United States of America v. $22,520 In United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $22,520 In United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2013cv05107
Filed: November 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING AMENDED 32 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/17/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER requiring further briefing re: 14 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Approximately $22,520 in United States Currency filed by United States of America. Supplemental Brief due by 4/2/2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/18/2014. April 3, 2014 hearing is vacated. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $22,520 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie M. Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,520 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?