GoldieBlox, Inc. v. Island Def Jam Music Group et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: GoldieBlox, Inc.
Defendant: Brooklyn Dust Music, Beastie Boys, Rick Rubin and Adam Horovitz
Case Number: 3:2013cv05428
Filed: November 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2014 Filing 34 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a) filed by Beastie Boys, Brooklyn Dust Music, Michael Diamond(Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Adam Horovitz, Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch(Counterclaim-Plaintiff). (Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 32 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Extension of Time filed by Beastie Boys, Brooklyn Dust Music, Michael Diamond(Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Adam Horovitz, Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch(Counterclaim-Plaintiff). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kent R. Raygor, # 2 Proposed Order)(Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 31 ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; FIRST AMENED COUNTERCLAIM against GoldieBlox, Inc.. Filed by Michael Diamond (Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Adam Horovitz, Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch(Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Brooklyn Dust Music, Beastie Boys. (Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 2/24/2014) Modified text on 2/25/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 29 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Extension of Time filed by GoldieBlox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daralyn J. Durie, # 2 Proposed Order)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 27 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Time filed by GoldieBlox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daralyn J. Durie, # 2 Proposed Order)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 21 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 9, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Beastie Boys, Brooklyn Dust Music, Michael Diamond(Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Adam Horovitz, Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch(Counterclaim-Plaintiff).. (Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Time filed by GoldieBlox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daralyn J. Durie, # 2 Proposed Order)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 20 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: A reminder to file either a consent form or a declination form to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge was sent to both Plaintiff and Defendants on 12/13/2013. As of today, we have not received either form from Defendants. Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (igS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 20, 2013 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GoldieBlox, Inc... (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Island Def Jam Music Group, a Div. of UMG Recordings, Inc.; Sony/ATV Music Publishing Group LLC; and Universal Music Publishing, Inc. by GoldieBlox, Inc. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GoldieBlox, Inc. byMichael Diamond(Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Brooklyn Dust Music, Beastie Boys, Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch, Adam Horovitz. (Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 15 ERRATA re 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Beastie Boys, Brooklyn Dust Music, Michael Diamond(Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Adam Horovitz, Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch. (Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Beastie Boys, Brooklyn Dust Music, Michael Diamond(Counterclaim-Plaintiff), Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch re 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, (Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 13 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. SEE DOCUMENT 16 FOR CORRECTED FILING *** ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Brooklyn Dust Music and Beastie Boys, COUNTERCLAIM by Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Brooklyn Dust Music and Beastie Boys, and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Michael Diamond and Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch against GoldieBlox, Inc. byBrooklyn Dust Music, Beastie Boys, Michael Diamond, Dechen Yauch, executor of the estate of Adam Yauch. (Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/11/2013 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2013 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daralyn J. Durie (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Beastie Boys, Brooklyn Dust Music, Adam Horovitz, Island Def Jam Music Group, Rick Rubin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal Music Publishing, Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2014 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by GoldieBlox, Inc. re 1 Complaint, 2 Proposed Summons (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF [DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL] against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8181474.). Filed byGoldieBlox, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 11/21/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GoldieBlox, Inc. v. Island Def Jam Music Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GoldieBlox, Inc.
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Dust Music
Represented By: Kent Randall Raygor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beastie Boys
Represented By: Kent Randall Raygor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Horovitz
Represented By: Kent Randall Raygor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?