Lodsys Group LLC v. Combay, Inc.

Defendant: Combay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lodsys Group LLC
3rd_party_defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013mc80162
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/6/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 20, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MEET AND CONFER ON GOOGLES MOTION TO QUASH (Dkt. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/20/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 7, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ON GOOGLE INC.S MOTION TO QUASH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/7/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 5, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON GOOGLE INC.S MOTION TO QUASH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/5/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodsys Group LLC v. Combay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodsys Group LLC
Represented By: Ivo Keller
Represented By: Richard C. Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Lowell D Jacobson
Represented By: Sanjeet K. Dutta
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Ketan Pastakia
Represented By: Robert F. Perry
Represented By: Scott T. Weingaertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?