Estate of Andy Lopez et al v. Gelhaus et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Estate of Andy Lopez, Rodrigo Lopez and Sujay Cruz
Defendant: Erick Gelhaus and County of Sonoma
Case Number: 3:2013cv05124
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2014 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended) against All Defendants. Filed bySujay Cruz. (Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 34 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 35 Proposed Order re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of the Parties Re Second Amended Complaint by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of the Parties Re Second Amended Complaint filed by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 33 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/15/2014 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 5/15/2014). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2014)
May 12, 2014 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updating the Court filed by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus, Rodrigo Lopez, Estate of Andy Lopez, Sujay Cruz. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Estate of Andy Lopez. (Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 30 Statement Updating the Court re Status for Purposes of Case Management Conference Following Issuance of Stay filed by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 Filing 29 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 19, 2014, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2014. (Related document(s) 28 ) (rhm) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 14 Motion to Stay (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2014 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 2/19/2014) re 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Erick Gelhaus, County of Sonoma. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2014 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 25 ERRATA re 22 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Motion for Temporary Stay by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 24 Declaration of Steven C. Mitchell in Support of 22 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byCounty of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 23 Declaration of Teresa R. Leoni in Support of 22 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byCounty of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 22 REPLY (re 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byCounty of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 21 RESPONSE (re 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byEstate of Andy Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO VACATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 19 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and to Continue the Case Management Conference Until After This Court Issues an Order on Defendants' Motion to Termporarily Stay Porceedings filed by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byCounty of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 1/27/2014. Replies due by 2/3/2014. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 17 Proposed Order re 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 16 Declaration of Sonoma County District Attorney Jill R. Ravitch in Support of 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byCounty of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 15 Declaration in Support of 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Sheriff Steve Freitas filed byCounty of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Completion and Determination of Criminal Investigation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 1/27/2014. Replies due by 2/3/2014. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Estate of Andy Lopez as to the County of Sonoma (Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/7/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Sonoma and Erick Gelhaus. Filed byEstate of Andy Lopez. (Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/8/2014 (kk, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to County of Sonoma, Erick Gelhaus. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/2/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 30, 2013 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Estate of Andy Lopez.. (Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 5 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (gmS, ) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against Erick Gelhaus (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-8131386.). Filed by Estate of Andy Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casillas, Arnoldo) (Filed on 11/4/2013) Modified on 11/4/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Andy Lopez et al v. Gelhaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Andy Lopez
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Lopez
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sujay Cruz
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Gelhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?