Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. LEOGAP
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: LEOGAP
Case Number: 3:2013cv05076
Filed: October 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on October 5, 2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/14/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/23/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 11 Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2016 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) re 7 Notice (Other) filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company Case Management Conference Statement due by 7/23/2014. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 7/30/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/14/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. LEOGAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Charles Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEOGAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?