Inzerillo et al v. Green Tree Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Erasimo A. Inzerillo, Angela Inzerillo and Francesca Inzerillo
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv06010
Filed: December 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 78 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting Plaintiff Erasimo Inzerillo permission to appear by telephone at the 2/25/2015 settlement conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING: 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 Case Management Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/29/2014 Expert Witness List due by 10/6/2014Rebuttal Expert Witness List due by 10/16/2014Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/15/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 12 Motion to Strike (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/27/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inzerillo et al v. Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erasimo A. Inzerillo
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Inzerillo
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca Inzerillo
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?