Henneberry v. City of Newark et al

Plaintiff: John Patrick Henneberry
Defendant: City of Newark, County of Alameda, Newark Chamber of Commerce, Linda Ashley, John Becker, David Benoun, Karl Fredstrom and Renny Lawson
Case Number: 3:2013cv05238
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 200 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 173 Motion in Limine; granting 174 Motion in Limine; granting 175 Motion in Limine; denying 176 Motion in Limine; denying 178 Motion in Limine; denying 183 Motion in Limine; denying 199 Motion in Limine. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 148 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 144 Motion to Continue and Reopen Discovery (with instructions). (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 131 ORDER FOR YOLANDA HUANG TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2017.Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/24/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 109 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/15/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/8/2017. Motion Hearing on Motion to Withdraw set for 7/6/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/25/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 98 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. All currently-scheduled pretrial and trial deadlines are vacated. Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order 80 ORDER re: Case Management Statement and ORDER vacating 3/17/2016 Case Management Conference; Response due by 3/23/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/10/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order 75 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Dismiss (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order 65 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 64 Stipulation for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims against Defendant David Benoun with Prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order 56 ORDER GRANTING 51 APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION filed by County of Alameda. The settling parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/3/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order 44 ORDER APPROVING REQUEST: Re 43 Letter filed by Renny Lawson, City of Newark, John Becker, Karl Fredstrom, David Benoun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/26/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order 33 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Amendment reflects reset settlement conference date of December 15, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/8/2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint due 11/3/2014 (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on February 11, 2014. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/22/2014. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henneberry v. City of Newark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Patrick Henneberry
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newark Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Michael Shannon Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ashley
Represented By: Michael Shannon Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Benoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Fredstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renny Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?