Google, Inc. v. Eolas Technologies Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Defendant: Eolas Technologies Incorporated and The Regents of the University of California
Case Number: 3:2013cv05997
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 97 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File; -Stipulation and [Proposed] Order To Dismiss Action filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 98 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 97 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File; -Stipulation and [Proposed] Order To Dismiss Action filed by Google, Inc.. (Watkins, Robert) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part 77 Motion to Dismiss; granting 90 Motion for Leave to File (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER; Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Vacate Deadlines filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Vacate Deadlines filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Robert Watkins)(Watkins, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Google Inc. to Respond To Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; /Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Google Inc. to Respond To Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Watkins in Support of Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Google Inc. to Respond To Defendants' Counterclaims, # 2 Proposed Order)(Watkins, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 77 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 30, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 91 RESPONSE to (re 90 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order) (Johnson II, John) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Watkins in Support of Google's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Sur-Reply, and Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 89 REPLY (re 77 MOTION to Dismiss) - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Johnson II, John) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 9, 2014 Filing 88 REPLY (re 77 MOTION to Dismiss) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of JR Johnson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Johnson II, John) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 87 RESPONSE (re 77 MOTION to Dismiss ) / Google, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES re 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE INC. TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS, AND CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 19, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE INC. TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS, AND CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert P. Watkins)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 84 Joinder re 78 Brief; -Notice of Joinder in Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff Eolas's Motion to Dismiss filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM; CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 76 against Google, Inc. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Google Inc. to Respond to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss and to Defendants' Counterclaims, and Continuing the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 77 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/19/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT P. WATKINS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Robert P. Watkins, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8777796.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 79 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time for Google Inc. to Respond to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss and to Defendants' Counterclaims, and Continuing the Initial Case Management Conferfence filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert P. Watkins)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 78 Brief re 77 MOTION to Dismiss; -Corrected Motion to Dismiss - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 77 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 77 ) (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/22/2014. Replies due by 7/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Google, Inc. byThe Regents of the University of California, Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 74 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/19/14, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (69 in 3:13-cv-05997-JST) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 73 EXHIBITS re 71 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; --Exhibit 9 filed Pursuant to Docket #71 Order Denying Motion to Seal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Johnson II, John) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 72 EXHIBITS re 71 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; --Exhibit 4 filed Pursuant to Docket #71 Order Denying Motion to Seal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Johnson II, John) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying (25) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in case 3:13-cv-05997-JST; denying (18) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in case 3:13-cv-06003-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 68 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 6/19/2014) re (18 in 3:13-cv-06003-JST) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eolas Technologies Inc., Regents of the University of California, (25 in 3:13-cv-05997-JST) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF TENTATIVE ORDER re (18 in 3:13-cv-06003-JST) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eolas Technologies Inc., Regents of the University of California; (25 in 3:13-cv-05997-JST) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 46 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 65 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Start Time of Motion Hearing as to (25 in 3:13-cv-05997-JST) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; (18 in 3:13-cv-06003-JST) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 will begin at 2:45 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The Courtroom will be available at 1:45 PM for the parties to set up their presentation equipment prior to the hearing. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING PRESENTATION EQUIPMENT FOR MOTION HEARING by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 63 Motion For Presentation Equipment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 63 Joint Administrative Motion For Leave Regarding Presentation Equipment for June 17, 2014 MTD Hearing filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 61 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rebecca L Unruh Terminated. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Google Inc. re Rebecca Unruh filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 5/28/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support of Google's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Uttam Gajanan Dubal for Plaintiff Google Inc. (Dubal, Uttam) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Keith J. Mitro terminated. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel; [Unopposed] Motion to Withdraw re Keith Mitro filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 5/8/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for 5/7/2014 is CONTINUED to 8/20/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 8/6/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 55 RELATING CASES AND SCHEDULING MOTION HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 54 RESPONSE to re 49 Order to Show Cause; Re: Joint Brief Regarding Relation filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Joint Brief Regarding Relation, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Parker Chad Ankrum terminated. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; [Unopposed] Motion to Withdraw re Parker Ankrum filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Ankrum, Parker) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California re 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Johnson II, John) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 50 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar terminating 48 Motion as moot.(jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POTENTIALLY RELATED CASE AND VACATING MOTION HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/25/2014 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 48 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave Regarding Presentation Equipment for Motion Hearing filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 4/11/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 46 Unopposed Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply In Opposition to Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 4/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Mitro, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 45 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google, Inc.. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN RICHARD JOHNSON II PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of John Richard Johnson II, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8470676.) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, John) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JENNIFER A. ALBERT PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JOHN B. CAMPBELL PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer A. Albert, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8468646.) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing)(Albert, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for John B. Campbell, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8467535.) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY KEVIN L. BURGESS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JOSHUA W. BUDWIN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kevin L. Burgess, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8460152.) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by Joshua W. Budwin, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8459810.) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 34 REPLY (re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of JOSHUA W. BUDWIN, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Eolas v Adobe (EDTX) Docket, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Eolas-Microsoft Docket, # 4 Exhibit 3 - EDTX 966 2011 09 06 Notice of Status, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 2013 12 19 Letter, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Google Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 - 424 2010 09 28 ORDER, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration 2014 02 07, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of JOSHUA W. BUDWIN, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 9)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 13, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 31 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISIDCTION (D.I. 29) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Courtland Reichman)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 30 Declaration of Keith J. Mitro in Support of re 29 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 29 RESPONSE to (re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ); /Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Abeer Dubey in Support of Plaintiff Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #(2) Proposed Order)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Google Inc. to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 19, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 3/7/2014. Replies due by 3/14/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 27 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time for Google Inc. to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith Mitro in Support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 26 Declaration in Support of 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byEolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/21/2014. Replies due by 2/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of James Stetson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 24 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey J. Toney ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8327252.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Toney, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Tigar granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice <br /> (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan K. Waldrop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8326010.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Darcy L. Jones ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8325843.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 Filing 19 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 18 Stipulation.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Notice terminating 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Stipulation was incorrectly filed as a motion.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Google, Inc. of re 11 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, re 12 Order Reassigning Case, re 13 Clerk's Notice (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint (+ attachments) served on Nicole Craig, Senior Counsel for The Regents of The University of California on January 2, 2014, filed by Google, Inc.. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Coversheet, Certification of Interested Entities, Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Proceed/Declination to Proceed, Magistrate Ryu's Standing Order, Judge Ryu's Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order, Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California, Judge Ryu's Notice re: Telephonic Procedures, Filing Procedures (Oakland) and ECF Registration Information served on Jim Stetson, Authorized Agent for Eolas Technologies Incorporated on January 3, 2014, filed by Google, Inc.. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 10, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc... (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patents. (cc: form mailed to register). (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Regents of the University of California. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eolas Technologies Inc. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 31, 2013 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2014 01:30 PM. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eolas Technologies Incorporated. The Regents of the University of California. Filed byGoogle, Inc.(Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-8262256.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 12/30/2013) Modified on 12/31/2013 (ha, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google, Inc. v. Eolas Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Parker Chad Ankrum
Represented By: Darcy Lachelle Jones
Represented By: Keith J. Mitro
Represented By: Jeffrey James Toney
Represented By: Rebecca L Unruh
Represented By: Jonathan K. Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?