Nagy v. Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dave Nagy
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc. and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00038
Filed: January 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Amended 173 Order RE JUDGMENT FOR OWN OCCUPATION BENEFITS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/6/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER REGARDING JUDGMENT FOR OWN OCCUPATION BENEFITS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/22/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 168 Defendants' Motion to Appear by Telephone at the August 14, 2018 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 156 Stipulation to Post Supersedeas Bond. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES 146 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE: 123 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS 150 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 126 Motion to Relate Case to 16-cv-5309-DMR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 135 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 129 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 104 APPROVAL OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF BOND; GRANTING 111 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXATION OF COSTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 101 Stipulation for 45-day Extension to Determine whether Nagy is Entitled to Benefits under the "Any Occupation" Standard of the Hartford Disability Policy. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/9/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 91 Stipulation for Extension to Submit a Proposed Judgment re Disability Benefits and Prejudgment Interest. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/22/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 82 Defendants' Request to Appear by Telephone at October 13, 2015 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REGARDING SELECTION OF AN INDEPENDENT EXPERT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/14/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr granting 75 Stipulation.(hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REGARDING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/2/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Stipulation for Deadline for Filing of Opposition to Plaintiff's Post Hearing Brief in Support of Admission of Social Security Disability Award. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Motion to Appear by Telephone Defendants' Request to Appear by Telephone at Further Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline on Responsive Trial Brief by Ten Days filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline on Opening Trial Brief filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Establish Trial Briefing Schedule filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/11/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE TO 10/2/14. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING re 10 Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/4/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagy v. Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Nagy
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan For Employees of Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bernard Bernacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?