Garrison et al v. Whole Foods Market California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Garrison and Grace Garrison
Defendant: Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Foods Market, Inc., Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P. and Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00334
Filed: January 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 6/2/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/23/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 60 Stipulation re Treatment of ESI.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 58 Stipulation for Limited Modification of the Scheduling Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 53 Stipulation for Limited Modification to Scheduling Order.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 51 Stipulation for Limited Modification to Scheduling Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 47 Stipulation for Limited Modification of Scheduling Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 45 Stipulation for Limited Modification of Scheduling Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 43 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION Re Initial Schedule filed by Mrs. Gooch's Natural Foods Market, Inc., Whole Foods Market California, Inc. Mediation shall be completed no later than February 2, 2015. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/1/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION to Continue July 8, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Mrs. Gooch's Natural Foods Market, Inc., Whole Foods Market California, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/24/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion To Dismiss and Motion To Strike. (Filed on 6/2/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/21/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison et al v. Whole Foods Market California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Gooch's Natural Foods Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Garrison
Represented By: Matthew Roland Bainer
Represented By: Courtland Wayne Creekmore
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Garrison
Represented By: Matthew Roland Bainer
Represented By: Courtland Wayne Creekmore
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?