Rubio v. U.S. Bank N.A.

Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., Western Progressive, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edgardo C. Rubio
Case Number: 3:2013cv05752
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Motion to Dismiss and Proposal to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/03/2014. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
April 1, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 20 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
June 10, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 36 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubio v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Marc Wesley Thomas
Represented By: Eric D. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marc Wesley Thomas
Represented By: Eric D. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Houser
Represented By: Marc Wesley Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo C. Rubio
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Represented By: Megan Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.