Ripple Labs, Inc. v. LaCore Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ripple Labs, Inc. and OpenCoin, Inc.
Defendant: LaCore Enterprises, LLC, Rippln, Inc. and Terry LaCore
Case Number: 3:2013cv05974
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2014 Filing 34 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/19/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/17/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/14/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE by LaCore Enterprises, LLC, Rippln, Inc. & Stipulated Request to Continue Deadlines; [Proposed] Order (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ASHLEY G. KESSLER PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ashley G. Kessler ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8342227.) filed by Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kessler, Ashley) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION [DKT #4] FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Motion Hearing previously set for 3/6/14 has been Rescheduled to 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014) This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice.
January 31, 2014 RESET MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING TO MARCH 13, 2014 AT 1:30 P.M. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SAMUEL A. LEWIS PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD GUERRA PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES A. GALE PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Reset Hearing re #26 . Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Samuel A. Lewis ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8332360.) filed by Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Lewis, Samuel) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2014 Filing 20 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard Guerra ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8328942.) filed by Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Guerra, Richard) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James A. Gale ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8327866.) filed by Ripple Labs, Inc.. (Gale, James) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2014 Filing 18 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #19 NOTICE by Ripple Labs, Inc. Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Gale, James) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer Seraphine (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 15 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #13 Renotice motion hearing, - Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Briefing and Hear filed byTerry LaCore, LaCore Enterprises, LLC, Rippln, Inc.. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #13 Renotice motion hearing, - Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Terry LaCore, LaCore Enterprises, LLC, Rippln, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 3, 2014 Filing 13 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byRipple Labs, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/17/2014. Replies due by 1/24/2014. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ripple Labs, Inc. (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 2, 2014. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 31, 2013 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ripple Labs, Inc... (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Terry LaCore, LaCore Enterprises, LLC, Rippln, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ripple Labs, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 1/10/2014. Replies due by 1/17/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ashley Kessler, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Kessler Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Kessler Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Kessler Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Kessler Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Kessler Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Kessler Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Kessler Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Kessler Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J to Kessler Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K to Kessler Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L to Kessler Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M to Kessler Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N to Kessler Declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O to Kessler Declaration, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P to Kessler Declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Kessler Declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R to Kessler Declaration, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S to Kessler Decla, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T to Kessler Declaration, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U to Kessler Declaration, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V to Kessler Declaration, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W to Kessler Declaration, #25 Exhibit Exhibit X to Kessler Declaration, #26 Declaration Declaration of Christian Larsen, #27 Exhibit Exhibit A to Larsen Declaration, #28 Exhibit Exhibit B to Larsen Declaration, #29 Proposed Order)(Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (gmS, ) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) for Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, and Cybersquatting against Lacore Enterprises, LLC, Ripple, Inc., Terry Lacore. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8259157). Filed byRipple Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/27/2013) Modified on 12/30/2013 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ripple Labs, Inc. v. LaCore Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ripple Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Matthew Malynn
Represented By: Ashley G Kessler
Represented By: James A. Gale
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Represented By: Samuel Abraham Lewis
Represented By: Jennifer Seraphine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OpenCoin, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Matthew Malynn
Represented By: Ashley G Kessler
Represented By: James A. Gale
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Represented By: Samuel Abraham Lewis
Represented By: Jennifer Seraphine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaCore Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Virginia Anne Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rippln, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Virginia Anne Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry LaCore
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?