Ingram Micro Inc et al v. LG Electronics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ingram Micro Inc and Synnex Corporation
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc, Hitachi-LG Data Storage Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc., Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan, Benq Corporation, Benq America Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc, NEC Corporation, Sony NEC Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc America Inc., Panasonic Corp., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Teac Corporation, Teac America Inc., Quanta Storage Inc and Quanta Storage America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05372
Filed: November 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER (112 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2742 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS QUANTA STORAGE, INC. AND QUANTA STORAGE AMERICA, INC. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (109 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2698 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS PANASONIC CORPORATION AND PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (#2590 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#104 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) of Dismissal of Defendants Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2525 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#97 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) of Dismissal of Defendants Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc. (formerly known as Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.), and Sony Optiarc America Inc. filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#94 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (#2522 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal of Defendant NEC Corporation filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (#90 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (#2323 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) Regarding Modification of Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions Specific to the Ingram and Synnex Action. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER (84 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2271 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal re HLDS and LG. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER (2045 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) re: Deadlines for Ingram Micro. Inc's and Synnex Corp.'s Final Production of Documents and Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER (73 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) of Dismissal re TEAC filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 69 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (#1373 3:10-md-2143) (#35 3:13-5372) BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/15/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND EXTENDING TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (#25 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (#1244 in 3:10-md-02143-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram Micro Inc et al v. LG Electronics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingram Micro Inc
Represented By: Daniel A Sasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synnex Corporation
Represented By: Daniel A Sasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benq Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benq America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Optiarc Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Optiarc America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teac Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teac America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanta Storage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanta Storage America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?