Lockett et al v. AO Smith Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Charles P. Lockett and Dori Lockett
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Burnham LLC, CBS Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Georgia Pacific, LLC, Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Soco-West, Inc., Trane US, Inc., AO Smith Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc., American Optical Company, Armstrong International, Inc., Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., BASF Catalyst LLC, Bechtel Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Burnham Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Carver Pump Company, Viacom Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chevron USA Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Cleaver Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., Crane Co., DAP, Inc., Dorsett & Jackson, Inc., Elementis Chemicals, Inc, Elliott Company, Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Oil Corporation, Fabco Automotive Corporation, Ferro Engineering, FMC Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Fryer-Knowles, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia Pacific Corporation, Grinnell Corporation, Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homosote Company, AlliedSignal, Inc., Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John K. Bice, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company, Maremount Corporation, Melrath Gasket Inc., Metalclad Insulation Corporation, NMBFIL, Inc., Kewanee Boiler Corp., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Parsons Corporation, Pep Boys Manny Moe and Jack of California, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Primesource Building Products, Inc., Republic Supply Company, Rich-Tex, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Union Iron Works, RSCC Wire and Cable, LLC, Scott Company of California, Shell Oil Company, Brenntag West, Inc., Soco-Lynch Corporation, Lunkenheimer Company, William Powell Company, Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc., American Standard, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Union Oil Company of California, Velan Valve Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Washington Group International, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Allied Packing and Supply, Inc. and Exxon Mobil Corporation
Intervenor: Hartford Fire Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Co. and Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch
Cross Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00379
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2015 Filing 480 NOTICE by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Resolution of Entire Action (Brown, Russell) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC. by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting #478 Stipulation.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 478 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #471 Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/1/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER, granting #470 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Valve Corp. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett.Velan Valve Corp. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/27/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER, granting #469 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant FMC Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett.FMC Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/27/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER dismissing all claims re #441 Stipulation filed by Zurn Industries, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER dismissing all claims re #440 Stipulation filed by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 471 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Imo Industries Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 470 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Valve Corp. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 469 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant FMC Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER for dismissal without prejudice re #462 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER for dismissal without prejudice re #461 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Trane US, Inc., Trane U.S. Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 20, 2015 Filing 466 Proposed Order DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 20, 2015 Filing 465 Proposed Order DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT CLEAVER -BROOKS, INC. by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER, granting #460 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by CBS Corporation. CBS Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/9/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER, granting #459 STIPULATION as to Defendant General Electric Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett.General Electric Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/9/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 462 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Stipulation For Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Ingersoll Rand Company by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 461 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Stipulation For Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Trane U.S. Inc. by Trane US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 460 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal of Defendant CBS Corporation)(Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 459 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Defendant General Electric Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting #452 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Riley Power, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2015. Riley Power, Inc. terminated(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting #451 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Elliot Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2015. Elliott Company terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting #450 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Fabco Automotive Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2015. Fabco Automotive Corporation terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER granting #449 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Maremount Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2015. Maremount Corporation terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting #448 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Soco-West, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2015. Soco-West, Inc. terminated., (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #447 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant The Lunkenheimer Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2015. Lunkenheimer Company terminated., (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 452 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Riley Power, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 451 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Elliot Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Replies due by 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 450 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Fabco Automotive Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Replies due by 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 449 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Maremount Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Replies due by 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 448 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Soco-West, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Replies due by 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 447 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant The Lunkenheimer Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Replies due by 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 20, 2015 Filing 446 NOTICE by FMC Corporation of Partial Resolution of This Matter (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/19/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER, Motions granted #437 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Carrier Corporation filed by Carrier Corporation. Carrier Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/17/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #442 STIPULATION for Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Air & Liquid Corporation filed by Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/13/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015) Modified on 2/17/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2015 Filing 442 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Air & Liquid Corporation filed by Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Glen) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 441 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO.41 (A) filed by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 23, 2015 Filing 440 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV.PRO. 41 (A) filed by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT CARVER PUMP COMPANY by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting #434 Stipulation.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting #433 Stipulation.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 437 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Carrier Corporation filed by Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Dismissing Without Prejudice All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Carrier Corporation)(Son, John) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 436 NOTICE by Allied Packing and Supply, Inc. of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a) (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 435 NOTICE by Rich-Tex, Inc. and Intervenors Hartford Fire Insurance Company, et al. of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a) or (c) (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 434 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT CARVER PUMP COMPANY filed by Carver Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loomis, Joni) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 433 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, James) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting #425 STIPULATION as to Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Hill Brothers Chemical Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #428 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant The William Powell Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. William Powell Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting #427 STIPULATION [JOINT] FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Parker-Hannifin Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/16/2015. Expert Disclosures due by 3/16/2015. Rebuttal expert disclosures by 3/30/2015. Expert discovery by 4/30/2015. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 6/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 30, 2014 Filing 428 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant The William Powell Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 427 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT] FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 29, 2014 Filing 426 NOTICE by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett of Withdrawal of Counsel for Ethan A. Horn (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 19, 2014 Filing 425 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 12/19/2014) Modified on 12/22/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #422 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Republic Supply Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Republic Supply Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting #421 STIPULATION filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company. Lorillard Tobacco Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 422 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Republic Supply Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 421 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY AND HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Defendants Lorillard Tabacco Company and Hollingworth & Vose Company)(Goines, William) (Filed on 12/18/2014) Modified on 12/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2014 Filing 420 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held as to Plaintiffs and Defendants Parker-Hannifin Corp., Lorillard & Hollingsworth & Vose on 12/17/2014. Case partially settled. Agreements in principle reached with Lorillard Tobacco & Hollingsworth & Vose. Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 419 CORRECT DOCUMENT To #415 Order granting #407 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Exxon Mobil Corporation filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Exxon Mobil Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 418 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 12/16/2014 as to Plaintiffs and Defendants Air & Liquid Systems, Buffalo Pumps,IMO Industries, Warren Pumps, Velen Valve, Carver Pumps and FMC. Case partially settled. Agreements in principle reached with Air & Liquid Systems, IMO Industries, Warren Pumps and Velen Valve Corp. Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #410 STIPULATION re Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Armstrong International, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting #408 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dorsett & Jackson, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Dorsett & Jackson, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 415 SEE DOCKET #419 FOR CORRECTED ORDER granting #407 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Exxon Mobil Corporation filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Exxon Mobil Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014) Modified on 12/17/2014 (beS, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS re #400 Notice (Other) filed by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc., #402 Notice (Other) filed by Allied Packing and Supply, Inc., Allied Packing and Supply, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting #397 STIPULATION Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Crane Co. Crane Co. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting #394 STIPULATION WITH re Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Asbestos Corporation Limited filed by Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 411 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference as to Plaintiffs and Defendants Thomas Dee, Carrier, Zurn, Riley Power and Cleaver Brooks held on 12/16/2014. Case partially settled. Agreements in principle reached with Defendants Cleaver Brooks & Thomas Dee Engineering.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 410 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brown, Russell) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 409 Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Republic Supply Company. (Sullivan, George) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 408 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dorsett & Jackson, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 12/29/2014. Replies due by 1/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brown, Russell) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 407 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Exxon Mobil Corporation filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal as to Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation)(Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 406 Application by Republic Supply Company APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXCUSING PARTY REPRESENTATIVE FROM PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF GEORGE S. SULLIVAN (Sullivan, George) (Filed on 12/12/2014) Modified on 12/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2014 Filing 405 NOTICE by Republic Supply Company DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY'S NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL (Sullivan, George) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 404 NOTICE of Appearance by George Seeber Sullivan, III FOR DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY'S (Sullivan, George) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 403 REPLY (re #378 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byHollingsworth & Vose Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company. (Goines, William) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 402 NOTICE by Allied Packing and Supply, Inc. Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Carlson, Stephen) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 401 NOTICE by Allied Packing and Supply, Inc. Notice of Partial Resolution in this Matter (Carlson, Stephen) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 400 NOTICE/Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc.. (Carlson, Stephen) (Filed on 12/10/2014) Modified on 12/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2014 Filing 399 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative For Summary Adjudication (Armstrong, William) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 398 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXCUSING ITS PRINCIPALS FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, AND DECLARATION OF ARTURO E. SANDOVAL IN SUPPORT THEREOF by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sandoval, Arturo) (Filed on 12/10/2014) Modified on 12/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2014 Filing 397 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Crane Co.. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 396 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of the Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/24/2014. Replies due by 12/31/2014. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - C, #4 Exhibit D - F, #5 Exhibit G - K, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of the Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/23/2014. Replies due by 12/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marte J. Bassi, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #4 Exhibit Exhibits D-F, #5 Exhibit Exhibits G-K, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 394 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Asbestos Corporation Limited filed by Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Engel, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 393 RESPONSE (re #378 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Lorillard Tobacco Company's Motion For Summary Judgment filed byCharles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Allen R. Gibbs, #2 Declaration of Russell A. Brown, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brown, Russell) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative For Summary Adjudication filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/19/2014. Replies due by 12/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Bradley P. Kaplan In Support Of Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative For Summary Adjudication, #2 Exhibit A-through F to Declaration, #3 Exhibit G to Declaration, #4 Exhibit H through J to Declaration, #5 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative For Summary Adjudication, #6 [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative For Summary Adjudication)(Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER graning #376 STIPULATION Granting Dismissal of Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc., a California corporation filed by Fryer-Knowles, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/4/2014. Fryer-Knowles, Inc., terminated(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #385 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/3/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #384 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by ITT Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/3/2014. ITT Corporation terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS FOR PRINCIPALS TO ATTEND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BY PHONE as to Defendants FMC Corporation, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Carver Pump Company, and Velan Valve Corporation. Principals and insurance carriers of the Requesting Defendants, with unlimited settlement authority, shall be on telephone standby for the entire duration of the conference.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/3/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 387 NOTICE by Zurn Industries, LLC APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING ITS PARTY REPRESENTATIVE FROM PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO ALLOW COUNSEL OTHER THAN LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL TO APPEAR; DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH R. BAIN (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 386 NOTICE by CBS Corporation OF PARTIAL RESOLUTION OF THIS MATTER (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 385 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY LLC)(Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 384 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by ITT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT, ITT CORPORATION)(Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 383 Proposed Order GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING ITS PARTY REPRESENTATIVE FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by FMC Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 382 NOTICE by FMC Corporation OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING ITS PARTY REPRESENTATIVE FROM PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF JUSTIN F. CRONIN (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS FOR PRINCIPALS TO ATTEND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BY PHONE as to Defendants Asbestos Corporation Limited, Armstrong International Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Imco Industries, Inc., Thomas Dee Engineering and Crane Co. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/2/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014) Modified on 12/3/2014 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2014 Filing 380 NOTICE by Allied Packing and Supply, Inc. Stipulation for Dismissal (Carlson, Stephen) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by John Karry Son (Son, John) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 378 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/5/2014. Replies due by 12/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alice Y. Chu in Support of Defendants Lorillard Tabacco Company and Hollingsworth & Vose Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Lorillard Tabacco Company and Hollingsworth & Vose Company's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Chu, Alice) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 377 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Partial Resolution (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 376 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Dismissal of Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc., a California corporation filed by Fryer-Knowles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Dismissal of Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc., a California corporation)(Stofferahn, Bryan) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting #372 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. RSCC Wire and Cable, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/10/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #371 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant A.O. Smith Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. A.O. Smith Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/1/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #370 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant American Optical Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. American Optical Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R.
November 6, 2014 Filing 372 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 11/6/2014. Replies due by 11/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 371 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant A.O. Smith Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 11/6/2014. Replies due by 11/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 370 MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant American Optical Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Responses due by 11/20/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 369 NOTICE by Ingersoll-Rand Company Partial Resolution of This Matter (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 368 NOTICE by Trane US, Inc. Partial Resolution of This Matter (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #365 STIPULATION Dismissing without Prejudice Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC filed by Georgia Pacific, LLC Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/10/2014. Georgia Pacific, LLC terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #364 STIPULATION Dismissing without Prejudice Defendant Honeywell International Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/10/2014. Honeywell International, Inc. terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 365 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing without Prejudice Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC filed by Georgia Pacific, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biderman, David) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 364 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing without Prejudice Defendant Honeywell International Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biderman, David) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori A. Cataldo for DEFENDANT RILEY POWER INC. (Cataldo, Lori) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER DISMISSING re #342 Notice (Other) filed by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc., Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting Motions: #339 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Oakfabco, Inc., f/k/a Kewanee Boiler Corp. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/15/2014. Oakfabco, Inc. terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting Motion #338 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL filed by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/15/2014. J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting Motions #336 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Homasote Company filed by Homosote Company Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/5/2014. Homosote Company terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting #354 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Terminating Motion #335 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. filed by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/15/2014. Hanson Permanente Cement Inc. terminated(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Notice and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference set for 12/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/16/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 356 STATUS REPORT Joint Report re: Meet and Confer of the Parties Pursuant to the Court's Further Settlement Conference Order of August 5, 2014 by CBS Corporation, FMC Corporation. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #348 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/4/2014. Travelers Indemnity Co., Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch, Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of America terminated.,. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 354 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #341 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/3/2014. Union Carbide Corporation terminated., (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #347 Stipulation Authorizing Electronic Service (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 3, 2014 Filing 351 Proposed Order re #342 Notice (Other) DISMISSING WITHOUT PREDJUDICE ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT ALLIED INSULATION SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc.. (Hoff, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Filing 350 NOTICE by William Powell Company OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (Sandoval, Arturo) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 349 Proposed Order DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF INTERVENORS COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS IN INTERVENTION AND PLAINTIFFS by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 348 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 347 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Electronic Service filed by CBS Corporation, FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting #344 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Washington Group International, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Morrison-Knudsen, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/21/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 345 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand byThomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc. (McCall, Michael) (Filed on 8/21/2014) Modified on 8/22/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2014 Filing 344 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Washington Group International, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Morrison-Knudsen, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #340 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by DAP, Inc., Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/18/2014. DAP, Inc. terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 342 NOTICE by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc. JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIED INSULATION SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. (Hoff, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 341 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otstott, George) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 340 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by DAP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice, As To DAP, Inc., #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marston, John) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 339 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Oakfabco, Inc., f/k/a Kewanee Boiler Corp. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 338 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL filed by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Huth, Hillary) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 337 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Homasote Company filed by Homosote Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice, #2 Proof of Service)(Glaspy, David) (Filed on 8/13/2014) Modified on 8/14/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2014 Filing 336 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Homasote Company filed by Homosote Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice, #2 Proof of Service)(Glaspy, David) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 335 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. filed by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc.. (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER grnting #332 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL filed by Metalclad Insulation Corporation,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/7/2014. Metalclad Insulation Corporation (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 FurtherSettlement Conference Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/5/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 Filing 332 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL filed by Metalclad Insulation Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting #329 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Washington Group International, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/25/2014. Washington Group International, Inc. terminated., (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Alden Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs (Brown, Russell) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 329 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Washington Group International, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Archer, Ron) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon A. Schwartz on Behalf of Plaintiffs (Schwartz, Damon) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #324 Stipulation TO VACATE DISCOVERY STAY (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #323 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Sequoia Ventures, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/7/2014. Sequoia Ventures, Inc. terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #322 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Bechtel Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/7/2014. Bechtel Corporation terminated (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 3, 2014 Filing 324 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE DISCOVERY STAY filed by CBS Corporation, FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Vacating The Discovery Stay)(Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Filing 323 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Sequoia Ventures, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 322 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Bechtel Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 321 NOTICE by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc. of Offer of Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 68 (Hoff, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #317 STIPULATION for DISMISSAL filed by John K. Bice, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/26/2014. John K. Bice, Inc. terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting Motions #318 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dimissal as to Defendant Parsons Corporation filed by Parsons Corporation Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/26/2014. Parsons Corporation terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 318 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dimissal as to Defendant Parsons Corporation filed by Parsons Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff Against Defendant Parsons Corporation)(Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 317 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by John K. Bice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #308 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Scott Company of California filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/24/2014. Scott Company of California terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 315 Statement Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.. (Watanabe, Eimi) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 314 Certificate of Interested Entities by Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. identifying corporate parent Mazarin, Inc. for Asbestos COrporation, Ltd. (Watanabe, Eimi) (Filed on 6/20/2014) Modified on 6/23/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2014 Filing 313 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation of Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68 (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting #301 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Rich-Tex, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/16/2014. Rich-Tex, Inc. terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting #300 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to defendant Certainteed Corporation Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/16/2014. Certainteed Corporation terminated(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting #299 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Melrath Gasket, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. Melrath Gasket Inc. terminated (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #296 Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Primesource Building Products, Inc. filed by Primesource Building Products, Inc., Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 308 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Scott Company of California filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER, granting #298 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #297 Stipulation DISMISSING ALL OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. Kelly Moore Paint Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting #295 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Foseco Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Foseco, Inc. terminated., Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting #294 Stipulation, filed by Elementis Chemicals, Inc.. Elementis Chemicals, Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #293 STIPULATION TO DISMISS BURNHAM LLC fka BURNHAM CORPORATION filed by Burnham LLC. Burnham LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #292 STIPULATION TO DISMISS FERRO ENGINEERING DIVISION OF ON MARINE SERVICES COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed by Ferro Engineering. Ferro Engineering (Division of On Marine Services)terminated., Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 13, 2014 Filing 301 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Rich-Tex, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 13, 2014 Filing 300 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to defendant Certainteed Corporation filed by Certainteed Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice, As to The Entire Case Against CertainTeed Corporation)(Lee, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 Filing 299 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Melrath Gasket, Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 298 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 297 STIPULATION OF PARTIES DISMISSING ALL OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. filed by Kelly Moore Paint Company. (Hilliard, Mark) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 296 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Primesource Building Products, Inc. filed by Primesource Building Products, Inc.. (Hansen-Baum, Elisabeth) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 295 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Foseco Inc. filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Juhren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 294 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Elementis Chemicals Inc. filed by Elementis Chemicals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal as to Defendant Elementis Chemicals Inc.)(Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 293 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS BURNHAM LLC fka BURNHAM CORPORATION filed by Burnham LLC. (Sullivan, George) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 292 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS FERRO ENGINEERING DIVISION OF ON MARINE SERVICES COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed by Ferro Engineering. (Menchini, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting #290 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO KAISER GYPSUM filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/5/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 290 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO KAISER GYPSUM filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #285 STIPULATION filed by John Crane, Inc.. John Crane, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/27/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Notice of Settlement Proceedings and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference Statements must be LODGED with Judge Spero's and Judge Corley's Chambers on or before 7/11/14. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/27/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 287 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Joseph Hilliard attorney of records for Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. (Hilliard, Mark) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 286 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Joseph Hilliard Attorney of Record for Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. (Hilliard, Mark) (Filed on 5/21/2014) Modified on 5/22/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2014 Filing 285 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Nelder, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting #283 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Company and Ford Motor Company terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/19/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 283 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 6/2/2014. Replies due by 6/9/2014. (Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 282 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2014 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 5/16/2014), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, Joseph C. Spero for Settlement Conference. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 281 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Archer, Ron) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 280 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by parties and counsel (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Archer, Ron) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by William Murray Hake (Hake, William) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ron G. Archer (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Archer, Ron) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER re #266 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/9/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Co., West American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch INTERVENORS' RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 275 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CBS Corporation. (Whitis, Gavin) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #223 Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Shell Oil Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/9/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 273 NOTICE by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 272 NOTICE by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 271 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bechtel Corporation identifying Corporate parent Bechtel Group, Inc. for Bechtel Corporation. (Huie, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Filing 270 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sequoia Ventures, Inc.CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS FOR DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 3-15 (Huie, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/14/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER DENYING re #267 Notice (Other) - Intervenors' Application for Order Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Personally Attending Initial Case Management Conference filed by Travelers Indemnity Co., et al. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER AS MODIFIED re #265 Notice filed by Parsons Corporation re EXCUSING LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Mr. Wah shall participate by telephone. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 267 NOTICE by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, John Crane, Inc., Safeco Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Co., West American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch Intervenors' Application for Order Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Personally Attending Initial Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Boland in Support of Intervenors' Application for Order Excluding Lead Trial Counsel from Personally Attending Initial Case Management Conference, #2 Proposed Order Granting Intervenors' Application for Order Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Attending Initial Case Management Conference)(Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 266 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Molly Anne Landon Friend (Friend, Molly) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 265 NOTICE by Parsons Corporation APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MELISSA M. CORICA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PARSONS CORPORATIONS APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT PARSONS CORPORATIONS APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)(Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 264 Statement RULE 26(a) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 263 Certificate of Interested Entities by Parker-Hannifin Corporation CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-15 (Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER re #227 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/2/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 261 Statement Defendant Primesource Building Products, Inc.'s Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(A)(1) by Primesource Building Products, Inc.. (Hansen-Baum, Elisabeth) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE by Foseco, Inc. INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVILPROCEDURE RULE 26(a)(1)(a) (LaFevers, Kathryn) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE by Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc. Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 26(A)(1) (Hansen-Baum, Elisabeth) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Co., West American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FRCP 26(a) (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 257 Intervenor COMPLAINT . Filed byTravelers Indemnity Co., West American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Co., West American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE by Velan Valve Corp. Of Its Initial Disclosure Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure, Rule 26 (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE by Allied Packing and Supply, Inc. INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FRCP 26(a) (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 253 NOTICE by Certainteed Corporation Of Its Initial Disclosure Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure, Rule 26 (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 252 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Company of California by mail re #245 Initial Disclosure - Rule 26 (Dumont, Richard) (Filed on 5/2/2014) Modified on 5/5/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2014 Filing 251 Statement Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by Burnham LLC. (Sullivan, George) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #246 Rule 26 Disclosure by Oakfabco, Inc. by mail (Dumont, Richard) (Filed on 5/2/2014) Modified on 5/5/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by George Seeber Sullivan, III for Burnham LLC (Sullivan, George) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 248 Statement INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 by Kelly Moore Paint Company. (Hilliard, Mark) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE by Carrier Corporation of Initial Disclosures in Accordance with Rule 26A (Egide, Sara) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE by Oakfabco, Inc. Rule 26 Disclosure (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dumont, Richard) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE by Scott Company of California Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dumont, Richard) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 244 Statement Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosure by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE by William Powell Company Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Sandoval, Arturo) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(A)(1) (Huth, Hillary) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 241 Statement Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26(A)(1) by Riley Power, Inc.. (Gustafson, Deborah) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 240 Statement DEFENDANT PARSONS CORPORATION'S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 by Parsons Corporation. (Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 239 Statement Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 238 Statement Defendant Carver Pump Company's Initial Disclosures by Carver Pump Company. (Loomis, Joni) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 237 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM Plaintiffs' Initial Pre-trial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE by Hill Brothers Chemical Company Initial Disclosures Under F.R.C.P. 26(A) (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 235 Statement RULE 26 (A)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 234 Statement Initial Disclosure Pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 26(a)(1) by Elementis Chemicals, Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 233 Statement Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 by Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc.. (Hoff, Kathryn) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 232 Statement Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosure by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE by Hill Brothers Chemical Company Initial Disclosures Under F.R.C.P. 26(a) (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 230 Statement Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 by Ferro Engineering. (Menchini, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 229 Statement DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Union Carbide Corporation. (Jackson, Warren) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 228 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and [Proposed] Order by Kathryn Lucille Hoff of behalf of Allied Insulation Supply, Inc. (Hoff, Kathryn) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2014 Filing 226 Statement DEFENDANT JOHN K. BICE CO., INC.'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) by John K. Bice, Inc.. (Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 30, 2014 Filing 225 Statement DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC.'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 by John Crane, Inc.. (Nelder, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 224 DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ANSWER to Complaint byParker-Hannifin Corporation. (Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 223 STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendant Shell Oil Company filed by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 222 Statement re #219 Notice of Appearance Defendant PrimeSource Building Products, Inc.'s Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 by Primesource Building Products, Inc.. (Hansen-Baum, Elisabeth) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE by Charles P. Lockett, Dori Lockett re #20 Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2014 Filing 220 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Anne Hansen-Baum (Hansen-Baum, Elisabeth) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Dennis O'Shea for Honeywell International Inc. (O'Shea, Daniel) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Dennis O'Shea for Georgia-Pacific LLC (O'Shea, Daniel) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 21, 2014 Filing 216 Disclosure Statement. Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company, Inc.'s Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 by Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc. (Hansen-Baum, Elisabeth) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Anne Hansen-Baum (Hansen-Baum, Elisabeth) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 17, 2014 Filing 214 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 Filing 213 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial byIMO Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE by CBS Corporation re #3 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Request for Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation No. 875 (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 211 Intervenor COMPLAINT . Filed byTravelers Indemnity Co., West American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Imo Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 209 Certificate of Interested Entities by Riley Power, Inc. (Gustafson, Deborah) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA re #199 Proposed Order filed by Union Oil Company of California. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/16/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO CHEVERON U.S.A. INC. re #198 Proposed Order filed by Chevron USA Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/16/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 3-15 (Huth, Hillary) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 205 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foseco, Inc. and Disclosure Statement (LaFevers, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting #194 Motion to Intervene (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 203 Letter from Justin F. Cronin, Attorney for Defendant CBS Corporation to Nichole Heuerman, Calendar Clerk and Courtroom Deputy Valerie Kyono, Civil Case Docketing. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kathryn Jean LaFevers On Behalf of Defendant Foseco, Inc. (LaFevers, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 201 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air and Liquid Systems Corporation with Disclosure (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #197 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 199 Proposed Order Joint Stipulation For Dismissal As To Defendant Union Oil Company of California; and [Proposed] Order by Union Oil Company of California. (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 198 Proposed Order Joint Stipulation For Dismissal As To Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.; and [Proposed] Order by Chevron USA Inc.. (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Grinnell LLC, and Certificate of Service filed by Grinnell LLC. (Almquist, Kristina) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 196 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified on 3/31/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Rebecca Bain ON BEHALF OF CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 194 MOTION to Intervene filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Co., Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/11/2014. Replies due by 4/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Stephen E. Carlson, #3 Proposed Order)(Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/28/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 192 Certificate of Interested Entities identifying corporate parent Hanson Permanente Cement, inc. by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified on 3/31/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/31/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 Filing 191 Certificate of Interested Entities identifying corporate parent KH1 Inc. by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified on 3/31/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber R. Craig (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber R. Craig (Craig, Amber) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/25/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation of Filing of State Court Answer (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Kaplan (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE by William Powell Company NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF NICOLE DENINE BROWN YUEN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT THE WM. POWELL COMPANY erroneously sued as THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo Esteban Sandoval on behalf of Defendant The Wm. Powell Company (Sandoval, Arturo) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE by Charles P Lockett, Dori Lockett Request to Appear Telephonically at the April 29, 2014 Case Management Conference (Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFEREENCE ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/18/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Case Management Conference vacated. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (Jackson, Warren) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 177 CLERKS NOTICE All parties shall appear telephonically for their case management conference scheduled for 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, April 24, 2014.(rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE by Elementis Chemicals, Inc Request to Appear Telephonically at the April 24, 2014 Case Management Conference (with Certificate of Service) (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Y Chu on Behalf of Lorillard Tobacco Company and Hollingsworth & Vose Company (Chu, Alice) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 174 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation re #173 Certificate of Interested Entities, Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Dislcosure (Jackson, Warren) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/12/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Filing 173 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Carbide Corporation Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jackson, Warren) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 172 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/23/14 has been Rescheduled to 4/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Otstott, Jr on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Otstott, George) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE by Fryer-Knowles, Inc. Notice of Filing State Court Answer (Egler, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary H. Huth for Defendant J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. (Huth, Hillary) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul-Erik Lannus for Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1)(Lannus, Paul-Erik) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 167 DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, CROSSCLAIM TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants byFord Motor Company. (Lannus, Paul-Erik) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE by John K. Bice, Inc. of Interested Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1-1 (Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Kannett (Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 164 ANSWER to Complaint byJohn K. Bice, Inc.. (Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Lucille Hoff (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing in state court and demand for jury trial, #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Hoff, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton for Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton for Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. of Filing State Court Answers (Nelder, Robert) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 159 Certificate of Interested Entities by John Crane, Inc. FRCP 7.1 and Local Civil Rule 3-16 (Nelder, Robert) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton for Defendant CertainTeed Corporation (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE AND JACK OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT BASF CATALYSTS LLC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT NMBFIL, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE by Metalclad Insulation Corporation 's Re-Filing of State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 150 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metalclad Insulation Corporation (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Alecia Elizabeth Cotton for Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Velan Valve Corp. 's Re-Filing of State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 147 Certificate of Interested Entities by Velan Valve Corp. (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Alecia Elizabeth Cotton for Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE by Certainteed Corporation 's Re-filing of State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 144 Certificate of Interested Entities by Certainteed Corporation (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Alecia Elizabeth Cotton for Defendant CertainTeed Corporation (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Huie NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS BECHTEL CORPORAITON AND SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (Huie, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Huie NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS BECHTEL CORPORATION AND SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (Huie, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Genuine Parts Company filed by Charles P Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Defendant Genuine Parts Company, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California filed by Charles P Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 138 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation filed by Charles P Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant BASF Catalysts LLC filed by Charles P Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Defendant BASF Catalysts, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc., as successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation filed by Charles P Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Defendant BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc., #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant NMBFIL, Inc. filed by Charles P Lockett, Dori Lockett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiffs Against Defendant NMBFIL, Inc., #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Allinson, Edward) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byRiley Power, Inc.. (Gustafson, Deborah) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah M.D. Gustafson on Behalf of Defendant Riley Power Inc. (Gustafson, Deborah) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 132 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Union Oil Company of California. (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 131 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Oil Company of California Union Oil Company of California's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 130 Answer to Amended Complaint Union Oil Company of California's Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to First Amended Complaint byUnion Oil Company of California. (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Davies Notice of Appearances on Behalf of Union Oil Company of California (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 128 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chevron USA Inc.. (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 127 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron USA Inc. Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE by Chevron USA Inc. Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to First Amended Complaint (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Davies Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to First Amended Complaint (Davies, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 124 Certificate of Interested Entities by William Powell Company (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 123 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL byWilliam Powell Company. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 121 Statement Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.'s Initial Disclosure Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Kelly Moore Paint Company. (Hilliard, Mark) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Dumont on Behalf of Intervenors on Behalf of Their Suspended Insured, Scott Co. of California (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Re-Filing the Complaint in Intervention, #3 Notice of Re-Filing the Demand for Jury Trial)(Dumont, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE by Air and Liquid Systems Corporation of Re-Filing State Court Answer (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen R. Powell (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE by Foseco, Inc. of Re-Filing State Court Answer (LaFevers, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Jean LaFevers (LaFevers, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE by Burnham LLC Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Menchini, Robert) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Matthew Menchini on behalf of Burnham LLC fka Burnham Corporation (Menchini, Robert) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Vasquez (Vasquez, Michael) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE by DAP, Inc. NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 111 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 110 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hill Brothers Chemical Company (L.R. 3-16 Certification) (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 109 Statement Pursuant to FRCivP 7.1 by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE by Hill Brothers Chemical Company of Filing State Court Answer to Second Amended Complaint (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Primo Wilson (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Keri Avellini Donohue (Donohue, Keri) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Keith Renstrom (Renstrom, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE by Homosote Company of Refiling State Court Answer (Glaspy, David) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE by Homosote Company of Corporate Disclosure Statement (Glaspy, David) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Glaspy on behalf of Homasote Company (Glaspy, David) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE by Kelly Moore Paint Company of Re-filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Hilliard, Mark) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 98 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Atlas Copco AB for Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpi Galfayan (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE by Ingersoll-Rand Company Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Damages (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpi Galfayan (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE by ITT Corporation Of Filing State Court Answer to First Amended Complaint for Damages (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 92 Certificate of Interested Entities by ITT Corporation (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpi Galfayan (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE by Trane US, Inc. Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Trane US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Trane US, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpi Galfayan (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE by Ferro Engineering Division of ON Marine Services Company, a Delaware Corporation's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Menchini, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Matthew Menchini , Douglas G. Wah, and George S. Sullivan (Menchini, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE by Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Chew, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Chew on behalf of BorgWarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Chew, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Chew on behalf of BorgWarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Chew, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 82 Notice of Refiling State Court ANSWER to Complaint byBorgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.. (Chew, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 81 Statement Defendant BASF Catalysts LLC's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Catalyst LLC. (Peters, Matthew) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Peters on Behalf of Defendant BASF Catalysts LLC (Peters, Matthew) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Warren Pumps, LLC (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE by Warren Pumps, LLC of Re-Filing State Court Answer (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Cunningham (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fryer-Knowles, Inc. (Egler, Steven) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Frederick Egler for Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A California Corporation (Egler, Steven) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lee Nelder For John Crane Inc (Nelder, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Cherie Barnes (Barnes, Michele) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonja E. Blomquist (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 71 Certificate of Interested Entities by Armstrong International, Inc. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint byArmstrong International, Inc.. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 69 Statement re #68 Notice of Appearance Defendant Shell Oil Companys Certification Of Interested Entities Or Persons Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 7.1 And Civil Local Rule 3-15 by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Joulani, Shady) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Shady Essa Joulani Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Shell Oil Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Joulani, Shady) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE by Elementis Chemicals, Inc Notice of Filing of State Court Answer with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Defendant Elementis Chemicals Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Damages)(Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carver Pump Company re #62 Notice of Appearance, #63 Certificate of Interested Entities, #64 Notice (Other), Proof of Service (Loomis, Joni) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE by FMC Corporation OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE by Carver Pump Company Defendant Carver Pump Company's Notice of Re-filing Answer To Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint For Damages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant Carver Pump Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Damages)(Loomis, Joni) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 63 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carver Pump Company Carver Pump Company (Loomis, Joni) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni Lynn Loomis Notice of Appearance of Joni Lynn Loomis On Behalf of Defendant Carver Pump Company (Loomis, Joni) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE by Hollingsworth & Vose Company of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Goines, William) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE by Lorillard Tobacco Company of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Goines, William) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Marie Corica DEFENDANT PARSONS CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE by Parsons Corporation NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL (Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 57 Statement DEFENDANT PARSONS CORPORATION'S DISCLOSUSRE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 by Parsons Corporation. (Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 56 Statement DEFENDANT PARSONS CORPORATION'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by Parsons Corporation. (Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by Parsons Corporation (Corica, Melissa) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by FMC Corporation OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, RULE 7.1 AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-16(C) (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE by FMC Corporation OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell William Schatz, Jr (Schatz, Russell) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin David Whitis (Whitis, Gavin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kristin Egide (Egide, Sara) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE by Carrier Corporation re #46 Notice (Other) of Demand for Jury Trial (Egide, Sara) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE by Carrier Corporation Of Re-filing of State Court Answer (Egide, Sara) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carrier Corporation (Egide, Sara) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE by NMBFIL, Inc. re #43 Notice (Other) of Demand for Jury Trial (Ruiz, Ferlin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE by NMBFIL, Inc. of Re-filing of State Court Answer (Ruiz, Ferlin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by NMBFIL, Inc. (Ruiz, Ferlin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Ferlin Peregrino Ruiz and Lance W. Wilson (Ruiz, Ferlin) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE by Crane Co. NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND STATE COURT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 39 Statement DEFENDANT CRANE CO.'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by Crane Co.. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Edward Soskin (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 37 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Gunter, William) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oakfabco, Inc... (Gunter, William) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zurn Industries, LLC (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William Joseph Gunter of Defendant Oakfabco, Inc. (Gunter, William) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Rebecca Bain ON BEHALF OF ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC (Bain, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Thomas Cordery for Defendant Rich-Tex, Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Thomas Cordery on behalf of Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Hilliard (Hilliard, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CBS Corporation SERVICE OF ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT AND STANDING ORDER (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lorillard Tobacco Company identifying Corporate Parent Lorillard, Inc. for Lorillard Tobacco Company. Hollingsworth & Vose Company has no parent company to disclose. (Goines, William) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 27 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company. (Goines, William) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Goines on Behalf of Defendants Lorillard Tobacco Company and Hollingsworth & Vose Company (Goines, William) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Exxon Mobil Corporation.. (Armstrong, William) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Armstrong, William) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Armstrong (Armstrong, William) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grinnell LLC (Almquist, Kristina) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Francia Almquist for Defendant Grinnell LLC & Certificate of Service (Almquist, Kristina) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 20 Notice of Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Joinder, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Joinder, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Joinder, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Joinder)(Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2014 Filing 19 Statement (Corporate Disclosure Statement) by General Electric Company. (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elementis Chemicals, Inc.. (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elementis Chemicals, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Elementis Global LLC, Elementis US Limited, Elementis US Holdings Inc., Elementis US Investments Ltd., Elementis plc for Elementis Chemicals, Inc. with Certificate of Service (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick with Certificate of Service (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/28/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CBS Corporation.. (Back, Mary) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Lynn Rivera (Rivera, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin David Whitis (Whitis, Gavin) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Tag Along Action by CBS Corporation (Back, Mary) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/27/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action by CBS Corporation (Back, Mary) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/27/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Back, Mary) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1442(A)(1) (Federal Officer); Demand for Jury Trial and Declaration of Mary K. Back from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG13686746. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8322679). Filed byCBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 3 of 3, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Back, Mary) (Filed on 1/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockett et al v. AO Smith Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: George Seeber Sullivan, III
Represented By: Robert Matthew Menchini
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Rivera
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Rebecca Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: William H. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Dennis O'Shea
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Kristina Francia Almquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Dennis O'Shea
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Dumont
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah M.D. Gustafson
Represented By: Lori A. Cataldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy D. Huie
Represented By: Marte J. Bassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AO Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Insulation Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Lucille Hoff
Represented By: Molly Anne Landon Friend
Represented By: Stephen Earl Carlson
Represented By: William Murray Hake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Regan
Represented By: Sonja E. Blomquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.
Represented By: Eimi Watanabe
Represented By: Robert G. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Catalyst LLC
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Corporation
Represented By: Marte J. Bassi
Represented By: Jeremy D. Huie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Chew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Corporation
Represented By: George Seeber Sullivan, III
Represented By: Robert Matthew Menchini
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: John Karry Son
Represented By: Sara Kristin Egide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Joni Lynn Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Rivera
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Rivera
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Represented By: Mary Katherine Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Alecia Elizabeth Cotton
Represented By: Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton
Represented By: Jennifer J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc.
Represented By: Amee Ann Mikacich
Represented By: Brian Michael Davies
Represented By: Eugene Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Rebecca Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Michele Cherie Barnes
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Represented By: Peter K. Renstrom
Represented By: Jeffrey Primo Wilson
Represented By: John Michael Marston
Represented By: Keri Avellini Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorsett & Jackson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementis Chemicals, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: William H. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabco Automotive Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferro Engineering
Represented By: Robert Matthew Menchini
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Represented By: George Seeber Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Russell William Schatz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Paul-Erik Lannus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Jean LaFevers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Stofferahn
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Represented By: Rachel Hannah Leonard
Represented By: Steven Frederick Egler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Dennis O'Shea
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Kristina Francia Almquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Judin
Represented By: Amber R. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Michael Anthony Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Represented By: Alice Y Chu
Represented By: William J. Goines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homosote Company
Represented By: David Michael Glaspy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Dennis O'Shea
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Dennis O'Shea
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Karleen Frances Murphy
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Justin M. Tafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hillary H. Huth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Nathan Endick
Represented By: Kurt Tyler Putnam
Represented By: Robert Lee Nelder
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Bice, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Kim Thai
Represented By: Anthony Gabriel Bentivegna
Represented By: Mark S. Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Amber R. Craig
Represented By: Jennifer Judin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Moore Paint Company
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorillard Tobacco Company
Represented By: Alice Y Chu
Represented By: William J. Goines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremount Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melrath Gasket Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Alecia Elizabeth Cotton
Represented By: Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton
Represented By: Jennifer J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMBFIL, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Douglas Wilson
Represented By: Ferlin Peregrino Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kewanee Boiler Corp.
Represented By: Richard D. Dumont
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Reno Cross
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsons Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Represented By: Melissa Marie Corica
Represented By: Robert Vincent Betette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys Manny Moe and Jack of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primesource Building Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Todd McCall
Represented By: Elisabeth Anne Hansen-Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Supply Company
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Represented By: George Seeber Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich-Tex, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Stoker Corporation
Represented By: Deborah M.D. Gustafson
Represented By: Lori A. Cataldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Iron Works
Represented By: Deborah M.D. Gustafson
Represented By: Lori A. Cataldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire and Cable, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Company of California
Represented By: Richard D. Dumont
Represented By: Paul Joseph Gamba
Represented By: Timothy David Frost Barteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Shady Essa Joulani
Represented By: Ross Morton Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunkenheimer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Arturo Esteban Sandoval
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Represented By: Khaled Taqi-Eddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc.
Represented By: Michael Todd McCall
Represented By: Elisabeth Anne Hansen-Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Warren Alan Jackson
Represented By: John R. Brydon
Represented By: George A. Otstott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company of California
Represented By: Brian Michael Davies
Represented By: Eugene Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Amee Ann Mikacich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Alecia Elizabeth Cotton
Represented By: Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Group International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Rebecca Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Packing and Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Earl Carlson
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Bradley P. Kaplan
Represented By: William H. Armstrong
Represented By: Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles P. Lockett
Represented By: Edward Page Allinson
Represented By: Ethan A Horn
Represented By: Damon A. Schwartz
Represented By: Matthew Peter Juhren
Represented By: Ron G. Archer
Represented By: Russell Alden Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dori Lockett
Represented By: Edward Page Allinson
Represented By: Ethan A Horn
Represented By: Damon A. Schwartz
Represented By: Matthew Peter Juhren
Represented By: Ron G. Archer
Represented By: Russell Alden Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Represented By: Jill James Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Earl Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Represented By: Jill James Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Earl Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Represented By: Jill James Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Earl Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Travelers Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Represented By: Jill James Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Earl Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Zurich American Insurance Company, US Branch
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Represented By: Jill James Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Earl Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?