August 2, 2017 |
Filing
233
JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/2/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing
231
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 224 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
|
June 14, 2017 |
Filing
229
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 228 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing
227
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 226 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing
223
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 219 SETTLEMENT APPROVAL( terminated as moot 222 Administrative Motion) Motions due by 5/26/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
214
SCHEDULING ORDER re Docket No. 213 : Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2017;. Close of Fact and Expert Discovery due by 4/3/2017; Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/24/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
212
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE 211 MOTION FOR JOHN M. PADILLA TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing
209
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 208 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
|
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
200
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 199 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Further Case Management Conference on September 6, 2016. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
197
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 196 MOTION FOR GABRIEL ASSAAD TO PARTICIPATE TELEPHONICALLY AT THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
|
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
195
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 194 MOTION FOR JOHN M. PADILLA TO PARTICIPATE TELEPHONICALLY AT THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
193
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 181 , 191 ) SETTLEMENT APPROVAL; SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
185
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 183 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Gabriel Assaad. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing
180
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Revised Settlement Agreement (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
168
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 157 SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND DENYING 166 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
155
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS by Haywood S Gilliam, Jr denying 143 Motion for Settlement.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
|
May 6, 2015 |
Filing
151
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 150 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
140
ORDER Granting 138 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Edward Spang; Christopher Anthony Killens and Michael Ross Phillips terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/19/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing
125
AMENDED ORDER RESETTING CMC re 124 Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing
124
ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 3/5/15 to 1/22/15 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing
121
ORDER GRANTING re 116 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9094037.) filed by Pride Technologies, LLC. Court system updated to reflect Attorney McAlphine is admitted in this Court. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing
119
ORDER RE: GOSS DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/25/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
109
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 103 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing
104
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Pride Technologies, LLC, Experis US, Inc., Teachers Insurance & Annuity Association of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
|
October 24, 2014 |
Filing
102
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 91 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing
72
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation on Extension of Time for Defendant Pride Technologies, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint filed by Pride Technologies, LLC, 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation on Extension of Time for Defendant Pride Technologies, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint [Proposed] Order Granting Extension of Time</ filed by Pride Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 56 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Pride Technologies, LLC. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing
51
ORDER APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 48 Proposed Order, filed by Pride Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing
16
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
|