Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Garwood

Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Mark Garwood, Allan Bortel, Richard Smith, Carolyn Horan, James Williams, Jeffrey Tappan, Michael Rice and Nancy Grauten
Case Number: 3:2014cv00390
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/11/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference continued to 6/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/11/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re Request for Telephonic Appearances at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/20/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re Request for Telephonic Appearances at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/18/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting Plaintiff's Request to be Excused from Personal Appearance at Settlement Conference re 48 Notice (Other) and 49 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/12/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REQUIRING PARTICIPATION AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 45 Notice. Absent further order from Judge Ryu, the parties and their insurers shall attend the settlement conference in person on February 23, 2015 and shall comply with all aspects of [ 44] Order Setting Settlement Conference. If February 24, 2015 is more convenient for the parties, they should so stipulate and contact Judge Ryu on or before February 6, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/03/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2015. Case Management Conference rescheduled for 1/20/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION Continuing Pretrial and Trial Dates. Discovery cut-off: 5/4/2015. Dispositive motions to be heard by 9/9/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2015 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 1/25/2016 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/14/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/19/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RESOLVING DISPUTE OVER LOAN FILES re 29 Letter. I ORDER counsel for the FDIC, with input from defendants, to develop a protocol for the expeditious, cost-effective review of the records by the defendants. The FDIC shall invoice the defenda nts for its entire cost of the review, including obtaining the boxes from storage and monitoring defendants' review of same, and defendants shall pay the FDIC within 30 days of their receipt of the invoice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/06/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/14/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/6/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Garwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Garwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Bortel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tappan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Grauten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Abraham
Represented By: Kerry L. Duffy
Represented By: Charles G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?