Houston v. Cullen

Petitioner: Eric Christopher Houston
Respondent: Vince Cullen
Case Number: 3:2013cv05609
Filed: December 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY AND ABEY by Judge William Alsup granting 25 Motion to Stay. 120 days after the entry of this order, then every 90 days thereafter petitioner shall file a status report. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
March 18, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING ON MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
February 1, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
December 5, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING EXECUTION OF DEATH SENTENCE AND REFERRING THE MATTER TO THE SELECTION BOARD FOR SUGGESTION OF APPOINTED COUNSEL by Judge William Alsup granting 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Christopher Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vince Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?