant Russell E. Burns From Certain State Law Claims in the First Amended Complaint filed by Russell E. Burns. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Kenneth Worthge as Counsel for Defendant OE Federal Credit Union (Worthge, Mark) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 101 Proposed Order re # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by OE Federal Credit Union. (Tavlian, Talar) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 100 Declaration of Talar Tavlian, Esq. in Support of # 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed byOE Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 99 ) (Tavlian, Talar) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss 12th Cause of Action of the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief can be Granted Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by OE Federal Credit Union. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/6/2014. Replies due by 5/13/2014. (Tavlian, Talar) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 21, 2014 Filing 98 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike State Law Claims (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 95 Stipulation; denying as moot # 96 Stipulation (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 68 MOTION to Strike Notice of Special Motion and Special Motion to Strike State Law Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities - to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply - filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Linh Hua, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hua, Linh) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendants International Union of Operating Engineers, Vincent Giblin and James T. Callahan from Certain State Law Claims in the First Amended Complaint filed by David Slack. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hua, Linh) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Pane Meatoga (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Justin Diston (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Perry Artates (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF EIGHTH AND NINTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, RULE 41(a) by David Slack (Moore, James) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Steve Ingersoll (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 89 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Corey Yamashita Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 88 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Lance Wilhelm Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 87 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Kathleen Thurston Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 86 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Peter Robb Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 85 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Andy Ragasa Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 84 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Ronald Oshiro Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 83 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Rodney Nohara Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 82 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed James E. Murray Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 81 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Leonard Leong Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 80 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Kenneth Kobatake Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 79 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Alvin Kobayashi Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 78 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Ken Kawamoto Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 77 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Gary Iwamoto Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 76 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Lance Inouye Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 75 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed John M. Humber, P.E. Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 74 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Thomas Holsman Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 73 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Chad Goodfellow Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 72 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Leonard Dempsey Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 71 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed F.G. Crosthwaite Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 70 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Jeffrey Clyde Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 69 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Randall Ching Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION to Strike Notice of Special Motion and Special Motion to Strike State Law Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by James T. Callahan, Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/21/2014. Replies due by 4/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 67 Certificate of Interested Entities by James T. Callahan, Vincent Giblin, International Union of Operating Engineers (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwayne Paul McKenzie (McKenzie, Dwayne) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant William Waggoner by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 62 TO INCLUDE DEFENDANTS OE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION AND WILLIAM WAGGONER IN MARCH 4, 2014 STIPULATUIB REGARDING CASE MANGEMENT filed by OE Federal Credit Union. Motion to Dismiss and CMC set for 6/19/14 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Mike Donohue (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO INCLUDE DEFENDANTS OE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION AND WILLIAM WAGGONER IN MARCH 4, 2014 STIPULATUIB REGARDING CASE MANGEMENT filed by OE Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Include Defendants OE Federal Credit Union and William Waggoner in March 4, 2014 Stipulation Regarding Case Management)(Tavlian, Talar) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Steve Harris (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant ASSOCIATED THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATORS by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Charles Carroll (Carroll, Donald) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Kevin J. Albanese (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Thomas Holsman (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Pete Figueiredo (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Mike Croll (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION AND CMC. Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 6, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Talar Tavlian AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT OE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Tavlian, Talar) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Graham Rolstad (Rolstad, Dennis) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Russell E. Burns, Justin Diston, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Absalom (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Absalom Notice of Appearance By George Nemiroff (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 48 Declaration of Kenneth C. Absalom In Support of Stipulation Regarding Case Managment filed byRussell E. Burns, Justin Diston, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Related document(s) # 47 , # 46 ) (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Management {Proposed Order} filed by Russell E. Burns, Justin Diston, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Management filed by Russell E. Burns, Justin Diston, Carl Goff, Steve Harris, Pane Meatoga, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan, Nate Tucker. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. Dan Reding served on 2/20/2014, answer due 3/13/2014. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/4/2014) Modified on 3/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. Richard Piombo served on 2/21/2014, answer due 3/14/2014. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/4/2014) Modified on 3/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. Nate Tucker served on 2/20/2014, answer due 3/13/2014. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 3/4/2014) Modified on 3/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Susan Trice (Trice, Laura) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey M. Leyton (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Weissglass (Weissglass, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Berzon (Berzon, Stephen) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Walt Johnson (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Robert Doud (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Defendant William C. Waggoner (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (James T. Callahan) Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (International Union of Operating Engineers) Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (Vincent Giblin) Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 32 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (Associated Third Party Administrators) Acknowledgement filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to OE Hawaiian Industry Stabilaztion Fund. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 30 Proposed Summons. (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint - pursuant to Order, see Docket no. 27) against Kevin J. Albanese, Perry Artates, Associated Third Party Administrators, Michael Brandt, III, Russell E. Burns, James T. Callahan, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, Mike Croll, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Justin Diston, Dennis Dorton, Robert Doud, Pete Figueiredo, Vincent Giblin, Carl Goff, Chad Goodfellow, Jim Graham, Stanley Green, Steve Harris, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Lance Inouye, International Union of Operating Engineers, Gary Iwamoto, Walt Johnson, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Andrew Lagosh, Leonard Leong, Pane Meatoga, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, OE Federal Credit Union, Ronald Oshiro, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Dan Reding, Peter Robb, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain, Jim Sullivan, Kathleen Thurston, Nate Tucker, William C. Waggoner, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita, OE Hawaiian Industry Stabilaztion Fund. Filed byJohn Jarboe, David Slack, Ken Bettis, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Linh Hua (Hua, Linh) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 10 Order, Set Hearings, # 21 Stipulation filed by Clyde Eli, Ken Bettis, John Jarboe, David Slack, Kenny Mendoza Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 4/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 30, 2013 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 10 Order, Set Hearings, # 21 Stipulation filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Scott Leviant pursuant to LR 6-2)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying # 14 Non-Party Scher's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack of re # 6 Summons Issued, re # 4 ADR Scheduling Order, re # 1 Complaint, re 3 Case Assigned by Intake & Standing Order for Magistrate Ryu, and Contents of Joint Case Management Statement, as to Defendants Russell E. Burns, Dan Reding, Carl Goff, and Jim Sullivan (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 22 REPLY to # 15 Opposition to (re # 14 Ex Parte Application) filed by Greg Scher. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 12/3/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time for Response re # 1 Complaint filed by Russell E. Burns, Carl Goff, Dan Reding, Jim Sullivan. (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Absalom (Absalom, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8174456.) filed by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert G Lum (Lum, Albert) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K Berns (Berns, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack re # 15 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 15 RESPONSE (re # 14 Ex Parte Application ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO, AND REQUEST TO STRIKE FROM RECORD, NON-PARTY GREG SCHERS EX PARTE MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS filed byKen Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack. (Moore, James) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE - Letter from Judge Chen re: Consent before Magistrate Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CMC FROM 1/30/14 TO 2/6/14 AT 9:00 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 14 Ex Parte Application for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Greg Scher. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 1, 2013 Filing 11 STANDING ORDER (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASES. Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/1/2013. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ken Bettis, Clyde Eli, John Jarboe, Kenny Mendoza, David Slack.. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kevin J. Albanese, Perry Artates, Associated Third Party Administrators, Michael Brandt, III, Russell E. Burns, James T. Callahan, Randall Ching, Jeffrey Clyde, Mike Croll, F. G. Crosthwaite, Leonard Dempsey, Justin Diston, Dennis Dorton, Robert Doud, Clyde Eli, Pete Figueiredo, Mark Fitzgerald, Michael Gallagher, Vincent Giblin, Carl Goff, Chad Goodfellow, Jim Graham, Stanley Green, Steve Harris, Robert T. Heenan, Phillip Herring, Brian E. Hickey, Thomas Holsman, John M. Humber, Steve Ingersoll, Lance Inouye, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 3, International Union of Operating Engineers, Gary Iwamoto, Michael J. Johnson, Walt Johnson, Jerry Kalmar, Rodger Kaminska, Ken Kawamoto, Kenneth Kobatake, Alvin Kobayashi, Daren Konopaski, Andrew Lagosh, Greg Lalevee, Leonard Leong, Ronald McClain, Terrance E. McGowan, Daniel J. McGraw, Pane Meatoga, James E. Murray, Rodney Nohara, OE Federal Credit Union, Ronald Oshiro, Bradley Parres, Richard Piombo, Andy Ragasa, Louis G. Rasetta, Dan Reding, Peter Robb, Patrick L. Sink, Luther Slack, Glenn Smith, James D. Spain, Jim Sullivan, James M. Sweeney, Kathleen Thurston, Nate Tucker, William C. Waggoner, Larry Watson, Lance Wilhelm, Corey Yamashita. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 27, 2013 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2014 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2013)
October 27, 2013 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2013)
October 27, 2013 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 10/27/2013)
October 27, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , Class Action, and Demand for Jury Trial, against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8111274.). Filed byJohn Jarboe, David Slack, Bettis Ken, Kenny Mendoza, Clyde Eli. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leviant, Howard) (Filed on 10/27/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slack et al v. International Union of Operating Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Bettis
Represented By: Albert G Lum
Represented By: Albert G. Lum
Represented By: James Mark Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Linh Hua
Represented By: Howard Scott Leviant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Eli
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Linh Hua
Represented By: Albert G Lum
Represented By: James Mark Moore
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Albert G. Lum
Represented By: Howard Scott Leviant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jarboe
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Albert G Lum
Represented By: James Mark Moore
Represented By: Albert G. Lum
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Linh Hua
Represented By: Howard Scott Leviant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Mendoza
Represented By: Albert G Lum
Represented By: Albert G. Lum
Represented By: James Mark Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Linh Hua
Represented By: Howard Scott Leviant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Slack
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By: Linh Hua
Represented By: Howard Scott Leviant
Represented By: Albert G Lum
Represented By: James Mark Moore
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Albert G. Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Albanese
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: Monica R Briseno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Artates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Third Party Administrators
Represented By: Dennis Graham Rolstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brandt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Callahan
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Represented By: Laura Susan Trice
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Ching
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Clyde
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Croll
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: Monica R Briseno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Dempsey
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Diston
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Dorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Doud
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Giblin
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Represented By: Laura Susan Trice
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Goodfellow
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Graham
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Harris
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Heenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Holsman
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: Monica R Briseno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Humber
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: Monica R Briseno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Inouye
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 3
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: Laura Susan Trice
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Iwamoto
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Johnson
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Kalmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodger Kaminska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Kawamoto
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Kobatake
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Kobayashi
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren Konopaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lagosh
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Lalevee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Leong
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance E. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pane Meatoga
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Murray
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Nohara
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OE Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Talar Tavlian
Represented By: Mark Kenneth Worthge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OE Hawaiian Industry Stabilaztion Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Oshiro
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Parres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Piombo
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: Monica R Briseno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Ragasa
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis G. Rasetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Robb
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick L. Sink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Smith
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Spain
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Sullivan
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Thurston
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Tucker
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Waggoner
Represented By: Donald Charles Carroll
Represented By: Charles Peter Scully, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Wilhelm
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Yamashita
Represented By: Dwayne Paul McKenzie
Represented By: John Stonewall Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Pete Figueiredo
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Carl Goff
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Steve Ingersoll
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dan Reding
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Greg Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Amalgamated Bank
Represented By: Robert James Guite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fred Herschbach
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?