Turner v. Foulk et al
Petitioner: Vincent Turner
Respondent: Fred Foulk and People of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2013cv05718
Filed: December 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Vincent Turner. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/27/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Traverse Late.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 10 Response to Order to Show Cause to October 10, 2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/2014. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Foulk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Turner
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Represented By: Manisha Daryani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?