Castro v. City of Union City et al
Plaintiff: Gary Castro
Defendant: City of Union City, Union City Police Dept., Brian Foley, Christopher Figueiredo and Sau Nguyen
Case Number: 3:2014cv00272
Filed: January 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 153 Motion for Leave to File. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 147 Motion for Leave to File. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER to file Joint Status Report; Report due by 7/14/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/6/2016. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Vacating All Pretrial and Trial Deadlines Pending Rescheduling of Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/9/2016.(mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER vacating 3/31/2016 hearing re: 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/30/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER continuing hearing on 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; hearing now set for 3/31/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/10/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES RE: DKT. NOS. 88-100. ALL CHAMBERS COPIES MUST INCLUDE: (1) ON EACH PAGE THE RUNNING HEADER CREATED BY THE ECF SYSTEM, AND (2) ALL EXHIBITS WITH LABELED TAB DIVIDERS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/25/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 101 Stipulation To Dismiss Supervisory Liability (Third Cause of Action) and Defendant Chief Brian Foley. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff shall file a revised Second Amended Complaint by June 25, 2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-14-1796 EDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/1/14. (notewarelS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. City of Union City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Union City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union City Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Figueiredo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sau Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?