NovelPoster v. Javitch Canfield Group et al
Plaintiff: NovelPoster
Defendant: Javitch Canfield Group, Dan Canfield and Mark Javitch
Case Number: 3:2013cv05186
Filed: November 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/04/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING re 185 MOTION. Deadline reset as to 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 155 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and 148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Counterclaim. Motion Hearing set for 1/21 /2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. The hearing in this case currently set for January 14, 2015 is VACATED and rescheduled for January 21, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. The joint statement previously due on or before January 5, 2015 is now due on or before January 12, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER INSTRUCTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT STATEMENT AND RESCHEDULING HEARING re 176 Letter. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick as to 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 155 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and 148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/29/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 123 Motion for Sanctions.(jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 137 Stipulation Extending Expert Witness Report Disclosures and Rebuttal for Computer Expert. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 112 , 113 Motion to Dismiss. Counterclaimants are granted leave to amend. Any amended pleading must be submitted within 10 days of this order (11/14/2014). (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 111 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 65 Motion to Dismiss. Third party plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their counterclaim and third-party complaint within 15 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 60 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. NovelPoster is granted leave to amend its complaint with respect to the four causes of action that are the subject of this Order within 15 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE OF PARTIES AT HEARING ON JULY 9, 2014 re 68 Statement. On July 9, 2014, each of the parties to this action shall appear at the Courts law and motion calendar, which starts at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 17th floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/30/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY re 53 Statement. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/23/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick denying 16 and 24 Motions to Dismiss. Canfield and Javitch's Motions to Dismiss are DENIED. They shall answer within twenty (20) days. The April 2, 2014 hearing is VACATED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/05/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING DISCOVERY, CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND REQUIRING MEDIATION re 34 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, 33 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR A HEARING, and 35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Within seven days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall provide NovelPoster with all emails and other written communications, including any contracts or other agreemen ts, between them and any third-party customers (past, actual, or potential) related to NovelPoster from June 6, 2013, to January 10, 2014. The parties, with principals present, shall mediate this matter as soon as practicable, ideally before March 10 , 2014. This matter is referred to the Courts ADR Unit for selection of a mediator. Case Management Conference continued to 3/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2014.) The hearing on defendants motions to dismiss, scheduled for February 19, 2014, is vacated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/10/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/9/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NovelPoster v. Javitch Canfield Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NovelPoster
Represented By: Keenan Ng
Represented By: Katy Marie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javitch Canfield Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?