Bowman v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Christine M Bowman
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., successor by merger with Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., f/k/a Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, f/k/a World Savings Bank, FSB (erroneously sued as Wells Fargo Home Mortgage)
Case Number: 3:2013cv05850
Filed: December 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/6/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation; ORDER Granting 30 MOTION to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/5/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONVERTING 6/5 HEARING TO HEARING RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 30 MOTION to Lift Stay re 15 Order, 29 Order, 21 Order Staying Case, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Moti on and Motion to Dissolve Stay on Foreclosure) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., successor by merger with Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., f/k/a Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, f/k/a World Savings Bank, FSB (erroneously sued as Wells Fargo Home Mortgage). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/4/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION BY 6/4/14 AT 3:00 P.M. re 30 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE: FORECLOSURE PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/28/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING STATUS REPORT ORDER re 23 Status Report Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/13/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wells Fargo. Opposition due by 5/12/2014. Reply due by 5/22/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/2/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. ALL FORECLOSURE-RELATED PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED. ALL PENDING DEADLINES/HEARINGS ARE VACATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/7/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/6/2014 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/23/2014. Defendant is directed to serve this Order upon Plaintiff by 1/9/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/3/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M Bowman
Represented By: Tiffany Rochelle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., successor by merger with Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., f/k/a Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, f/k/a World Savings Bank, FSB (erroneously sued as Wells Fargo Home Mortgage)
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?