Senne et al v. Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, et al
Plaintiff: Lee Smith, Nick Giarraputo, Matt Frevert, Joseph Newby, Matt Gorgen, Aaron Senne, Kris Watts, Jorge Minyety, Matt Lewis, Gaspar Santiago, Jorge Jimenez, Craig Bennigson, Lauren Gagnier, Omar Aguilar, Ryan Khoury, Matt Lawson, Kyle Nicholson, Jeff Nadeau, David Quinowski, Tim Pahuta, Leonard Davis, Jon Gaston, Oliver Odle, Brandon Henderson, Ryan Hutson, Kyle Woodruff, Jose Diaz, Edwin Maysonet, Yadel Marti, Witer Jimenez, Jake Opitz, Grant Duff, Edgardo Baez, Brandon Pinckney, Jake Kahaulelio, Matt Daly, Justin Murray, Dustin Pease, Mark Wagner, Mitch Hilligoss, Ryan Kiel, Helder Velaquez, Michael Liberto, Brad McAtee, Brett Newsome, Daniel Britt, Roberto Ortiz, Brad Stone and Aaron Meade
Defendant: Pittsburgh Baseball P'ship, Cleveland Indians Basebell Co., L.P., Baltimore Orioles, L.P., Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Baltimore Orioles, Inc., Tampa Bay Rays Baseball Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Chicago White Sox Ltd., Washington Nationals Baseball Club, LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Angels Baseball LP, Pittsburgh Baseball, Inc., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Cleveland Indians Baseball Co., Inc., The Phillies L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Phillies, The, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Miami Marlins, L.P., Atlanta National League Baseball Club, Inc., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Allan Huber Selig, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Chicago Baseball Holdings, LLC, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Padres L.P., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLP, AZPB L.P. and Office of the Commissioner of Baseball an unincorporated association doing business as Major League Baseball
Intervenor: Cody Sedlock, Edwin Mateo, Luis Yarnel Diaz, Barret Loux, Aaron Dott, Kyle Johnson and Bryan Henry
Case Number: 3:2014cv00608
Filed: February 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

<
Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE ALL PENDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE. denying #1083 Motion in Limine; denying #1084 Motion in Limine; denying #1085 Motion in Limine; denying #1087 Motion in Limine; denying #1088 Motion in Limine; denying #1089 Motion in Limine; denying #1090 Motion in Limine; denying #1091 Motion in Limine; denying #1092 Motion in Limine; denying #1093 Motion in Limine; denying #1094 Motion in Limine; denying #1095 Motion in Limine; denying #1096 Motion in Limine. Signed on 5/10/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ORDER VACATING DATES; SETTING FILING DATE FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/10/2022. Motion For Preliminary Approval due by 7/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedi ngs, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (klh, COURT S TAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1122 Letter from Clifford H. Pearson and Elise M. Bloom Regarding Settlement of Case. (Pearson, Clifford) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Zoom Status Conference held on 5/9/2022. Pretrial Conference and all pending Motions in Limine re-set for 5/10/2022 12:00 PM PDT in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Total Time in Court: 2 M Plaintiff Attorney: Clifford Pearson. Defendant Attorney: Elise Bloom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2022)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1120 Exhibit List Amended Joint Exhibit List by Aaron Senne.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Amended Joint Exhibit List)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER REFERRING CASE to District Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/3/2022. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1118 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing as to #1091 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude References to Club Finances, Owners Wealth, or Executive Compensation, #1084 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Evidence of Work Other Than in Team-Related Activities, #1096 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude References to Lobbying Efforts, #1087 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiffs Relinquished Their Rights to Be Paid Minimum and Overtime Wages by Agreeing to be Paid Lower Wages in the Uniform Player Contract, #1090 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude References to the Antitrust Exemption or Alleged Collusion," , #1089 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Players Were on the Disabled or Inactive List, #1095 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #7 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Players Were "Chasing A Dream", #1085 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Evidence of Arizona Pre-Class Liability and Damages, , #1094 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude References to Players Living Conditions,, #1083 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion In Limine No. 1 to Permit Testimony Regarding the Broadcast Revenue Related to Major League Spring Training Games, , #1088 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Signing Bonuses Paid Outside the Pay Periods at Issue in this Case and Improper Wage Credits, , #1086 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding the Primary Beneficiary Test,, #1092 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Plaintiffs' Litigation History, #1093 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Evidence Not Timely Produced in Discovery. reset for 5/9/2022 02:00 PM PDT in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by t elephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1117 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/3/2022. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Total Time: 30 M Plaintiff Attorney: Cliff Pearson. Defendant Attorney: Elise Bloom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1116 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Pretrial Conference and #1091 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude References to Club Finances, Owners Wealth, or Executive Compensation, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition, #1084 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Evidence of Work Other Than in Team-Related Activities, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition, #1096 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude References to Lobbying Efforts, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition, #1087 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiffs Relinquished Their Rights to Be Paid Minimum and Overtime Wages by Agreeing to be Paid Lower Wages in the Uniform Player Contract, with attac, #1090 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude References to the Antitrust Exemption or Alleged Collusion," with attached Plaintiffs' Opposition, #1089 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Players Were on the Disabled or Inactive List, with attached Defendants' Opposition, #1095 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #7 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Players Were "Chasing A Dream", with attached Defendants' Opposition, #1085 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Evidence of Arizona Pre-Class Liability and Damages, with attached Plaintiffs' Opposition, #1094 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude References to Players Living Conditions, with attached Plaintiffs' Opposition, #1083 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion In Limine No. 1 to Permit Testimony Regarding the Broadcast Revenue Related to Major League Spring Training Games, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition, #1088 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Signing Bonuses Paid Outside the Pay Periods at Issue in this Case and Improper Wage Credits, with attached Defendants' Opposition, #1086 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding the Primary Beneficiary Test, with attached Defendants' Opposition, #1092 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Plaintiffs' Litigation History, with attached Defendants' Opposition, #1093 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Evidence Not Timely Produced in Discovery, with attached Defendants' Opposition set for 5/4/2022 at 2:00 PM has been advanced to the SAME DAY at 12:00 PM PDT in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 12:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebro adcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zo om/., (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #1075 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 23, 2022 Filing 1114 ERRATA re #1112 Reply to Opposition/Response Errata to Reply Memo ISO Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration by Yadel Marti. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 4/23/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1113 Declaration of Samuel Kornhauser in Support of #1112 Reply to Opposition/Response Declaration of Samuel Kornhauser ISO Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration filed byYadel Marti. (Related document(s) #1112 ) (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1112 REPLY (re #1075 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) Marti Plaintiffs' Reply Memo re Reconsideration filed byYadel Marti. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1111 OBJECTIONS to re #1101 Proposed Pretrial Order Objections to Joint Exhibit List by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1110 OBJECTIONS to re #1103 Proposed Jury Instructions Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1109 OBJECTIONS to re #1103 Proposed Jury Instructions Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 Order. Signed 4/18/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #1079 Amended Stipulation RE: Docs filed Under Seal in Connection with Parties' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions to Exclude.This documents relates to dkt. nos: #970 , #972 , #981 , #982 , #985 , #990 , #1012 , #1016 and #1031 (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1107 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1075 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) in Response to the Marti Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Declaration of Raymond P. Boucher)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1106 Proposed Voir Dire by Aaron Senne (Jointly Proposed Juror Questionnaire and Voir Dire. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1105 OBJECTIONS to re #1103 Proposed Jury Instructions Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Proposed Verdict Form by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1104 OBJECTIONS to re #1103 Proposed Jury Instructions by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1103 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aaron Senne Joint Submission Concerning Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1102 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Trial Brief by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1101 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint [Proposed] Pretrial Order by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1100 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants Trial Brief on Controlling Issues of Law by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1099 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1075 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 Order. Signed 4/15/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #1097 Stipulation Re: Deadlines For Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1097 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1096 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude References to Lobbying Efforts, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1095 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #7 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Players Were "Chasing A Dream", with attached Defendants' Opposition filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1094 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude References to Players Living Conditions, with attached Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1093 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Evidence Not Timely Produced in Discovery, with attached Defendants' Opposition filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1092 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Plaintiffs' Litigation History, with attached Defendants' Opposition filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1091 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude References to Club Finances, Owners Wealth, or Executive Compensation, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1090 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude References to the Antitrust Exemption or Alleged Collusion," with attached Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1089 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Players Were on the Disabled or Inactive List, with attached Defendants' Opposition filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1088 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Signing Bonuses Paid Outside the Pay Periods at Issue in this Case and Improper Wage Credits, with attached Defendants' Opposition filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1087 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiffs Relinquished Their Rights to Be Paid Minimum and Overtime Wages by Agreeing to be Paid Lower Wages in the Uniform Player Contract, with attached Defendants' Opposition filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1086 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding the Primary Beneficiary Test, with attached Defendants' Opposition filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1085 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Evidence of Arizona Pre-Class Liability and Damages, with attached Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1084 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Evidence of Work Other Than in Team-Related Activities, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1083 MOTION in Limine Defendants Motion In Limine No. 1 to Permit Testimony Regarding the Broadcast Revenue Related to Major League Spring Training Games, with attached Plaintiffs Opposition filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 ORDER. Signed 4/11/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #1081 Stipulation re Procedure for Deposition Designations. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 10, 2022 Filing 1081 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Procedure for Deposition Designations filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/10/2022)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1080 TRIAL BRIEF Joint Submission Concerning the Trial Plan by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1079 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1076 Status Conference,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Amended Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Documents Filed Under Seal in Connection with the Parties Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions to Exclude filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 Order. Signed 4/7/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #1077 Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule on Marti Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave for Reconsideration of Orders.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
April 7, 2022 See Order #1078 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1075 Marti Plaintiffs MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Responses/Opposition due by 4/15/2022. Replies due by 4/22/2022. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1077 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Briefing Schedule on the Marti Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Consolidating Marti and Senne Cases and Order Sua Sponte Striking Marti Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/6/2022)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1076 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Status Conference held on 3/28/2022. Revised joint stipulation to file documents under seal due by 4/8/2022. Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration #1075 - Responses/Opposition due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. Attorney for Plaintiff: Garret Broshuis, Bobby Pouya, Cliff Pearson, Marc Wallenstein Attorney for Defendant: Elise Bloom, Adam Lupion Digital Recording Time: Zoom Webinar Time: 2:02-2:52. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2022)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1075 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1074 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Trial Plan Pursuant to ECF No. 843 by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1073 STIPULATION re #1067 Order Supplemental Joint Stipulation Re: The Seasonal Amusement or Recreational Establishment Exemption filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1072 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference re: Joint Stipulation Regarding Documents Filed Under Seal in Connection with the Parties Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions to Exclude #1066 set for 3/25/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and r ebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.go v/zoom/. (Related documents(s) #1066 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 ORDER RE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE, AND MOTION TO STRIKE (Dkt. Nos. 969, 971, 979, 980, 986, 987, 988, 1025). Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 10, 2022. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1070 Statement re #1064 Order, Defendants Statement Regarding Redactions in the Courts March 10, 2022 Order Regarding Dispositive Motions, Motions to Exclude, and Motion to Strike by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1069 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2022 has been specially set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/j cs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. Ther e is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1068 NOTICE by Aaron Senne re #1063 Order of March 10, 2022 (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO PROVIDE LIST OF DISPUTED FACTS RE SEASONAL AMUSEMENT EXEMPTION by March 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 14, 2022. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 12, 2022 Filing 1066 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Documents Filed Under Seal in Connection with the Parties Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions to Exclude filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/12/2022)
March 12, 2022 Filing 1065 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Paul Boucher (Boucher, Raymond) (Filed on 3/12/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCKET NO. 1063. The parties shall file any proposed redactions, or a statement that they do not seek any redactions, no later than March 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 10, 2022. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ORDER Re Dispositive Motions, Motions to Exclude, and Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 10, 2022. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2022 Filing 1062 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Re: The Seasonal Amusement or Recreational Establishment Exemption filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER RE #1060 LETTER REQUESTING COURT'S GUIDANCE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 10, 2022. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Filing 1060 Letter from the Parties Requesting the Courts Guidance with Respect to the Joint Stipulation of Undisputed Facts. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ORDER. Signed 3/3/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #1058 Stipulation Regarding Supplemental Damage Calculations. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1058 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Supplemental Damage Calculations filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER. Signed 3/2/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #1056 Stipulation Changing Time. Joint Submission due 3/10/2022.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1056 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1052 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1055 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1054 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1053 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/16/22, before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 9:31 - 11:49. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1050 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Related documents(s) #1050 ) (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 3/1/2022: Corrected proceeding date. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2022 Filing 1052 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2022 re #979 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings with Respect to "Save America's Pastime Act" Defense filed by Aaron Senne, #1025 MOTION to Strike (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Daubert Motions and Improper Rebuttal Reports; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Aaron Senne, #980 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, #988 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants (Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants) filed by Aaron Senne, #971 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations, Reports, and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D. filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, AZPB L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Sterling Mets L.P., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, #969 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, AZPB L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Sterling Mets L.P., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, #986 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Senne, #987 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Report and Testimony of Erica L. Groshen, Ph.D. filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, AZPB L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Sterling Mets L.P., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP. Motions taken under submission. Digital Recorder: Zoom Webinar Time: 9:31-11:49. Plaintiff Attorney: Garrett Broshuis, Bobby Pouya, Dan Warshaw, Clifford Pearson, Mark Wallenstein, Samuel Kornhauser. Defendant Attorney: Elise Bloom, Adam Lupion. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2022) Modified on 2/16/2022: Matter transcribed by Tara (Bauer) Jauregui (ECHO Reporting). (rjd, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2022 Filing 1051 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1050 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 13, 2022 Filing 1049 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-11-22, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1046 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Related documents(s) #1046 ) (las, ) (Filed on 2/13/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1048 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1047 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2022 re #1041 MOTION to Bifurcate (Notice of Motion and Motion to Bifurcate Class Claims from Individual Claims) filed by Aaron Senne - GRANTED #979 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings with Respect to "Save America's Pastime Act" Defense filed by Aaron Senne, #1025 MOTION to Strike (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Daubert Motions and Improper Rebuttal Reports; filed by Aaron Senne, #980 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, #988 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants (Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants) filed by Aaron Senne, #971 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations, Reports, and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D. filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, AZPB L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Sterling Mets L.P., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, #969 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, AZPB L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Sterling Mets L.P., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, #986 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Senne, #987 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Report and Testimony of Erica L. Groshen, Ph.D. filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, AZPB L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Sterling Mets L.P., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP. Continued Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, record ing, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.u scourts.gov/zoom/. Total Time in Court: 3 H 22 M. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Garrett Broshuis, Bobby Pouya, Dan Warshaw, Clifford Pearson, Thomas Nolan, Samuel Kornhauser. Defendant Attorney: Elise Bloom, Adam Lupion, Mark Batten. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1046 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1045 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1041 MOTION to Bifurcate (Notice of Motion and Motion to Bifurcate Class Claims from Individual Claims) ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #1038 Motion for Leave to File to File Motion to Decertify Rule 23 Classes and FLSA Collective. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1043 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1042 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Michelle Manning (Manning, Jill) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1041 MOTION to Bifurcate (Notice of Motion and Motion to Bifurcate Class Claims from Individual Claims) filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 2/10/2022. Replies due by 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1040 REPLY (re #1038 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Decertification of the Rule 23 Classes and FLSA Collective ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1039 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1038 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Decertification of the Rule 23 Classes and FLSA Collective ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Exhibit 1)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1038 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Decertification of the Rule 23 Classes and FLSA Collective filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1037 REPLY (re #1025 MOTION to Strike (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Daubert Motions and Improper Rebuttal Reports; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byAaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1036 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1025 MOTION to Strike (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Daubert Motions and Improper Rebuttal Reports; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1035 Statement re #1031 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Statement in Partial Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Defendants Material Should Be Sealed in Connection with Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER of USCA as to #947 21-80091. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1033 REPLY (re #979 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings with Respect to "Save America's Pastime Act" Defense ) filed byAaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1032 REPLY (re #986 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1031 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #29 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #31 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #33 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #35 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 38, #36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 39, #37 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 40, #38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 41, #39 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 42, #40 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 43, #41 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 44, #42 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 45)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1030 REPLY (re #988 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants (Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants) ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1029 REPLY (re #980 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1028 REPLY (re #987 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Report and Testimony of Erica L. Groshen, Ph.D. ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1027 REPLY (re #971 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations, Reports, and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D. ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1026 REPLY (re #969 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1025 MOTION to Strike (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Daubert Motions and Improper Rebuttal Reports; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 12/22/2021. Replies due by 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Proposed Order)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1024 Statement re #1016 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Statement in Partial Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1023 DECLARATION of Brian Kriegler, PH.D. in Opposition to #971 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations, Reports, and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D. (Declaration of Brian Kriegler, Ph.D. in Response to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations, Reports, and Testimony of Dr. Brian Kriegler, Ph.D.) filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #971 ) (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1022 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #971 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations, Reports, and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D. ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1021 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #969 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1020 EXHIBITS re #1019 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Exhibits 50 - 100 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50, #2 Exhibit 51, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 53, #5 Exhibit 54, #6 Exhibit 55, #7 Exhibit 56, #8 Exhibit 57, #9 Exhibit 58, #10 Exhibit 59, #11 Exhibit 60, #12 Exhibit 61, #13 Exhibit 62, #14 Exhibit 63, #15 Exhibit 64, #16 Exhibit 65, #17 Exhibit 66, #18 Exhibit 67, #19 Exhibit 68, #20 Exhibit 69, #21 Exhibit 70, #22 Exhibit 71, #23 Exhibit 72, #24 Exhibit 73, #25 Exhibit 74, #26 Exhibit 75, #27 Exhibit 76, #28 Exhibit 77, #29 Exhibit 78, #30 Exhibit 79, #31 Exhibit 80, #32 Exhibit 81, #33 Exhibit 82, #34 Exhibit 83, #35 Exhibit 84, #36 Exhibit 85, #37 Exhibit 86, #38 Exhibit 87, #39 Exhibit 88, #40 Exhibit 89, #41 Exhibit 90, #42 Exhibit 91, #43 Exhibit 92, #44 Exhibit 93, #45 Exhibit 94, #46 Exhibit 95, #47 Exhibit 96, #48 Exhibit 97, #49 Exhibit 98, #50 Exhibit 99, #51 Exhibit 100)(Related document(s) #1019 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1019 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #980 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1018 EXHIBITS re #1016 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 67 - 100 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Redacted version of Exhibit 67, #2 Unredacted version of Exhibit 67, #3 Redacted version of Exhibit 68, #4 Unredacted version of Exhibit 68, #5 Redacted version of Exhibit 69, #6 Unredacted version of Exhibit 69, #7 Redacted version of Exhibit 70, #8 Unredacted version of Exhibit 70, #9 Redacted version of Exhibit 71, #10 Unredacted version of Exhibit 71, #11 Redacted version of Exhibit 72, #12 Unredacted version of Exhibit 72, #13 Redacted version of Exhibit 73, #14 Unredacted version of Exhibit 73, #15 Redacted version of Exhibit 74, #16 Unredacted version of Exhibit 74, #17 Redacted version of Exhibit 75, #18 Unredacted version of Exhibit 75, #19 Redacted version of Exhibit 76, #20 Unredacted version of Exhibit 76, #21 Redacted version of Exhibit 77, #22 Unredacted version of Exhibit 77, #23 Redacted version of Exhibit 78, #24 Unredacted version of Exhibit 78, #25 Redacted version of Exhibit 79, #26 Unredacted version of Exhibit 79, #27 Redacted version of Exhibit 80, #28 Unredacted version of Exhibit 80, #29 Redacted version of Exhibit 81, #30 Unredacted version of Exhibit 81, #31 Redacted version of Exhibit 82, #32 Unredacted version of Exhibit 82, #33 Redacted version of Exhibit 83, #34 Unredacted version of Exhibit 83, #35 Redacted version of Exhibit 84, #36 Unredacted version of Exhibit 84, #37 Redacted version of Exhibit 86, #38 Unredacted version of Exhibit 86, #39 Redacted version of Exhibit 93, #40 Unredacted version of Exhibit 93, #41 Redacted version of Exhibit 95, #42 Unredacted version of Exhibit 95, #43 Redacted version of Exhibit 96, #44 Unredacted version of Exhibit 96, #45 Redacted version of Exhibit 97, #46 Unredacted version of Exhibit 97, #47 Redacted version of Exhibit 98, #48 Unredacted version of Exhibit 98, #49 Redacted version of Exhibit 99, #50 Unredacted version of Exhibit 99, #51 Redacted version of Exhibit 100, #52 Unredacted version of Exhibit 100)(Related document(s) #1016 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1017 EXHIBITS re #1016 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 27 - 66 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Redacted version of Exhibit 27, #2 Unredacted version of Exhibit 27, #3 Redacted version of Exhibit 28, #4 Unredacted version of Exhibit 28, #5 Redacted version of Exhibit 29, #6 Unredacted version of Exhibit 29, #7 Redacted version of Exhibit 30, #8 Unredacted version of Exhibit 30, #9 Redacted version of Exhibit 31, #10 Unredacted version of Exhibit 31, #11 Redacted version of Exhibit 32, #12 Unredacted version of Exhibit 32, #13 Redacted version of Exhibit 33, #14 Unredacted version of Exhibit 33, #15 Redacted version of Exhibit 34, #16 Unredacted version of Exhibit 34, #17 Redacted version of Exhibit 35, #18 Unredacted version of Exhibit 35, #19 Redacted version of Exhibit 36, #20 Unredacted version of Exhibit 36, #21 Redacted version of Exhibit 37, #22 Unredacted version of Exhibit 37, #23 Redacted version of Exhibit 38, #24 Unredacted version of Exhibit 38, #25 Redacted version of Exhibit 39, #26 Unredacted version of Exhibit 39, #27 Redacted version of Exhibit 40, #28 Unredacted version of Exhibit 40, #29 Redacted version of Exhibit 41, #30 Unredacted version of Exhibit 41, #31 Redacted version of Exhibit 42, #32 Unredacted version of Exhibit 42, #33 Redacted version of Exhibit 43, #34 Unredacted version of Exhibit 43, #35 Redacted version of Exhibit 44, #36 Unredacted version of Exhibit 44, #37 Redacted version of Exhibit 45, #38 Unredacted version of Exhibit 45, #39 Redacted version of Exhibit 46, #40 Unredacted version of Exhibit 46, #41 Redacted version of Exhibit 47, #42 Unredacted version of Exhibit 47, #43 Redacted version of Exhibit 48, #44 Unredacted version of Exhibit 48, #45 Redacted version of Exhibit 49, #46 Unredacted version of Exhibit 49, #47 Redacted version of Exhibit 64, #48 Unredacted version of Exhibit 64, #49 Redacted version of Exhibit 65, #50 Unredacted version of Exhibit 65, #51 Redacted version of Exhibit 66, #52 Unredacted version of Exhibit 66)(Related document(s) #1016 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1016 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted version of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 6, #17 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 7, #18 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 7, #19 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 8, #20 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 8, #21 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 9, #22 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 9, #23 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 10, #24 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 10, #25 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 11, #26 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 11, #27 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 12, #28 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 12, #29 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 13, #30 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 13, #31 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 14, #32 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 14, #33 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 15, #34 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 15, #35 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 16, #36 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 16, #37 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 17, #38 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 17, #39 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 18, #40 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 18, #41 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 19, #42 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 19, #43 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 20, #44 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 20, #45 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 24, #46 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 24, #47 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 25, #48 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 25, #49 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 26, #50 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 26)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1015 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #988 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants (Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants) ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1014 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #987 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Report and Testimony of Erica L. Groshen, Ph.D. ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1013 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #986 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Woodfork)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1012 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 99, #4 Exhibit 100, #5 Exhibit 101, #6 Exhibit 102, #7 Exhibit 103, #8 Exhibit 104, #9 Exhibit 105, #10 Exhibit 106, #11 Exhibit 107, #12 Exhibit 108, #13 Exhibit 109, #14 Exhibit 111, #15 Exhibit 112, #16 Exhibit 113, #17 Exhibit 114, #18 Exhibit 115, #19 Exhibit 116, #20 Exhibit 117, #21 Exhibit 118, #22 Exhibit 119)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1011 EXHIBITS Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit 103, #4 Exhibit 104, #5 Exhibit 105, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 107, #8 Exhibit 108, #9 Exhibit 109, #10 Exhibit 110, #11 Exhibit 111, #12 Exhibit 112, #13 Exhibit 113, #14 Exhibit 114, #15 Exhibit 115`, #16 Exhibit 116, #17 Exhibit 117, #18 Exhibit 118, #19 Exhibit 119, #20 Exhibit 120, #21 Exhibit 121, #22 Exhibit 122, #23 Exhibit 123, #24 Exhibit 124, #25 Exhibit 125, #26 Exhibit 126, #27 Exhibit 127, #28 Exhibit 128, #29 Exhibit 129, #30 Exhibit 130, #31 Exhibit 131, #32 Exhibit 132, #33 Exhibit 133, #34 Exhibit 134, #35 Exhibit 135, #36 Exhibit 136, #37 Exhibit 137)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1010 EXHIBITS Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 61, #12 Exhibit 62, #13 Exhibit 63, #14 Exhibit 64, #15 Exhibit 65, #16 Exhibit 66, #17 Exhibit 67, #18 Exhibit 68, #19 Exhibit 69, #20 Exhibit 70, #21 Exhibit 71, #22 Exhibit 72, #23 Exhibit 73, #24 Exhibit 74, #25 Exhibit 75, #26 Exhibit 76, #27 Exhibit 77, #28 Exhibit 78, #29 Exhibit 79, #30 Exhibit 80, #31 Exhibit 81, #32 Exhibit 82, #33 Exhibit 83, #34 Exhibit 84, #35 Exhibit 85, #36 Exhibit 86, #37 Exhibit 87, #38 Exhibit 88, #39 Exhibit 89, #40 Exhibit 90, #41 Exhibit 91, #42 Exhibit 92, #43 Exhibit 93, #44 Exhibit 94, #45 Exhibit 95, #46 Exhibit 96, #47 Exhibit 97, #48 Exhibit 98, #49 Exhibit 99, #50 Exhibit 100)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1009 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1008 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #979 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings with Respect to "Save America's Pastime Act" Defense ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1007 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/27/21, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1006 Transcript Order,,, #1005 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2022. (Related documents(s) #1006 , #1005 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1006 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1005 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1004 Statement re #985 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Connection with Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants Defendants Statement in Partial Support by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1003 Statement re #981 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Statement in Partial Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1002 Declaration of Mark J. Swerdlin in Support of #982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byBaltimore Orioles, Inc., Baltimore Orioles, L.P.. (Related document(s) #982 ) (Swerdlin, Mark) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER. Signed 11/3/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #1000 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Mark Swerdlin for Baltimore Orioles, Inc, and Baltimore Orioles LP. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1000 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16587215.) filed by Baltimore Orioles, Inc., Baltimore Orioles, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Swerdlin, Mark) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 999 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #970 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D, #982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #972 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R.Broshuis)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 998 REQUEST FOR THUMB DRIVES CONTAINING ELECTRONIC CHAMBERS COPIES TO BE DELIVERED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE BY DECEMBER 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 2, 2021. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER. Signed 11/2/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #996 Stipulation Changing Time. Designating Parties have until November 9, 2021 to submit declarations in response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal in accordance with Civil Local Rule 79-5(e)(1).(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 996 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 995 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #981 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Garrett Ray Broshuis on behalf of Aaron Senne (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 994 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P. re #982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 993 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P. re #972 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 992 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P. re #970 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 991 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Senne re #985 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Connection with Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Report and Testimony of Erica L. Groshen, Ph.D. filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 2)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 989 EXHIBITS re #986 MOTION for Summary Judgment 80 - 115 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 80, #2 Exhibit 81 - 85, #3 Exhibit 86, #4 Exhibit 87, #5 Exhibit 88, #6 Exhibit 89, #7 Exhibit 90, #8 Exhibit 91, #9 Exhibit 92, #10 Exhibit 93, #11 Exhibit 94, #12 Exhibit 95 - 97, #13 Exhibit 98, #14 Exhibit 99 - 100, #15 Exhibit 101, #16 Exhibit 102 - 103, #17 Exhibit 104, #18 Exhibit 105 - 106, #19 Exhibit 107, #20 Exhibit 108 - 113, #21 Exhibit 114, #22 Exhibit 115)(Related document(s) #986 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 988 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants (Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants) filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis (Redacted), #2 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 987 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Report and Testimony of Erica L. Groshen, Ph.D. filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/24/2021. Replies due by 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Declaration of Denise N. Martin, Ph.D., #16 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 986 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/24/2021. Replies due by 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 - 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14 - 23, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit 25 - 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33 - 51, #15 Exhibit 52, #16 Exhibit 53, #17 Exhibit 54, #18 Exhibit 55, #19 Exhibit 56 - 57, #20 Exhibit 58, #21 Exhibit 59 - 62, #22 Exhibit 63, #23 Exhibit 64, #24 Exhibit 65 - 66, #25 Exhibit 67, #26 Exhibit 68 - 71, #27 Exhibit 72, #28 Exhibit 73, #29 Exhibit 74, #30 Exhibit 75, #31 Exhibit 76-78, #32 Exhibit 79)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 985 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Connection with Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants, #4 Unredacted Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Disclosed by Defendants, #5 Redacted Exhibit C to Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #6 Unredacted Exhibit C to Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #7 Redacted Exhibit D to Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #8 Unredacted Exhibit D to Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #9 Redacted Exhibit H-N to Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #10 Unredacted Exhbit H-N to Declaration of Garrett Broshuis)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 984 EXHIBITS re #981 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 94 - 115 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Redacted version of Exhibit 94, #2 Unredacted version of Exhibit 94, #3 Redacted version of Exhibits 95 - 97, #4 Unredacted version of Exhibits 95 - 97, #5 Redacted version of Exhibits 99 - 100, #6 Unredacted version of Exhibits 99 - 100, #7 Redacted version of Exhibits 102 - 103, #8 Unredacted version of Exhibits 102 - 103, #9 Redacted version of Exhibit 104, #10 Unredacted version of Exhibit 104, #11 Redacted version of Exhibits 105 - 106, #12 Unredacted version of Exhibits 105 - 106, #13 Redacted version of Exhibits 108 - 113, #14 Unredacted version of 108 - 113, #15 Redacted version of Exhibit 115, #16 Unredacted version of Exhibit 115)(Related document(s) #981 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 983 EXHIBITS re #981 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 25 - 91 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Redacted version of Exhibits 25 - 28, #2 Unredacted version of Exhibits 25 - 28, #3 Redacted version of Exhibits 33 - 51, #4 Unredacted version of Exhibits 33 - 51, #5 Redacted version of Exhibit 53, #6 Unredacted version of Exhibit 53, #7 Redacted version of Exhibits 56 - 57, #8 Unredacted version of Exhibits 56 - 57, #9 Redacted version of Exhibits 59 - 62, #10 Unredacted version of Exhibits 59 - 62, #11 Redacted version of Exhibits 65 - 66, #12 Unredacted version of Exhibits 65 - 66, #13 Redacted version of Exhibits 68 - 71, #14 Unredacted version of Exhibits 68 - 71, #15 Redacted version of Exhibit 74, #16 Unredacted version of Exhibit 74, #17 Redacted version of Exhibits 76 - 78, #18 Unredacted version of Exhibits 76 - 78, #19 Redacted version of Exhibits 81 - 85, #20 Unredacted version of Exhibits 81 - 85, #21 Redacted version of Exhibit 91, #22 Unredacted version of Exhibit 91)(Related document(s) #981 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 120, #5 Exhibit 121, #6 Exhibit 122, #7 Exhibit 123, #8 Exhibit 124, #9 Exhibit 125, #10 Exhibit 126, #11 Exhibit 127, #12 Exhibit 128, #13 Exhibit 129, #14 Exhibit 130, #15 Exhibit 131, #16 Exhibit 132, #17 Exhibit 133, #18 Exhibit 134, #19 Exhibit 135, #20 Exhibit 136, #21 Exhibit 137, #22 Exhibit 138, #23 Exhibit 139, #24 Exhibit 140, #25 Exhibit 141, #26 Exhibit 142, #27 Exhibit 143, #28 Exhibit 144, #29 Exhibit 145, #30 Exhibit 146, #31 Exhibit 147, #32 Exhibit 148, #33 Exhibit 149, #34 Exhibit 234, #35 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 235, #36 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 235, #37 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 236, #38 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 236, #39 Exhibit 250, #40 Exhibit 251, #41 Exhibit 252, #42 Exhibit 253, #43 Exhibit 254, #44 Exhibit 255, #45 Exhibit 256, #46 Exhibit 257, #47 Exhibit 258, #48 Exhibit 259, #49 Exhibit 260, #50 Exhibit 261)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 981 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Redacted version of Exhibits 3 - 12, #6 Unredacted version of Exhibits 3 - 12, #7 Redacted version of Exhibits 14 - 23, #8 Unredacted version of Exhibits 14 - 23)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 980 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/24/2021. Replies due by 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Declaration of Allan H. (Bud) Selig, #2 Declaration of Adam Tyhurst, #3 Declaration of Amanda Park, #4 Declaration of Angelica Romero, #5 Declaration of Bryan Humphreys, #6 Declaration of Carolina Calderon, #7 Declaration of Cathy Fahy, #8 Declaration of Christian Ruiz, #9 Declaration of Eric Flemming, #10 Declaration of John Norton, #11 Declaration of Janet Chant, #12 Declaration of Jennifer Springs, #13 Declaration of Jessica Anderson, #14 Declaration of Jodi Parsons, #15 Declaration of John Storiz, #16 Declaration of Juli Daedelow, #17 Declaration of Kelly Young, #18 Declaration of Kurt Hoevel, #19 Declaration of Laura Kallop, #20 Declaration of Leanna Priest, #21 Declaration of Lorelei Schlitz, #22 Declaration of Lori Beasley, #23 Declaration of Mark Cebelak, #24 Declaration of Mary Forkapa, #25 Declaration of Michael Hoppes, #26 Declaration of Rob Gagliardi, #27 Declaration of Sheila Yammer, #28 Declaration of Starr Gulledge, #29 Declaration of Steve Canna, #30 Declaration of Ted Towne (SAPA), #31 Declaration of Tome Kornegay, #32 Declaration of David Friedman, #33 Declaration of Greg Heller, #34 Declaration of John Corvino, #35 Declaration of John Higgins, #36 Declaration of Kent Qualls, #37 Declaration of Leslie Safran, #38 Declaration of Maxwell Kosman, #39 Declaration of Ted Towne (Employees), #40 Declaration of Alan Chang, #41 Declaration of Amy Tovar, #42 Declaration of Daniel Fumai, #43 Declaration of Harold R. Roth, #44 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 979 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings with Respect to "Save America's Pastime Act" Defense filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 978 EXHIBITS re #973 Declaration in Support,,,,,,, Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 251, #2 Exhibit 252, #3 Exhibit 253, #4 Exhibit 254, #5 Exhibit 255, #6 Exhibit 256, #7 Exhibit 257, #8 Exhibit 258, #9 Exhibit 259, #10 Exhibit 260, #11 Exhibit 261)(Related document(s) #973 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 977 EXHIBITS re #973 Declaration in Support,,,,,,, Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 201, #2 Exhibit 202, #3 Exhibit 203, #4 Exhibit 204, #5 Exhibit 205, #6 Exhibit 206, #7 Exhibit 207, #8 Exhibit 208, #9 Exhibit 209, #10 Exhibit 210, #11 Exhibit 211, #12 Exhibit 212, #13 Exhibit 213, #14 Exhibit 214, #15 Exhibit 215, #16 Exhibit 216, #17 Exhibit 217, #18 Exhibit 218, #19 Exhibit 219, #20 Exhibit 220, #21 Exhibit 221, #22 Exhibit 222, #23 Exhibit 223, #24 Exhibit 224, #25 Exhibit 225, #26 Exhibit 226, #27 Exhibit 227, #28 Exhibit 228, #29 Exhibit 229, #30 Exhibit 230, #31 Exhibit 231, #32 Exhibit 232, #33 Exhibit 233, #34 Exhibit 234, #35 Exhibit 235, #36 Exhibit 236, #37 Exhibit 237, #38 Exhibit 238, #39 Exhibit 239, #40 Exhibit 240, #41 Exhibit 241, #42 Exhibit 242, #43 Exhibit 243, #44 Exhibit 244, #45 Exhibit 245, #46 Exhibit 246, #47 Exhibit 247, #48 Exhibit 248, #49 Exhibit 249, #50 Exhibit 250)(Related document(s) #973 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 976 EXHIBITS re #973 Declaration in Support,,,,,,, Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 151, #2 Exhibit 152, #3 Exhibit 153, #4 Exhibit 154, #5 Exhibit 155, #6 Exhibit 156, #7 Exhibit 157, #8 Exhibit 158, #9 Exhibit 159, #10 Exhibit 160, #11 Exhibit 161, #12 Exhibit 162, #13 Exhibit 163, #14 Exhibit 164, #15 Exhibit 165, #16 Exhibit 166, #17 Exhibit 167, #18 Exhibit 168, #19 Exhibit 169, #20 Exhibit 170, #21 Exhibit 171, #22 Exhibit 172, #23 Exhibit 173, #24 Exhibit 174, #25 Exhibit 175, #26 Exhibit 176, #27 Exhibit 177, #28 Exhibit 178, #29 Exhibit 179, #30 Exhibit 180, #31 Exhibit 181, #32 Exhibit 182, #33 Exhibit 183, #34 Exhibit 184, #35 Exhibit 185, #36 Exhibit 186, #37 Exhibit 187, #38 Exhibit 188, #39 Exhibit 189, #40 Exhibit 190, #41 Exhibit 191, #42 Exhibit 192, #43 Exhibit 193, #44 Exhibit 194, #45 Exhibit 195, #46 Exhibit 196, #47 Exhibit 197, #48 Exhibit 198, #49 Exhibit 199, #50 Exhibit 200)(Related document(s) #973 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 975 EXHIBITS re #973 Declaration in Support,,,,,,, Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit 103, #4 Exhibit 104, #5 Exhibit 105, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 107, #8 Exhibit 108, #9 Exhibit 109, #10 Exhibit 110, #11 Exhibit 111, #12 Exhibit 112, #13 Exhibit 113, #14 Exhibit 114, #15 Exhibit 115, #16 Exhibit 116, #17 Exhibit 117, #18 Exhibit 118, #19 Exhibit 119, #20 Exhibit 120, #21 Exhibit 121, #22 Exhibit 122, #23 Exhibit 123, #24 Exhibit 124, #25 Exhibit 125, #26 Exhibit 126, #27 Exhibit 127, #28 Exhibit 128, #29 Exhibit 129, #30 Exhibit 130, #31 Exhibit 131, #32 Exhibit 132, #33 Exhibit 133, #34 Exhibit 134, #35 Exhibit 135, #36 Exhibit 136, #37 Exhibit 137, #38 Exhibit 138, #39 Exhibit 139, #40 Exhibit 140, #41 Exhibit 141, #42 Exhibit 142, #43 Exhibit 143, #44 Exhibit 144`, #45 Exhibit 145, #46 Exhibit 146, #47 Exhibit 147, #48 Exhibit 148, #49 Exhibit 149, #50 Exhibit 150)(Related document(s) #973 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 974 EXHIBITS re #973 Declaration in Support,,,,,,, Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 61, #12 Exhibit 62, #13 Exhibit 63, #14 Exhibit 64, #15 Exhibit 65, #16 Exhibit 66, #17 Exhibit 67, #18 Exhibit 68, #19 Exhibit 69, #20 Exhibit 70, #21 Exhibit 71, #22 Exhibit 72, #23 Exhibit 73, #24 Exhibit 74, #25 Exhibit 75, #26 Exhibit 76, #27 Exhibit 77, #28 Exhibit 78, #29 Exhibit 79, #30 Exhibit 80, #31 Exhibit 81, #32 Exhibit 82, #33 Exhibit 83, #34 Exhibit 84, #35 Exhibit 85, #36 Exhibit 86, #37 Exhibit 87, #38 Exhibit 88, #39 Exhibit 89, #40 Exhibit 90, #41 Exhibit 91, #42 Exhibit 92, #43 Exhibit 93, #44 Exhibit 94, #45 Exhibit 95, #46 Exhibit 96, #47 Exhibit 97, #48 Exhibit 98, #49 Exhibit 99, #50 Exhibit 100)(Related document(s) #973 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 973 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Errata 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 972 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 1 to Bloom Declaration, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 1 to Bloom Declaration, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 3 to Bloom Declaration, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 3 to Bloom Declaration, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 4 to Bloom Declaration, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 4 to Bloom Declaration)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 971 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations, Reports, and Testimony of Brian Kriegler, PH.D. filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #6 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #7 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 970 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Exhibit 2 to Bloom Declaration, #4 Unedacted Exhibit 2 to Bloom Declaration, #5 Redacted Exhibit 3 to Bloom Declaration, #6 Unredacted Exhibit 3 to Bloom Declaration, #7 Redacted Exhibit 4 to Bloom Declaration, #8 Unredacted Exhibit 4 to Bloom Declaration, #9 Redacted Exhibit 6 to Bloom Declaration, #10 Unredacted Exhibit 6 to Bloom Declaration, #11 Redacted Exhibit 8 to Bloom Declaration, #12 Unredacted Exhibit 8 to Bloom Declaration, #13 Redacted Exhibit 10 to Bloom Declaration, #14 Unredacted Exhibit 10 to Bloom Declaration)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 969 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #6 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #7 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #8 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #9 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #10 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #11 Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #12 Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksen in Support of Defendants' Motions to Exclude, #13 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #969 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D . Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)Motion was erroneously set with incorrect hearing date.
October 29, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #969 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. M ichael Dennis, PH.D filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP Motion was set for incorrect hearing date. Motion was noticed for 2/21/2022 and should be 2/11/2022.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 968 Order. Signed 10/28/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #967 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Mark Batten for Office of the Comm'r of Baseball.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 27, 2021 Filing 967 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16557115.) filed by Office of the Commissioner of Baseball. (Batten, Mark) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 966 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Moore (Moore, Diane) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER. Signed 10/12/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #964 Stipulation Regarding the Business Records Status of Documents Produced in Discovery. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 964 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Business Records Status of Documents Produced in Discovery filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 963 Order. Signed 10/4/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #962 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limits.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 962 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #936 Case Management Statement Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Exceed Page Limitations Per Civil Local Rule 7-12 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 961 Order. Signed 9/30/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #960 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Marc Wallenstein.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 960 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Marc Wallenstein ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16448258.) filed by Aaron Senne. (Wallenstein, Marc) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 959 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of Attorney Jamie L. Boyer (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 958 Order. Signed 9/10/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #957 Stipulation Changing Time.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 957 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 956 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing on Discovery Letter Brief #943 and Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2021 re #951 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Change Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3 filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP. Motion GRANTED. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/26/2021. Dispositive Motion and Daubert due by 10/29/2021. Responses/Oppositions due by 11/24/2021. Replies due by 12/10/2021. Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time: Zoom Webinar Time: 2:11-2:30. Attorney for Plaintiff: Garrett Broshuis, Cliff Pearson, Bobby Pouya, Tom Nolan Attorney for Defendant: Elise Bloom, Adam Lupion(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2021) Modified on 11/16/2021: Matter transcribed by Belle Ball. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing re #956 Discovery Hearing and Motion Hearing. Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,, Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Was set for the wrong year. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 955 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #951 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Change Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3 ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ORDER APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL Korein Tillery, LLC and Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP as class counsel. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/26/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 953 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING AND ZOOM NOTICE. Discovery Hearing as to #948 Discovery Letter Brief set for 8/27/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs < p
August 25, 2021 Filing 952 Proposed Order Appointing Class Counsel by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 951 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Change Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 950 Order. Signed 8/24/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #949 Stipulation Regarding Class Definition.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 949 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Rule 23(B)(2) Class Definition filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 948 Letter from Parties Joint Letter Concerning Production of Materials Relating to Plaintiffs Expert's Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/23/2021) Modified on 8/26/2021 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2021 Filing 947 USCA Case Number 21-80091 USCA for Petition for Permission to Appeal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 946 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #923 Motion to Certify Class. The parties shall by August 27, 2021 submit either a stipulated class definition or if they are unable to agree, statements not to exceed 5 pages setting forth their competing proposed class definitions. By the same date, the parties shall supply an an agreed-upon proposed order appointing Korein Tillery, LLC and Pearson, Simon & Warshaw LLP as class counsel. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 945 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Yadel Marti, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 944 Order. Signed 7/12/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #941 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Robert L. King. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #942 Stipulation Regarding Expert Deadlines and Briefing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions and continuing hearing from December 17, 2021 to January 28, 2022 at 9:30, to be conducted by Zoom. The Further Case Management Conference scheduled for December 17, 2021 will also be continued to January 28, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 12, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: See Order #943 Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/12/2021. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2022. Designation of Experts due by 9/13/2021. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 10/15/2021. Responses due by 11/10/2021. Replies due by 11/24/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 1/28/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 942 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Expert Deadlines and Briefing on Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions) filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 941 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert L. King filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 7/20/2021. Replies due by 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 5, 2021 Filing 940 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/25/21, before Magistrate Judge Josecph C. Spero. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Official Reporter, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #938 Transcript Order,,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021. (Related documents(s) #938 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 939 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 28, 2021 Filing 938 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 25, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 937 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2021 re #923 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) filed by Cody Sedlock and Further Case Management Conference held on 6/25/2021. Motion Submitted. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 09:30 AM i n San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Total Time in Court: 57 M. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Attorney for Plaintiff: Garrett Broshuis, Bobby Pouya, Tom Nolan Attorney for Defendant: Elise Bloom, Adam Lupion. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 936 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 935 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint of Bryan Henry byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Cleveland Indians Basebell Co., L.P., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 934 REPLY (re #923 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) ) filed byCody Sedlock. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert L. King, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(King, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER. Signed 5/27/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #932 Discovery Letter Brief. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 932 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Counting of the Depositions of Dismissed MLB Clubs filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 931 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #923 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER. Signed 5/21/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying without prejudice #929 Administrative Motion to Enforce or Modify Court's Order re: Number of Depositions. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 929 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Seeking Enforcement or Modification of the Court's Order Regarding the Number of Depositions of Dismissed MLB Clubs filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Proposed Order)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 928 Intervenor COMPLAINT for Violations of Federal and State Wage and Hour Laws. Filed byBryan Henry. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 927 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #922 Motion to Intervene by Bryan Henry. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 926 Order. Signed 5/10/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #925 Stipulation Changing Time per Local Rule 6-2 Re: Complaint in Intervention [922-2].(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 925 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #922 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 924 Statement re #922 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support Defendants Statement of Nonopposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Intervene on Behalf of Bryan Henry by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 923 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) filed by Cody Sedlock. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/7/2021. Replies due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cody Sedlock, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Rule 23(b)(2) Class Certification and Appointing Class Counsel)(King, Robert) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 922 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Bryan Henry. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/6/2021. Replies due by 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in Support of Motions to Intervene, #2 Proposed Complaint in Intervention, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER. Signed 4/15/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #920 Stipulation Changing Time. Motion for Class Certification due by 4/23/2021. Responses to Class Certification due by 5/24/2021. Replies to Class Certification due by 6/7/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 920 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #864 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 919 Order. Signed 3/23/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #918 Stipulation Changing Time. The deadline for Defendants and the Non-Party Dismissed Clubs to complete their supplemental document productions through the present will be amended to April 23, 2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 918 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #843 Case Management Scheduling Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER. Any motion addressed to the legal issues raised by the Save Americas Pastime Act will be heard at the same time as the Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/22/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 916 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/19/2021. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedi ngs, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Garrett Broshuis, Dan Warshaw, Bobby Pouya, Sam Kornhauser, Jamie Boyer. Attorney for Defendant: Elise Bloom, Adam Lupion. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 915 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint of Barret Loux byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 914 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint of Aaron Dott and Kyle Johnson byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 913 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint of Cody Sedlock byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER GRANTING re #873 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Barret Loux. Mr. Loux's Complaint in Intervention, [873-2], shall be deemed filed and served as of February 16,2021. See ECF Order #879 . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/16/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER GRANTING re #872 MOTION to Withdraw a Named Plaintiff and to Dismiss His Claims Without Prejudice filed by Jake Opitz. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/16/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 909 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 908 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnerships Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byRogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 907 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Rangers Baseball Express, LLC and Rangers Baseball, LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byRangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 906 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant St. Louis Cardinals, LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint bySt. Louis Cardinals, LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 905 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant The Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLPs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byBaseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 904 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant San Francisco Baseball Associates LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint bySan Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 903 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Padres L.P. and San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P.s Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byPadres L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 902 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Pittsburgh Associates, LPs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byPittsburgh Associates, LP. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 901 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Athletics Investment Group LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byAthletics Investment Group, LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 900 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant New York Yankees Partnerships Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byNew York Yankees P'ship. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 899 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Sterling Mets, L.P.s Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint bySterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 898 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Complaint Defendants The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball and Allan Huber Bud Seligs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byOffice of the Commissioner of Baseball, Allan Huber Selig. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 897 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Minnesota Twins, LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byMinnesota Twins, LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 896 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc. and Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P.s Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byMilwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 895 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Marlins Teamco LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byMiami Marlins, L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 894 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Los Angeles Dodgers LLC and Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byLos Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 893 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Angels Baseball LPs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byAngels Baseball LP. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 892 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Kansas City Royals Baseball Club LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byKansas City Royals Baseball Corp.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 891 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Houston Baseball Partners LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byHouston Baseball Partners LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 890 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Detroit Tigers, Inc.s Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byDetroit Tigers, Inc.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 889 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd.s Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byColorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 888 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant The Cincinnati Reds LLCs Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byCincinnati Reds, LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 887 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLCs (d/b/a Chicago Cubs) Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byChicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 886 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant AZPB L.P.s Supplemental Answer to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint byAZPB L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #878 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Answers to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 884 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #878 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Answers to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint ) Statement of Nonopposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Answers to the 2nd Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byAaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 883 Intervenor COMPLAINT in Intervention for Violations of Federal and State Wage and Hour Laws. Filed byAaron Dott, Kyle Johnson. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 882 Intervenor COMPLAINT in Intervention for Violations of Federal and State Wage and Hour Laws. Filed byCody Sedlock. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 881 Order, signed 2/16/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #877 Stipulation re: First and Second Complaints in Intervention and Defendants response to the First and Second Complaints in Intervention.Corrects docket #880 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 912 Intervenor COMPLAINT in Intervention for Violations of Federal and State Wage and Hour Laws. Filed byBarret Loux. Note: file nunc pro tunc back to 2/16/2021 per Orders #879 and #911 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 880 PLEASE DISREGARD. NO SIGNATURE ATTACHED. Order, signed 2/16/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #877 Stipulation re: First and Second Complaints in Intervention and Defendants response to the First and Second Complaints in Intervention.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) Modified on 2/17/2021 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 879 Order, signed 2/16/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #876 Stipulation Changing Time/Motion to Intervene to Substitute Barret Loux..(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 878 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Answers to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 877 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #719 , #847 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 876 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #872 MOTION to Withdraw a Named Plaintiff and to Dismiss His Claims Without Prejudice, #873 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 875 Statement re #873 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support Defendants Statement of Nonopposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Intervene on Behalf of Barrett Loux by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 874 Statement re #872 MOTION to Withdraw a Named Plaintiff and to Dismiss His Claims Without Prejudice Defendants' Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff Jake Opitzs Motion to Withdraw as a Named Plaintiff and to Dismiss His Claims Without Prejudice by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 873 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Barret Loux. Responses due by 2/12/2021. Replies due by 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Complaint in Intervention, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 872 MOTION to Withdraw a Named Plaintiff and to Dismiss His Claims Without Prejudice filed by Jake Opitz. Responses due by 2/12/2021. Replies due by 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #2 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 871 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luis Yarnel Diaz, Edwin Mateo (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 870 NOTICE by Aaron Senne (Notice of Filing Spanish Translation to Rule 23 Class Notice) (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER APPROVING CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 18, 2021. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2021)
January 17, 2021 Filing 868 STATUS REPORT REGARDING RULE 23 CLASS NOTICE PLAN by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/17/2021)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER RE RULE 23 CLASS NOTICE PLAN. The parties shall submit a stipulated proposed notice consistent with this Order for final Court approval by 7:00 a.m. Pacific Time on January 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 14, 2021. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 866 Letter from Elise M. Bloom in Response to Plaintiffs' January 13, 2021 Letter Requesting That the Court Consider and Approve Defendants Compromise Notice Proposals. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 865 Letter from Bobby Pouya Requesting Ruling on the Parties' Submissions Regarding Notice to the Class. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 12, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification due by 4/16/2021. Responses /Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 5/14/2021. Replies to Motion for Class Certification due by 5/28/2021. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 6/25/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. See Order #864 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #858 Administrative Motion Seeking Entry of Briefing Schedule for Further Rule 23(b)(2) Proceedings. The Court sets the following schedule: Plaintiffs motion for class certification pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) shall be filed by April 16, 2021. Defendants Opposition shall be due on May 14, 2021. The Reply brief will be due on May 28, 2021. The Motion hearing will be held on June 25, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. In addition, the parties shall provide an update on the status of their meet and confer efforts in connection with the proposed notice plan no later than January 14, 2021. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 863 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #858 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Relief Seeking Entry of Briefing Schedule for Further Rule 23(b)(2) Proceedings ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #847 Motion to Intervene; granting #848 Motion to Withdraw. Cody Sedlock, Edwin Mateo and Luis Yanel Diaz shall be permitted to intervene in this action. Corey Jones, Brian Hunter, and Shane Opitz shall no longer be plaintiffs in this action and their claims are dismissed without prejudice. The motion hearing scheduled for January 15, 2021 is vacated. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 861 Letter from Elise M. Bloom re Defendants Request for Court to Hold Its Disposition of the Appropriate Form of Notice to Be Provided to Rule 23(b)(3) Class Members in Abeyance Until Further Notification from the Parties. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 860 RESPONSE re #853 Response ( Non Motion ),,,, (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Proposed Plan of Notice to Rule 23(B)(3) Class Members by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Declaration of Gina M. Intrepido-Bowden)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 859 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 858 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Relief Seeking Entry of Briefing Schedule for Further Rule 23(b)(2) Proceedings filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Entry of Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 857 MOTION Administrative Relief Seeking Entry of Briefing Schedule for Further Rule 23(b)(2) Proceedings filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 1/19/2021. Replies due by 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Entry of Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 856 REPLY (re #847 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support ) in Support of Motion to Intervene filed byAaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 855 RESPONSE re #847 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support Defendants Statement of Nonopposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Intervene by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 854 Statement re #848 MOTION to Withdraw Certain Previous Intervenors and to Dismiss Their Claims without Prejudice Defendants Statement of Nonopposition by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 853 RESPONSE re #850 Notice (Other), Defendants Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice Plan by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, Esq.)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 852 Order, signed 12/18/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #851 Stipulation Changing Time for Briefing on Motion to Intervene.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #847 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 12/30/2020. Replies due by 1/6/2021. See Order #852 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 851 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #847 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support CHANGING TIME PER LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 850 NOTICE by Aaron Senne Plaintiffs' Proposed Plan of Notice to Rule 23(B)(3) Class Members (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Declaration of Gina M. Intrepido-Bowden, #3 Proposed Order)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 849 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Senne.. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 848 MOTION to Withdraw Certain Previous Intervenors and to Dismiss Their Claims without Prejudice filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 12/23/2020. Replies due by 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 847 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 12/23/2020. Replies due by 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint in Intervention for Violations of Federal and State Wage and Hour Laws, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 846 Letter from Robert King RE: conflict of interest allegations. (King, Robert) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 845 Letter from Elise M. Bloom in Response to Plaintiffs 11/25/20 Letter. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 844 Letter from Robert King RE: conflict of interest allegations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Boyer declaration, #2 Exhibit Email exchange)(King, Robert) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 843 SUPERSEDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/17/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 842 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2020. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2021. Deadline to Supplement Initial Disclosures due by 4/2/2021. Deadline for Parties to Supplement Productions through present due by 4/2/2021. Deadline for Third-Party MLB Franchises to Supplement Productions through present due by 4/2/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2021. Designation of Experts (Kreigler) due by 8/2/2021. Rebuttal Reports ( to opening expert reports not rebutted previously) due by 9/2/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2021 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Jury Selection set for 6/1/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2022 through July 14, 2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 12/17/2021 09:30 AM in Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov /jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert King, Clifford Pearson, Daniel Warshaw, Garrett Broshuis, Thomas Nolan, Bobby Pouya, Samuel Kornhauser, Brian David. Defendant Attorney: Elise Bloom, Adam Lupion. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 841 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Kornhauser and Brian David (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 840 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 839 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Philippe Alexandre Lebel and Notice of Appearance of Philippe A. Lebel on Behalf of Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, an unincorporated association doing business as Major League Baseball; Allan Huber Bud Selig; Angels Baseball LP; Athletics Investment Group, LLC; AZPB L.P.; Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC; The Cincinnati Reds LLC; Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd.; Detroit Tigers, Inc.; Houston Baseball Partners LLC; Kansas City Royals Baseball Club, LLC; Los Angeles Dodgers LLC; Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC; Marlins Teamco LLC; Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc.; Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P.; Minnesota Twins, LLC; Sterling Mets, L.P.; New York Yankees Pship; Padres L.P.; San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P.; Pittsburgh Associates, L.P.; San Francisco Baseball Associates LLC; The Baseball Club Of Seattle, LLLP; St. Louis Cardinals, LLC; Rangers Baseball Express, LLC; Rangers Baseball, LLC; and Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership (Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 838 Order, signed 11/6/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #837 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jamie L. Boyer.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 837 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jamie L. Boyer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15161533.) filed by Aaron Senne. (Boyer, Jamie) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 836 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of Attorney Bruce L. Simon (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 835 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Conference Statement due 11/6/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Advanc ed notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at JCSCRD@CAND.USCOURTS.GOV no later than 11/10/2020 by 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Conference statem ent due 11/6/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 834 Letter from Daniel L. Warshaw Requesting the Court set a Status Conference. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 833 U.S. Supreme Court Notice. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 832 USCA Amended Mandate (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 831 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford H. Pearson (Pearson, Clifford) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 830 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of Attorney Alexander L. Simon (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 829 U.S. Supreme Court Notice. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER of USCA as to #813 USCA Case Number, #812 USCA Case Number, #811 USCA Case Number (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 827 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jerome Nolan (Nolan, Thomas) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER of USCA as to #813 USCA Case Number 17-16276, #812 USCA Case Number 17-16267, #811 USCA Case Number 17-16245. The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 825 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #824 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Aaron M. Zigler terminated.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 824 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Aaron M. Zigler filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 10/30/2019. Replies due by 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER of USCA as to #813 USCA Case Number, #812 USCA Case Number, #811 USCA Case Number. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 822 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bruce Lee Simon (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 821 USCA OPINION as to #813 USCA Case Number, #812 USCA Case Number, #811 USCA Case Number. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 820 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexander Lee Simon (Simon, Alexander) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER of USCA as to #813 USCA Case Number, #812 USCA Case Number, #811 USCA Case Number. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER of USCA as to #813 USCA Case Number, #812 USCA Case Number, #811 USCA Case Number. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
December 8, 2017 Filing 817 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 816 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 815 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the further case management conference set for 8/18/17 at 2:00 PM. The parties shall file a Status Report on 12/8/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 814 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 07/18/2016; 08/19/2016; and 12/02/2016 before Judge Judge Spero, re #813 USCA Case Number, #812 USCA Case Number, #811 USCA Case Number Transcript due by 8/14/2017. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 813 USCA Case Number 17-16276. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 812 USCA Case Number 17-16267. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 811 USCA Case Number 17-16245. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER of USCA as to #784 USCA Case Number 17-80043. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER of USCA as to #785 USCA Case Number 17-80044. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER of USCA as to #802 USCA Case Number 17-80088. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 807 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 7/8/16; 8/19/16; 12/2/16 before Judge Joseph C. Spero, 9th Cir Court of Appeals Cases # 17-16245; 17-16267; 17-16276 (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 21, 2017 Filing 806 Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee$505,receipt number 0971-11487950). (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 805 Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee$505,receipt number 0971-11485920). (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 804 Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee$505,receipt number 0971-11485486). (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 803 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 802 USCA Case Number 17-80088 for Petition for Permission to Appeal under 1292(b). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 801 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #783 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; granting #786 Motion to Stay; vacating motion hearing and case management conference set for May 12, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. and setting further case management conference for Friday, August 18, 2017 at 2:00 pm (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 5, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #800 Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability,, Order on Motion to Stay, Further Case Management Conference re-set for 8/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 799 Order, signed 5/2/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #798 Stipulation Regarding Class Definition of California Class.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 798 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Class Definition of California Class filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 797 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 796 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aaron Senne (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #794 Stipulation Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 794 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLP, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 793 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 792 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Forms (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 791 REPLY (re #786 MOTION to Stay re #785 USCA Case Number, #783 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Baseball Holdings, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam M. Lupion, #2 Exhibit A)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 790 REPLY (re #783 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 7, 2017 Filing 789 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #786 MOTION to Stay re #785 USCA Case Number, #783 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 4, 2017 Filing 788 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #783 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ) filed byAaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 787 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Forms (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 786 MOTION to Stay re #785 USCA Case Number, #783 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/7/2017. Replies due by 4/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 785 USCA Case Number 17-80044 for Petition for Permission to Appeal (#2). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 784 USCA Case Number 17-80043 for Petition for Permission to Appeal. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 21, 2017 Filing 783 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 8, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #719 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part #720 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #724 Motion to Exclude ; granting #768 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. A further Case Management Conference is set for May 12, 2017 at 2:00 pm (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 7, 2017 Filing 781 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
January 23, 2017 Filing 780 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Ninth Circuit Judicial Decision)(Related document(s) #740 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 779 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 9, 2016 Filing 778 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 777 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/02/2016, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (776 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 776 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 775 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2016 re #720 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Class and Collective Certification filed by Aaron Senne, #719 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Aaron Senne, #724 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. re #696 Declaration in Support, filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, Further Case Management Conference NOT held on 12/2/2016. Motions submitted.Total Time in Court 2 H 30 M. Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 774 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/2/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 773 NOTICE by Aaron Senne re #754 Declaration in Support, of Filing Unredacted Document Per Court Order of November 23, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 772 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING DEC. 2 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Aaron Senne. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 771 Order, signed 11/23/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #756 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 770 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #768 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class and Collective Certification Under Rule 23 and the FLSA ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 769 Statement re #740 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Defendants Statement of Recent Decision by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 768 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class and Collective Certification Under Rule 23 and the FLSA filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #3 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 767 OBJECTIONS to re #755 Declaration in Support, #753 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendants Objections to the October 28, 2016 Declaration of Brian Kriegler, Ph.D., All Exhibits Thereto, and All New Reply Arguments Based Thereon Submitted by Plaintiffs in Further Support of Their Renewed Class Certification Motion, and to Strike the Same by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 766 Order, signed 11/2/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #762 Stipulation Tolling Claims.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 765 NOTICE by Aaron Senne re #737 Declaration in Support,,,, of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Court Order of November 1, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Order, signed 11/1/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #742 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 763 Statement re #756 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Reply Motion for Reconsideration by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 762 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Tolling Claims filed by Aaron Senne. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 761 Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksen, Ph.D. in Support of #759 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #759 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 760 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of #759 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #759 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 759 REPLY (re #724 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. re #696 Declaration in Support, ) Defendants Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 758 REPLY (re #719 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 757 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Senne re #756 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Reply Motion for Reconsideration (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 756 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Reply Motion for Reconsideration filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Unredacted)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 755 Declaration of Brian Kriegler in Support of #753 Reply to Opposition/Response, to Motion for Reconsideration re Class and Collective Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #753 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 754 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis in Support of #753 Reply to Opposition/Response, to Motion for Reconsideration Re Class and Collective Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted)(Related document(s) #753 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 753 REPLY (re #720 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Class and Collective Certification ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 752 Statement re #742 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exclude by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Order, signed 10/17/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #733 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Samantha L. Regenbogen.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 750 Declaration of Denise N. Martin, Ph.D. in Support of #740 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #740 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 749 Declaration of Jonathan Guryan, Ph.D. in Support of #740 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #740 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 748 Declaration of Paul K. Meyer in Support of #740 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #740 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 747 EXHIBITS re #741 Declaration in Support,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-1, #2 Exhibit J-2, #3 Exhibit K-1, #4 Exhibit K-2, #5 Exhibit K-3, #6 Exhibit K-4, #7 Exhibit K-5, #8 Exhibit K-6, #9 Exhibit K-7, #10 Exhibit K-8, #11 Exhibit K-9, #12 Exhibit K-10, #13 Exhibit K-11, #14 Exhibit K-12, #15 Exhibit K-13, #16 Exhibit K-14, #17 Exhibit K-15, #18 Exhibit K-16, #19 Exhibit K-17, #20 Exhibit L-1, #21 Exhibit L-2, #22 Exhibit L-3, #23 Exhibit L-4, #24 Exhibit L-5, #25 Exhibit L-6, #26 Exhibit L-7, #27 Exhibit L-8, #28 Exhibit L-9, #29 Exhibit M-1, #30 Exhibit M-2, #31 Exhibit M-3, #32 Exhibit M-4, #33 Exhibit M-5, #34 Exhibit M-6, #35 Exhibit N-1, #36 Exhibit N-2, #37 Exhibit N-3, #38 Exhibit O-1, #39 Exhibit O-2, #40 Exhibit O-3, #41 Exhibit O-4, #42 Exhibit O-5, #43 Exhibit O-6, #44 Exhibit O-7)(Related document(s) #741 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 746 EXHIBITS re #741 Declaration in Support,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1, #2 Exhibit D-2, #3 Exhibit D-3, #4 Exhibit D-4, #5 Exhibit D-5, #6 Exhibit D-6, #7 Exhibit D-7, #8 Exhibit D-8, #9 Exhibit D-9, #10 Exhibit D-10, #11 Exhibit D-11, #12 Exhibit D-12, #13 Exhibit E-1, #14 Exhibit E-2, #15 Exhibit E-3, #16 Exhibit F-1, #17 Exhibit F-2, #18 Exhibit F-3, #19 Exhibit F-4, #20 Exhibit F-5, #21 Exhibit F-6, #22 Exhibit G-1, #23 Exhibit G-2, #24 Exhibit G-3, #25 Exhibit H-1, #26 Exhibit H-2, #27 Exhibit H-3, #28 Exhibit H-4, #29 Exhibit H-5, #30 Exhibit H-6, #31 Exhibit H-7, #32 Exhibit H-8, #33 Exhibit H-9, #34 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #741 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 745 EXHIBITS re #741 Declaration in Support,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-19, #2 Exhibit B-20, #3 Exhibit B-21, #4 Exhibit B-22, #5 Exhibit B-23, #6 Exhibit B-24, #7 Exhibit B-25, #8 Exhibit B-26, #9 Exhibit B-27, #10 Exhibit B-28, #11 Exhibit B-29, #12 Exhibit B-30, #13 Exhibit B-31, #14 Exhibit B-32, #15 Exhibit B-33, #16 Exhibit B-34, #17 Exhibit B-35, #18 Exhibit B-36, #19 Exhibit B-37, #20 Exhibit B-38, #21 Exhibit B-39, #22 Exhibit B-40, #23 Exhibit B-41, #24 Exhibit B-42, #25 Exhibit B-43, #26 Exhibit B-44, #27 Exhibit C-1, #28 Exhibit C-2, #29 Exhibit C-3, #30 Exhibit C-4)(Related document(s) #741 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 744 EXHIBITS re #741 Declaration in Support,,,, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit B-6, #9 Exhibit B-7, #10 Exhibit B-8, #11 Exhibit B-9, #12 Exhibit B-10, #13 Exhibit B-11, #14 Exhibit B-12, #15 Exhibit B-13, #16 Exhibit B-14, #17 Exhibit B-15, #18 Exhibit B-16, #19 Exhibit B-17, #20 Exhibit B-18)(Related document(s) #741 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 743 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Senne re #742 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exclude (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 742 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exclude filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit D - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit E - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit F - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit G - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit H - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit I - Unredacted)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 741 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of #740 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class and Collective Certification Under Rule 23 and the FLSA filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Related document(s) #740 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 740 RESPONSE (re #720 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Class and Collective Certification ) Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class and Collective Certification Under Rule 23 and the FLSA filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 739 Declaration of J. Michael Dennis in Support of #736 Opposition/Response to Motion to Exclude Testimony of J. Michael Dennis filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #736 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 738 Declaration of Stanley Presser in Support of #736 Opposition/Response to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of J. Michael Dennis filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #736 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 737 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis in Support of #736 Opposition/Response to Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony J. Michael Dennis filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit B-7, #9 Exhibit B-8, #10 Exhibit B-9, #11 Exhibit B-10, #12 Exhibit B-11, #13 Exhibit B-12, #14 Exhibit B-13, #15 Exhibit B-14, #16 Exhibit B-15, #17 Exhibit B-16, #18 Exhibit B-17, #19 Exhibit B-18, #20 Exhibit B-19, #21 Exhibit B-20, #22 Exhibit B-21, #23 Exhibit B-22, #24 Exhibit B-23, #25 Exhibit B-24, #26 Exhibit B-25, #27 Exhibit B-26, #28 Exhibit B-27, #29 Exhibit B-28, #30 Exhibit B-29, #31 Exhibit B-30, #32 Exhibit B-31, #33 Exhibit B-32, #34 Exhibit B-33, #35 Exhibit B-34, #36 Exhibit B-35, #37 Exhibit B-36, #38 Exhibit B-37, #39 Exhibit C - Redacted, #40 Exhibit D - Redacted, #41 Exhibit E - Redacted, #42 Exhibit F - Redacted, #43 Exhibit G - Redacted, #44 Exhibit H - Redacted, #45 Exhibit I - Redacted)(Related document(s) #736 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 736 RESPONSE (re #724 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. re #696 Declaration in Support, ) filed byAaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 735 RESPONSE (re #719 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support ) Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 734 NOTICE by Aaron Senne re #721 Declaration in Support, of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Court Order of October 12, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 733 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Samantha L. Regenbogen ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10846104.) filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Regenbogen, Samantha) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #723 Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Class Certification. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 5, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #719 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 10/14/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting (730) Stipulation in case 3:14-cv-00608-JCS. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 730 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #719 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 19, 2016 Filing 729 Statement re #723 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration Re Class Certification by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 728 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Senne.. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #719 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 727 Proposed Order re #724 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. re #696 Declaration in Support, by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 726 Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksen in Support of #724 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. re #696 Declaration in Support, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #724 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 725 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of #724 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. re #696 Declaration in Support, filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) #724 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 724 MOTION to Exclude the Declaration and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. re #696 Declaration in Support, filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 10/14/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 723 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration Re Class Certification filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit B - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit C - Unreadacted, #6 Exhibit D - Unredacted)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 722 Proposed Order re #720 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Class and Collective Certification by Aaron Senne. (Tillery, Stephen) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 721 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis in Support of #720 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Class and Collective Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted, #4 Exhibit D - Redacted, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #720 ) (Tillery, Stephen) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 720 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Class and Collective Certification filed by Aaron Senne. (Tillery, Stephen) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 719 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Aaron Senne. Responses due by 9/28/2016. Replies due by 10/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Kyle Johnson in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Declaration of Corey Jones in Support of Motion to Intervene, #4 Declaration of Brian Hunter in Support of Motion to Interevene, #5 Declaration of Shane Opitz to Motion to Intervene, #6 Exhibit [Proposed] Complaint in Intervention, #7 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 31, 2016 Filing 718 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/25/16, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (716 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order,,, ) Redaction Request due 9/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2016. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER re #714 Letter filed by Aaron Senne DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 31, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 31, 2016 Filing 716 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/25/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 29, 2016 Filing 715 Letter from Elisa M. Bloom in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter Dated August 26, 2016 (Dkt. 714). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 26, 2016 Filing 714 Letter from Garrett R. Broshuis . (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 713 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/25/2016. Plaintiffs shall produce the SASS data by Friday, 8/26, by Noon (PDT). Motions (Daubert and Renewed Motion for Class Certification) due by 9/14/2016.Total Time in Court 25 M. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2016)
August 25, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing Telephonic Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 23, 2016 Filing 712 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/19/16, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (711 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order, (708 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order,,, ) Redaction Request due 9/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2016. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 19, 2016 Filing 711 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 19, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #694 Motion for Leave File Motion for Reconsideration and alternative request to file renewed motion for class certification. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Filing 709 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/19/2016. Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2016 re #694 MOTION for Reconsideration re #687 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Certify Class, filed by Aaron Senne. Motion filing deadline 9/12/16. Responses due by 10/14/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.Total Time in Court 1 H 4 M. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Filing 708 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/19/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2016. Motions due by 9/12/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 11, 2016 Filing 707 NOTICE by Aaron Senne re #695 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,,,, of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Court Order of August 10, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B1, #2 Exhibit B2, #3 Exhibit B3, #4 Exhibit B4, #5 Exhibit B5, #6 Exhibit C1, #7 Exhibit C2, #8 Exhibit C3, #9 Exhibit D1, #10 Exhibit D2, #11 Exhibit D3)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 10, 2016 Filing 706 RESPONSE (re #694 MOTION for Reconsideration re #687 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Certify Class, ) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER, signed 8/10/16 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero partiallygranting #698 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 8, 2016 Filing 704 Statement re #698 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration Defendants Statement in Partial Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Leave to Move for Reconsideration by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 703 MOTION for Leave to File MARTI PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 702 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aaron Senne. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 8/5/2016) Modified on 8/8/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2016 Filing 701 EXHIBITS re #698 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A61 - Unredacted, #2 Exhibit A62 - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit A63 - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit A64 - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit A65 - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit A66 - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit A67 - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit A68 - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit A69 - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit A70 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit A71 - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit A72 - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit B1 - Unredacted, #14 Exhibit B2 - Unredacted, #15 Exhibit B3 - Unredacted, #16 Exhibit B4 - Unredacted, #17 Exhibit B5 - Unredacted, #18 Exhibit C1 - Unredacted, #19 Exhibit C2 - Unredacted, #20 Exhibit C3 - Unredacted, #21 Exhibit D1 - Unredacted, #22 Exhibit D2 - Unredacted, #23 Exhibit D3 - Unredacted)(Related document(s) #698 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 700 EXHIBITS re #698 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A41 - Unredacted, #2 Exhibit A42 - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit A43 - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit A44 - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit A45 - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit A46 - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit A47 - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit A48 - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit A49 - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit A50 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit A51 - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit A52 - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit A53 - Unredacted, #14 Exhibit A54 - Unredacted, #15 Exhibit A55 - Unredacted, #16 Exhibit A56 - Unredacted, #17 Exhibit A57 - Unredacted, #18 Exhibit A58 - Unredacted, #19 Exhibit A59 - Unredacted, #20 Exhibit A60 - Unredacted)(Related document(s) #698 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 699 EXHIBITS re #698 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A21 - Unredacted, #2 Exhibit A22 - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit A23 - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit A24 - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit A25 - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit A26 - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit A27 - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit A28 - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit A29 - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit A30 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit A31 - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit A32 - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit A33 - Unredacted, #14 Exhibit A34 - Unredacted, #15 Exhibit A35 - Unredacted, #16 Exhibit A36 - Unredacted, #17 Exhibit A37 - Unredacted, #18 Exhibit A38 - Unredacted, #19 Exhibit A39 - Unredacted, #20 Exhibit A40 - Unredacted)(Related document(s) #698 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 698 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A1 - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit A2 - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit A3 - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit A4 - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit A5 - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit A6 - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit A7 - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit A8 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit A9 - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit A10 - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit A11 - Unredacted, #14 Exhibit A12 - Unredacted, #15 Exhibit A13 - Unredacted, #16 Exhibit A14 - Unredacted, #17 Exhibit A15 - Unredacted, #18 Exhibit A16 - Unredacted, #19 Exhibit A17 - Unredacted, #20 Exhibit A18 - Unredacted, #21 Exhibit A19 - Unredacted, #22 Exhibit A20 - Unredacted)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 697 Proposed Order re #694 MOTION for Reconsideration re #687 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Certify Class, by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 696 Declaration of J. Michael Dennis in Support of #694 MOTION for Reconsideration re #687 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Certify Class, filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #694 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 695 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis in Support of #694 MOTION for Reconsideration re #687 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Certify Class, filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - Redacted, #2 Exhibit A2 - Redacted, #3 Exhibit A3 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit A4 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit A5 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit A6 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit A7 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit A8 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit A9 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit A10 - Redacted, #11 Exhibit A11 - Redacted, #12 Exhibit A12 - Redacted, #13 Exhibit A13 - Redacted, #14 Exhibit A14 - Redacted, #15 Exhibit A15 - Redacted, #16 Exhibit A16 - Redacted, #17 Exhibit A17 - Redacted, #18 Exhibit A18 - Redacted, #19 Exhibit A19 - Redacted, #20 Exhibit A20 - Redacted, #21 Exhibit A21 - Redacted, #22 Exhibit A22 - Redacted, #23 Exhibit A23 - Redacted, #24 Exhibit A24 - Redacted, #25 Exhibit A25 - Redacted, #26 Exhibit A26 - Redacted, #27 Exhibit A27 - Redacted, #28 Exhibit A28 - Redacted, #29 Exhibit A29 - Redacted, #30 Exhibit A30 - Redacted, #31 Exhibit A31 - Redacted, #32 Exhibit A32 - Redacted, #33 Exhibit A33 - Redacted, #34 Exhibit A34 - Redacted, #35 Exhibit A35 - Redacted, #36 Exhibit A36 - Redacted, #37 Exhibit A37 - Redacted, #38 Exhibit A38 - Redacted, #39 Exhibit A39 - Redacted, #40 Exhibit A40 - Redacted, #41 Exhibit A41 - Redacted, #42 Exhibit A42 - Redacted, #43 Exhibit A43 - Redacted, #44 Exhibit A44 - Redacted, #45 Exhibit A45 - Redacted, #46 Exhibit A46 - Redacted, #47 Exhibit A47 - Redacted, #48 Exhibit A48 - Redacted, #49 Exhibit A49 - Redacted, #50 Exhibit A50 - Redacted, #51 Exhibit A51 - Redacted, #52 Exhibit A52 - Redacted, #53 Exhibit A53 - Redacted, #54 Exhibit A54 - Redacted, #55 Exhibit A55 - Redacted, #56 Exhibit A56 - Redacted, #57 Exhibit A57 - Redacted, #58 Exhibit A58 - Redacted, #59 Exhibit A59 - Redacted, #60 Exhibit A60 - Redacted, #61 Exhibit A61 - Redacted, #62 Exhibit A62 - Redacted, #63 Exhibit A63 - Redacted, #64 Exhibit A64 - Redacted, #65 Exhibit A65 - Redacted, #66 Exhibit A66 - Redacted, #67 Exhibit A67 - Redacted, #68 Exhibit A68 - Redacted, #69 Exhibit A69 - Redacted, #70 Exhibit A70 - Redacted, #71 Exhibit A71 - Redacted, #72 Exhibit A72 - Redacted, #73 Exhibit B1 - Redacted, #74 Exhibit B2 - Redacted, #75 Exhibit B3 - Redacted, #76 Exhibit B4 - Redacted, #77 Exhibit B5 - Redacted, #78 Exhibit C1 - Redacted, #79 Exhibit C2 - Redacted, #80 Exhibit C3 - Redacted, #81 Exhibit D1 - Redacted, #82 Exhibit D2 - Redacted, #83 Exhibit D3 - Redacted)(Related document(s) #694 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 694 MOTION for Reconsideration re #687 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Certify Class, filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #692 Stipulation and Extending Certain Deadlines. The deadline for Expert Disclosures currently scheduled for August 5, 2016 is extended to August 16, 2016; the deadline for Expert Rebuttal Disclosures currently scheduled for September 2, 2016 is extended to September 16, 2016; The deadline for filing dispositive motions and Daubert motions currently scheduled for September 14, 2016 is extended to September 19, 2016. The deadlines for filing Opposition and Reply briefs on dispositive and Daubert motions currently scheduled for October 7, 2016 and October 21, 2016, respectively, shall remain unchanged.The motions hearing date currently scheduled for November 18, 2016 shall also remain unchanged. Possible modifications to these deadlines will be discussed at the August 19, 2016 case management conference.(jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 Filing 692 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines and Schedule filed by Aaron Senne. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #689 Stipulation re Certain Pretrial Deadlines and Schedule. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 690 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference, previously set for 8/19/16 at 2:00 PM, has been re-set for 8/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 28, 2016 Filing 689 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines and Schedule filed by Aaron Senne. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 22, 2016 Filing 688 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/08/2016, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (685 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order,,, (686 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2016. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 22, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. See Order #667 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #495 Motion to Decertify FLSA Collective ; denying #496 Motion to Certify Rule 23 Class; granting #632 Motion to Exclude. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 11, 2016 Filing 686 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/08/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 11, 2016 Filing 685 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/8/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 8, 2016 Filing 684 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2016 re #495 Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Aaron Senne, #632 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony re #497 Declaration in Support, #498 Declaration in Support Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. an filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, AZPB L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Sterling Mets L.P., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP. (Court Reporter:Rhonda Aquilina.)(Total Time in Court 2:18.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/8/2016)
July 7, 2016 Filing 683 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #673 Motion to Withdraw and Dismissing Claims of Matt Lewis and Matt Gorgen without Prejudice. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 681 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Updated) filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 680 REPLY (re #673 MOTION to Withdraw Putative Class Representatives ) filed byMatt Gorgen, Matt Lewis. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 679 RESPONSE (re #673 MOTION to Withdraw Putative Class Representatives ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 15, 2016 Filing 678 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Ninth Circuit Opinion)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying without prejudice #674 Motion for Protective Order and #675 Motion to Quash for Failure to Adequately Meet and Confer; parties are to meet and confer within five calendar days and file a joint letter containing a detailed explanation of any issues still in dispute and the parties' proposed compromises. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 676 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 675 MOTION to Quash or for a Protective Order filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/22/2016. Replies due by 6/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 674 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/17/2016. Replies due by 6/24/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 673 MOTION to Withdraw Putative Class Representatives filed by Matt Gorgen, Matt Lewis. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/17/2016. Replies due by 6/24/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Proposed Order)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 672 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 9:36-10:31, held on 05/17/2016, before Joseph C. Spero, Magistrate Judge. Transcriber Kelly L. Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 9:36-10:31. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (669 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order,,,, (668 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2016. (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 671 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 9:35-10:19, held on 05/10/2016, before Joseph C. Spero, Magistrate Judge. Transcriber Kelly L. Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 9:35-10:19. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (669 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order,,,, (668 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2016. (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 670 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: This Order supersedes the Case Management and Pretrial Order filed on 12/15/14 #295 . Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 9/14/2016. Replies to Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 10/21/2016. Responses to Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 10/7/2016. Dispositive Motion Hearing/Daubert Motions set for 11/18/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Interim Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/17 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/23/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 669 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2016 and 05/17/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 668 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/17/2016 and 05/10/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Aaron Senne, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #655 Discovery Letter Brief. Defendants shall produce information sufficient to allow Plaintiffs to match the numerical identifier for each and every player in the payroll records to the numerical identifiers for each such player in the roster moves records on a rolling basis, beginning immediately, and to be completed no later than July 17, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 666 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held on 5/17/2016. Further Case Management Conference held on 5/17/2016. Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 9/14/2016. Replies to Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 10/21/2016. Responses to Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 10/7/2016. Dispositive Motion Hearing/Daubert Motions set for 11/18/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.FTR Time 9:36-10:31. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 665 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 664 Letter from Bobby Pouya Regarding Telephonic Appearance at May 17, 2016 Discovery Conference. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 663 Letter from Garrett R. Broshuis regarding telephonic appearance at May 17, 2016 hearing on pending discovery matters. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 662 Letter from Elise M. Bloom regarding telephonic appearance at May 17, 2016 hearing on pending discovery matters. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 661 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing re: Discovery Letter Brief re: Anonymized Data #655 on 5/10/2016. Hearing continued. Further Case Management Conference to finalize adjustments to the case schedule set for 5/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery Hearing re: Discovery Letter Brief re: Anonymized Data #655 set for 5/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. SperoFTR Time 9:35-10:19. **Amended to add Bruce Simon(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 660 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing re: Discovery Letter Brief re: Anonymized Data #655 on 5/10/2016. Hearing continued. Further Case Management Conference to finalize adjustments to the case schedule set for 5/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery Hearing re: Discovery Letter Brief re: Anonymized Data #655 set for 5/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.FTR Time 9:35-10:19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 659 Letter from Garrett R. Broshuis regarding telephonic appearance at May 10, 2016 hearing on pending discovery matters. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 658 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 657 Letter from Elise M. Bloom regarding telephonic appearance at May 10, 2016 hearing on pending discovery matters. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 656 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Discovery Hearing re: Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: de-anonymized production of payroll records #655 set for 5/10/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 655 Letter Brief (Joint) Re Anonymized Data filed byAaron Senne. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2016) Modified on 5/2/2016 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/28/2016 with Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 27, 2016 Filing 654 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 653 Order, signed 4/25/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #636 Defendants' Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #590 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 20, 2015 Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-9. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 651 CLERK'S NOTICE as to #632 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony re #497 Declaration in Support, #498 Declaration in Support Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D., #496 MOTION to Certify Class , #495 MOTION Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities . Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2016. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 5/20/16 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 7/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing previously set for 5/20/16 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 7/8/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 650 REPLY (re #632 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony re #497 Declaration in Support, #498 Declaration in Support Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. an ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #3 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Denise N. Martin, #4 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksen, #5 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksen, #6 Exhibit B to Supplemental Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksent)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 19, 2016 Filing 649 Declaration of Aaron M. Zigler in Support of #640 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit M, #11 Exhibit N, #12 Exhibit O, #13 Exhibit P, #14 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #640 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 19, 2016 Filing 648 REPLY (re #496 MOTION to Certify Class ) in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #644 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 19, 2016 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 4/21/2016 at 8:00 AM Pacific is rescheduled to 4/28/2016 at 8:00 AM Pacific. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 18, 2016 Filing 646 RESPONSE (re #632 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony re #497 Declaration in Support, #498 Declaration in Support Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. an ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 18, 2016 Filing 645 Statement re #644 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Reply to Motion for Class Certification by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 644 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Reply to Motion for Class Certification filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plfs Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted Version of Pltfs Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit A - Redacted, #6 Exhibit A - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit B - Redacted, #8 Exhibit B - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit F - Redacted, #10 Exhibit F - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit G - Redacted, #12 Exhibit G - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit H - Redacted, #14 Exhibit H - Unredacted, #15 Exhibit I - Redacted, #16 Exhibit I - Unredacted, #17 Exhibit J - Redacted, #18 Exhibit J - Unredacted, #19 Exhibit K - Redacted, #20 Exhibit K - Unredacted, #21 Exhibit L - Redacted, #22 Exhibit L - Unredacted, #23 Exhibit M - Redacted, #24 Exhibit M - Unredacted, #25 Exhibit N - Redacted, #26 Exhibit N - Unredacted, #27 Exhibit O - Redacted, #28 Exhibit O - Unredacted, #29 Exhibit P - Redacted, #30 Exhibit P - Unredacted, #31 Exhibit Q - Redacted, #32 Exhibit Q - Unredacted, #33 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 643 Declaration in Support of #640 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit C-4, #7 Exhibit C-5, #8 Exhibit C-6, #9 Exhibit C-7, #10 Exhibit C-8, #11 Exhibit C-9, #12 Exhibit C-10, #13 Exhibit C-11, #14 Exhibit C-12, #15 Exhibit C-13, #16 Exhibit C-14, #17 Exhibit C-15, #18 Exhibit C-16, #19 Exhibit C-17, #20 Exhibit C-18, #21 Exhibit C-19, #22 Exhibit C-20, #23 Exhibit C-21, #24 Exhibit C-22, #25 Exhibit C-23, #26 Exhibit C-24, #27 Exhibit C-25, #28 Exhibit C-26, #29 Exhibit C-27, #30 Exhibit C-28, #31 Exhibit C-29, #32 Exhibit C-30, #33 Exhibit C-31, #34 Exhibit C-32, #35 Exhibit C-33, #36 Exhibit C-34, #37 Exhibit C-35, #38 Exhibit C-36, #39 Exhibit D, #40 Exhibit E, #41 Exhibit F, #42 Exhibit G, #43 H, #44 I, #45 J, #46 K, #47 L, #48 M, #49 N, #50 O, #51 P, #52 Q)(Related document(s) #640 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 642 Declaration of J. Michael Dennis in Support of #640 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #640 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 641 Declaration of Brian Kriegler in Support of #640 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #640 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 640 REPLY (re #496 MOTION to Certify Class ) in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 639 REPLY (re #495 MOTION Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Defendants Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 638 NOTICE by Aaron Senne re #613 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, of Filing of Unredacted Documents Pursuant to Order of April 6, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action, #2 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #3 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #4 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #5 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #6 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #7 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #8 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Bobby Pouya)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Order, signed 4/7/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #634 Stipulation Regarding Addendum to Stipulated Protective Order.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 7, 2016 Filing 636 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Renewed Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Defendants Motion For Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration of the Courts May 20, 2015 Order filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 634 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #233 Order on Stipulation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Addendum to Stipulated Protective Order filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 633 Statement re #614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action Defendants Statement in Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action (L.R. 7-11, 79-5) by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held with Howard Herman on 4/4/2016. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 4/21/2016 at 8:00 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 632 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Declarations and Testimony re #497 Declaration in Support, #498 Declaration in Support Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Declarations and Testimony of J. Michael Dennis, Ph.D. and Brian Kriegler, Ph.D. Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/18/2016. Replies due by 4/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 631 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of #628 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Declaration of Elise M. Bloom In Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84)(Related document(s) #628 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 630 Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksen, Ph.D. in Support of #628 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Declaration of Eugene P. Ericksen, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #628 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 629 Declaration of Denise N. Martin, Ph.D. in Support of #628 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Declaration of Denise N. Martin, Ph.D in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #628 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 628 RESPONSE (re #496 MOTION to Certify Class ) Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 627 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit V-2 [Doc 572-02], #2 Exhibit V-9 [Doc 572-09], #3 Exhibit V-13 [Doc 572-13], #4 Exhibit V-15 [Doc 572-14], #5 Exhibit S-22 [Doc 572-17], #6 Exhibit J-15 [Doc 574-01], #7 Exhibit J-16 [Doc 574-02], #8 Exhibit J-17 [Doc 574-03], #9 Exhibit J-18 [Doc 574-04], #10 Exhibit J-19 [Doc 574-05])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 626 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-1 [Doc 567-15], #2 Exhibit S-4 [Doc 567-18], #3 Exhibit S-7 [Doc 567-22], #4 Exhibit S-8 [Doc 567-23], #5 Exhibit S-10 [Doc 567-25], #6 Exhibit S-12 [Doc 567-28], #7 Exhibit S-13 [Doc 567-29], #8 Exhibit S-15 [Doc 567-31], #9 Exhibit S-17 [Doc 567-33], #10 Exhibit S-19 [Doc 567-35], #11 Exhibit T-1 [Doc 568-01], #12 Exhibit T-2 [Doc 568-03], #13 Exhibit T-3 [Doc 568-03], #14 Exhibit S-21 [Doc 570-02], #15 Exhibit S-23 [Doc 570-03], #16 Exhibit S-24 [Doc 570-04], #17 Exhibit S-25 [Doc 570-05], #18 Exhibit S-27 [Doc 570-07], #19 Exhibit S-28 [Doc 570-08])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 625 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-38 Part 1 [Doc 567-11], #2 Exhibit R-38 Part 2 [Doc 567-12], #3 Exhibit R-38 Part 3 [Doc 567-13], #4 Exhibit R-39 [Doc 567-14])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 624 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-18 [Doc 566-19], #2 Exhibit R-19 [Doc 566-20], #3 Exhibit R-20 [Doc 566-21], #4 Exhibit R-21 [Doc 566-22], #5 Exhibit R-22 [Doc 566-23], #6 Exhibit R-23 [Doc 566-24], #7 Exhibit R-24 [Doc 566-25], #8 Exhibit R-25 [Doc 566-26], #9 Exhibit R-28 [Doc 566-30], #10 Exhibit R-29 [Doc 567-01], #11 Exhibit R-30 [Doc 567-02], #12 Exhibit R-31 [Doc 567-03], #13 Exhibit R-32 [Doc 567-04], #14 Exhibit R-33 [Doc 567-05], #15 Exhibit R-34 [Doc 567-06], #16 Exhibit R-35 [Doc 567-07], #17 Exhibit R-36 [Doc 567-08], #18 Exhibit R-37 Part 1 [Doc 567-09], #19 Exhibit R-37 Part 2 [Doc 567-10])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 623 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-1 [Doc 566-1], #2 Exhibit R-2 [Doc 566-2], #3 Exhibit R-3 [Doc 566-3, #4 Exhibit R-4 [Doc 566-04], #5 Exhibit R-5 [Doc 566-05], #6 Exhibit R-6 [Doc 566-06], #7 Exhibit R-7 [Doc 566-07], #8 Exhibit R-8 [Doc 566-08], #9 Exhibit R -9 [Doc 566-09], #10 Exhibit R-10 [Doc 566-10], #11 Exhibit R-12 [Doc 566-12], #12 Exhibit R-11 [Doc 566-11], #13 Exhibit R-13 [Doc 566-13], #14 Exhibit R-14 [Doc 566-14], #15 Exhibit R-17 [Doc 566-18])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 622 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Filing Notice of Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q-19 [Doc. 564-21], #2 Exhibit Q-20 [Doc. 564-22], #3 Exhibit Q-23 [Doc. 565-03], #4 Exhibit Q-24 [Doc. 565-04], #5 Exhibit Q-25 [Doc. 565-05], #6 Exhibit Q-26 [Doc. 565-06], #7 Exhibit Q-27 [Doc. 565-07], #8 Exhibit Q-28 [Doc. 565-08], #9 Exhibit Q-30 [Doc. 565-10], #10 Exhibit Q-31 [Doc. 565-11], #11 Exhibit Q-32-Part 1 [Doc. 565-12], #12 Exhibit Q-34 [Doc. 565-14])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 621 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Filing Notice of Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N-1 [Doc. 563-01], #2 Exhibit N-2 [Doc. 563-02], #3 Exhibit N-3 [Doc. 563-03], #4 Exhibit O-19 [Doc. 563-22], #5 Exhibit P [Doc. 563-23], #6 Exhibit Q-6 [Doc. 564-04], #7 Exhibit Q-8 [Doc. 564-06], #8 Exhibit Q-12 [Doc. 564-11], #9 Exhibit Q-13 [Doc. 564-12], #10 Exhibit Q-14 [Doc. 564-13], #11 Exhibit Q-16 [Doc. 564-18], #12 Exhibit Q-17 [Doc. 564-19])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 620 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M-11 [Doc. 561-09], #2 Exhibit M-12 [Doc. 561-10], #3 Exhibit M-14 [Doc. 561-13], #4 Exhibit M-16 [Doc. 561-15], #5 Exhibit M-18 [Doc. 561-16], #6 Exhibit M-19 [Doc. 561-17], #7 Exhibit M-22 [Doc. 561-18], #8 Exhibit M-24 [Doc. 561-25], #9 Exhibit M-25 [Doc. 561-26])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 619 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-31 [Doc. 559-11], #2 Exhibit K-32 [Doc. 559-12], #3 Exhibit K-38 [Doc. 559-19], #4 Exhibit K-41 [Doc. 559-22], #5 Exhibit K-42 [Doc. 559-23], #6 Exhibit K-43 [Doc. 559-24], #7 Exhibit K-44 [Doc. 559-25], #8 Exhibit M-6 [Doc. 561-03], #9 Exhibit M-9 [Doc. 561-07], #10 Exhibit M-10 [Doc. 561-08])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 618 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Filing Notice of Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-1 [Doc. 557-01], #2 Exhibit K-2 [Doc. 557-02], #3 Exhibit K-4 [Doc. 557-04], #4 Exhibit K-8 [Doc. 557-08], #5 Exhibit K-10 [Doc. 557-11], #6 Exhibit K-11 [Doc. 557-12], #7 Exhibit K-18 [Doc. 557-19], #8 Exhibit K-20 [Doc. 557-21], #9 Errata K-21 [Doc. 559-01], #10 Exhibit K-26 [Doc. 559-06], #11 Exhibit K-29 [Doc. 559-09])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 617 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-2 [Doc. 553-09], #2 Exhibit J-4 [Doc. 553-11/555-11], #3 Exhibit J-5 [Doc. 553-12/555-12], #4 Errata J-7 [Doc. 553-14/555-14], #5 Exhibit J-8 [Doc. 553-15/555-15], #6 Exhibit J-9 [Doc. 553-16/555-16], #7 Exhibit J-12 [Doc. 553-19/555-19], #8 Exhibit J-13 [Doc. 553-20/555-20], #9 Exhibit J-14 [Doc. 553-21/555-21])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 616 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, re Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Order of March 28, 2016 filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-12 [Doc. 548-01], #2 Exhibit G-13 [Doc. 548-02], #3 Exhibit I-2 [Doc. 548-03], #4 Exhibit I-3 [Doc. 548-04], #5 Exhibit I-5 [Doc. 548-06], #6 Exhibit I-7 [Doc. 548-09], #7 Exhibit I-13 [Doc. 548-15], #8 Exhibit I-17-Part 1 [Doc.551-07], #9 Exhibit I-17-Part 2 [Doc. 551-08], #10 Exhibit I-19 [Doc. 551-10], #11 Exhibit I-21 [Doc. 551-12], #12 Exhibit I-23 [Doc. 551-13], #13 Exhibit I-27 [Doc. 551-19], #14 Errata I-33 [Doc. 553-03/555-4], #15 Exhibit I-34 [Doc. 553-04/555-5], #16 Exhibit I-35 [Doc. 553-05/555-6])(Related document(s) #537 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 615 NOTICE by Aaron Senne re #537 Declaration in Support,, of Filing Unredacted Documents Per Court Order of March 28, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-6 [Doc. 542-03], #2 Exhibit D-8 [Doc. 542-04], #3 Exhibit D-12 [Doc. 542-05], #4 Exhibit D-17 [Doc. 542-06], #5 Exhibit F-1 [Doc. 542-07], #6 Exhibit F-3 [Doc. 542-10], #7 Exhibit F-11 [Doc. 542-19], #8 Exhibit F-18 [Doc. 543-03], #9 Exhibit F-19 [Doc. 543-04], #10 Exhibit F-22-Part 1 [Doc.543-07], #11 Exhibit F-27 [Doc. 543-12], #12 Exhibit F-34 [Doc. 546-04], #13 Exhibit F-35 [Doc. 546-05], #14 Exhibit F-37 [Doc. 546-08], #15 Exhibit F-40 [Doc. 546-11], #16 Exhibit F-41 [Doc. 546-12])(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Docket 613, #4 Unredacted Version of Docket 613, #5 Redacted Version of Docket 613-22, #6 Unredacted Version of Docket 613-22, #7 Redacted Version of Docket 613-23, #8 Unredacted Version of Docket 613-23, #9 Redacted Version of Docket 613-24, #10 Unredacted Version of Docket 613-24, #11 Redacted Version of Docket 613-25, #12 Unredacted Version of Docket 613-25, #13 Redacted Version of Docket 613-26, #14 Unredacted Version of Docket 613-26, #15 Redacted Version of Docket 613-27, #16 Unredacted Version of Docket 613-27, #17 Redacted Version of Docket 613-28, #18 Unredacted Version of Docket 613-28, #19 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 613 RESPONSE (re #495 MOTION Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Kriegler, Ph.D., #2 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Order, signed as modified on 3/31/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in support of their Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying without prejudice #591 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Defendants may file a renewed administrative motion to file under seal no later than April 8, 2016 (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016).
March 30, 2016 Filing 610 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Harold M. Brody (Brody, Harold) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Order, signed 3/29/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #606 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Robert L. King.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 Filing 608 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER, signed 3/28/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 606 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. King ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10320574.) filed by Omar Aguilar, Daniel Britt, Matt Daly, Leonard Davis, Grant Duff, Matt Frevert, Lauren Gagnier, Jon Gaston, Nick Giarraputo, Matt Gorgen, Brandon Henderson, Mitch Hilligoss, Ryan Hutson, Witer Jimenez, Jake Kahaulelio, Ryan Khoury, Ryan Kiel, Matt Lawson, Matt Lewis, Michael Liberto, Brad McAtee, Aaron Meade, Justin Murray, Jeff Nadeau, Joseph Newby, Brett Newsome, Kyle Nicholson, Oliver Odle, Jake Opitz, Roberto Ortiz, Tim Pahuta, Dustin Pease, Brandon Pinckney, David Quinowski, Gaspar Santiago, Aaron Senne, Lee Smith, Brad Stone, Mark Wagner, Kris Watts, Kyle Woodruff. (King, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 605 Statement re #601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Reponse to Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration - Defendants Statement in Partial Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs Response to Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration (L.R. 7-11, 79-5) by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 23, 2016 Filing 604 Proposed Order re #597 Statement,,,, [Amended Proposed] Order on Behalf of All Designating Parties Partially Granting Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baltimore Orioles, Inc., Baltimore Orioles, L.P., Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 23, 2016 Filing 603 Declaration of M. Celeste Bruce in Support of #601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Reponse to Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration filed byBaltimore Orioles, Inc., Baltimore Orioles, L.P.. (Related document(s) #601 ) (Bruce, Marie) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 602 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Senne re #601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Reponse to Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Reponse to Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Response in Opp to Motion, #4 Unredacted Response in Opp to Motion, #5 Exhibit D to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit E to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit F to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit G to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit H to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit I to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit L to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit M to Broshuis Decl. - Unredacted)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 600 Declaration of Garrett R. Broshuis in Support of #599 Opposition/Response to Motion, for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #599 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 599 RESPONSE (re #590 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 20, 2015 Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-9 ) in Opposition filed byAaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 598 Declaration of M. Celeste Bruce in partial support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Certify Class filed byBaltimore Orioles, Inc., Baltimore Orioles, L.P.. (Bruce, Marie) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 597 Statement re #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Statement in Partial Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 596 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 595 Order, signed 3/15/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #592 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joshua S. Fox.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER for Response to #590 Motion for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 20, 2015 Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-9. Plaintiffs' Response to be filed by March 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 14, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Order, signed 3/11/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #589 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 592 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joshua S. Fox ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10285588.) filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Fox, Joshua) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 591 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #8 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 590 MOTION for Leave to Move for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 20, 2015 Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-9 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J - [Proposed] Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/11/2016) Modified on 3/11/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2016 Filing 589 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Order, signed 3/10/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #582 Stipulation Changing Time. Defendants shall have until 4/4/16 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Cert #496 .(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Order, signed 3/10/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #581 Stipulation Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2. Designating Parties have until 3/18/16 to submit declaration in response to Plaintiffs' Admin Motion to File Under Seal.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Order, signed 3/9/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #579 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 585 EXHIBITS re #495 MOTION Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities AMENDED EXHIBIT AI TO REPLACE DOCKET NUMBER 495-61 filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Related document(s) #495 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 9, 2016 Filing 584 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 583 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of #581 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CHANGING TIME PER LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Related document(s) #581 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 582 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Time Per Local Rule 6-2 filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 581 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CHANGING TIME PER LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 580 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 579 Notice of Unopposed Motion to Change Time; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support Broshuis Decl., exhibits and motion to seal filed by Omar Aguilar, Edgardo Baez, Craig Bennigson, Daniel Britt, Matt Daly, Leonard Davis, Jose Diaz, Grant Duff, Matt Frevert, Lauren Gagnier, Jon Gaston, Nick Giarraputo, Matt Gorgen, Brandon Henderson, Mitch Hilligoss, Ryan Hutson, Jorge Jimenez, Witer Jimenez, Jake Kahaulelio, Ryan Khoury, Ryan Kiel, Matt Lawson, Matt Lewis, Michael Liberto, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Brad McAtee, Aaron Meade, Jorge Minyety, Justin Murray, Jeff Nadeau, Joseph Newby, Brett Newsome, Kyle Nicholson, Oliver Odle, Jake Opitz, Roberto Ortiz, Tim Pahuta, Dustin Pease, Brandon Pinckney, David Quinowski, Gaspar Santiago, Aaron Senne, Lee Smith, Brad Stone, Helder Velaquez, Mark Wagner, Kris Watts, Kyle Woodruff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Zigler Decl., #2 Proposed Order)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/7/2016) Modified on 3/8/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2016 Filing 578 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Forms (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 577 Declaration of Lauren Gagnier in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 576 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Senne re #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 575 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit v-14)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 574 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-15, #2 Exhibit J-16, #3 Exhibit J-17, #4 Exhibit J-18, #5 Exhibit J-19)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 573 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Motion for Class Certification)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 572 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit V-1, #2 Exhibit V-2, #3 Exhibit V-3, #4 Exhibit V-4, #5 Exhibit V-5, #6 Exhibit V-6, #7 Exhibit V-7, #8 Exhibit V-8, #9 Exhibit V-9, #10 Exhibit V-10, #11 Exhibit V-11, #12 Exhibit V-12, #13 Exhibit V-13, #14 Exhibit V-15, #15 Exhibit V-16, #16 Exhibit V-17, #17 Exhibit S-22)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 571 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U-19, #2 Exhibit U-20, #3 Exhibit U-21 PART 1, #4 Exhibit U-21 PART 2, #5 Exhibit U-21 PART 3, #6 Exhibit U-21 PART 4, #7 Exhibit U-21 PART 5, #8 Exhibit U-21 PART 6, #9 Exhibit U-22, #10 Exhibit U-23 PART 1, #11 Exhibit U-23 PART 2, #12 Exhibit U-23 PART 3, #13 Exhibit U-23 PART 4, #14 Exhibit U-23 PART 5, #15 Exhibit U-23 PART 6, #16 Exhibit U-23 PART 7, #17 Exhibit U-23 PART 8, #18 Exhibit U-23 PART 9, #19 Exhibit U-23 PART 10, #20 Exhibit U-23 PART 11, #21 Exhibit U-23 PART 12)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 570 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-20, #2 Exhibit S-21, #3 Exhibit S-23, #4 Exhibit S-24, #5 Exhibit S-25, #6 Exhibit S-26, #7 Exhibit S-27, #8 Exhibit S-28)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 569 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U-8 PART 1, #2 Exhibit U-8 PART 2, #3 Exhibit U-8 PART 3, #4 Exhibit U-8 PART 4, #5 Exhibit U-8 PART 5, #6 Exhibit U-9 PART 1, #7 Exhibit U-9 PART 2, #8 Exhibit U-9 PART 3, #9 Exhibit U-10, #10 Exhibit U-11 PART 1, #11 Exhibit U-11 PART 2, #12 Exhibit U-11 PART 3, #13 Exhibit U-11 PART 4, #14 Exhibit U-12, #15 Exhibit U-13, #16 Exhibit U-14, #17 Exhibit U-15, #18 Exhibit U-16, #19 Exhibit U-17, #20 Exhibit U-18)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 568 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T-1, #2 Exhibit T-2, #3 Exhibit T-3, #4 Exhibit U-1, #5 Exhibit U-2, #6 Exhibit U-3, #7 Exhibit U-4, #8 Exhibit U-5 PART 1, #9 Exhibit U-5 PART 2, #10 Exhibit U-5 PART 3, #11 Exhibit U-5 PART 4, #12 Exhibit U-6, #13 Exhibit U-7 PART 1, #14 Exhibit U-7 PART 2, #15 Exhibit U-7 PART 3)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 567 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-29, #2 Exhibit R-30, #3 Exhibit R-31, #4 Exhibit R-32, #5 Exhibit R-33, #6 Exhibit R-34, #7 Exhibit R-35, #8 Exhibit R-36, #9 Exhibit R-37 PART 1, #10 Exhibit R-37 PART 2, #11 Exhibit R-38 PART 1, #12 Exhibit R-38 PART 2, #13 Exhibit R-38 PART 3, #14 Exhibit R-39, #15 Exhibit S-1, #16 Exhibit S-2, #17 Exhibit S-3, #18 Exhibit S-4, #19 Exhibit S-5, #20 Exhibit S-6 PART 1, #21 Exhibit S-6 PART 2, #22 Exhibit S-7, #23 Exhibit S-8, #24 Exhibit S-9, #25 Exhibit S-10, #26 Exhibit S-11 PART 1, #27 Exhibit S-11 PART 2, #28 Exhibit S-12, #29 Exhibit S-13, #30 Exhibit S-14, #31 Exhibit S-15, #32 Exhibit S-16, #33 Exhibit S-17, #34 Exhibit S-18 PART 1, #35 Exhibit S-19)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 566 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-1, #2 Exhibit R-2, #3 Exhibit R-3, #4 Exhibit R-4, #5 Exhibit R-5, #6 Exhibit R-6, #7 Exhibit R-7, #8 Exhibit R-8, #9 Exhibit R-9, #10 Exhibit R-10, #11 Exhibit R-11, #12 Exhibit R-12, #13 Exhibit R-13, #14 Exhibit R-14, #15 Exhibit R-15, #16 Exhibit R-16 PART 1, #17 Exhibit R-16 PART 2, #18 Exhibit R-17, #19 Exhibit R-18, #20 Exhibit R-19, #21 Exhibit R-20, #22 Exhibit R-21, #23 Exhibit R-22, #24 Exhibit R-23, #25 Exhibit R-24, #26 Exhibit R-25, #27 Exhibit R-26 PART 1, #28 Exhibit R-26 PART 2, #29 Exhibit R-27, #30 Exhibit R-28)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 565 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q-21, #2 Exhibit Q-22, #3 Exhibit Q-23, #4 Exhibit Q-24, #5 Exhibit Q-25, #6 Exhibit Q-26, #7 Exhibit Q-27, #8 Exhibit Q-28, #9 Exhibit Q-29, #10 Exhibit Q-30, #11 Exhibit Q-31, #12 Exhibit Q-32, #13 Exhibit Q-33, #14 Exhibit Q-34)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 564 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Q-3, #2 Q-4, #3 Q-5, #4 Q-6, #5 Q-7, #6 Q-8, #7 Q-9, #8 Q-10 PART 1, #9 Q-10 PART 2, #10 Q-11, #11 Q-12, #12 Q-13, #13 Q-14, #14 Q-15 PART 1, #15 Q-15 PART 2, #16 Q-15 PART 3, #17 Q-15 PART 4, #18 Q-16, #19 Q-17, #20 Q-18, #21 Q-19, #22 Q-20)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 563 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N-1, #2 Exhibit N-2, #3 Exhibit N-3, #4 Exhibit O-1, #5 Exhibit O-2, #6 Exhibit O-3, #7 Exhibit O-4, #8 Exhibit O-5, #9 Exhibit O-6, #10 Exhibit O-7, #11 Exhibit O-8, #12 Exhibit O-9, #13 Exhibit O-10, #14 Exhibit O-11, #15 Exhibit O-12, #16 Exhibit O-13, #17 Exhibit O-14, #18 Exhibit O-15, #19 Exhibit O-16, #20 Exhibit O-17, #21 Exhibit O-18, #22 Exhibit O-19, #23 Exhibit P)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 562 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit V-1, #2 Exhibit V-2, #3 Exhibit V-3, #4 Exhibit V-4, #5 Exhibit V-5, #6 Exhibit V-6, #7 Exhibit V-7, #8 Exhibit V-8, #9 Exhibit V-9, #10 Exhibit V-10, #11 Exhibit V-11, #12 Exhibit V-12, #13 Exhibit V-13, #14 Exhibit V-14, #15 Exhibit V-15, #16 Exhibit V-16, #17 Exhibit V-17)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 561 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M-2, #2 Exhibit M-5, #3 Exhibit M-6, #4 Exhibit M-7, #5 Exhibit M-8 PART 1, #6 Exhibit M-8 PART 2, #7 Exhibit M-9, #8 Exhibit M-10, #9 Exhibit M-11, #10 Exhibit M-12, #11 Exhibit M-13 PART 1, #12 Exhibit M-13 PART 2, #13 Exhibit M-14, #14 Exhibit M-15, #15 Exhibit M-16, #16 Exhibit M-18, #17 Exhibit M-19, #18 Exhibit M-22, #19 Exhibit M-23 PART 1, #20 Exhibit M-23 PART 2, #21 Exhibit M-23 PART 3, #22 Exhibit M-23 PART 4, #23 Exhibit M-23 PART 5, #24 Exhibit M-23 PART 6, #25 Exhibit M-24, #26 Exhibit M-25)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 560 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T-1, #2 Exhibit T-2, #3 Exhibit T-3, #4 Exhibit U-1, #5 Exhibit U-2, #6 Exhibit U-3, #7 Exhibit U-4, #8 Exhibit U-5, #9 Exhibit U-6, #10 Exhibit U-7, #11 Exhibit U-8, #12 Exhibit U-9, #13 Exhibit U-10, #14 Exhibit U-11, #15 Exhibit U-12, #16 Exhibit U-13, #17 Exhibit U-14, #18 Exhibit U-15, #19 Exhibit U-16, #20 Exhibit U-17, #21 Exhibit U-18, #22 Exhibit U-19, #23 Exhibit U-20, #24 Exhibit U-21, #25 Exhibit U-22, #26 Exhibit U-23)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 559 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-21, #2 Exhibit K-22, #3 Exhibit K-23, #4 Exhibit K-24, #5 Exhibit K-25, #6 Exhibit K-26, #7 Exhibit K-27, #8 Exhibit K-28, #9 Exhibit K-29, #10 Exhibit K-30, #11 Exhibit K-31, #12 Exhibit K-32, #13 Exhibit K-33, #14 Exhibit K-34, #15 Exhibit K-35 PART 1, #16 Exhibit K-35 PART 2, #17 Exhibit K-36, #18 Exhibit K-37, #19 Exhibit K-38, #20 Exhibit K-39, #21 Exhibit K-40, #22 Exhibit K-41, #23 Exhibit K-42, #24 Exhibit K-43, #25 Exhibit K-44)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 558 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-1, #2 Exhibit S-2, #3 Exhibit S-3, #4 Exhibit S-4, #5 Exhibit S-5, #6 Exhibit S-6, #7 Exhibit S-7, #8 Exhibit S-8, #9 Exhibit S-9, #10 Exhibit S-10, #11 Exhibit S-11, #12 Exhibit S-12, #13 Exhibit S-13, #14 Exhibit S-14, #15 Exhibit S-15, #16 Exhibit S-16, #17 Exhibit S-17, #18 Exhibit S-18, #19 Exhibit S-19, #20 Exhibit S-20, #21 Exhibit S-21, #22 Exhibit S-22, #23 Exhibit S-23, #24 Exhibit S-24, #25 Exhibit S-25, #26 Exhibit S-26, #27 Exhibit S-27, #28 Exhibit S-28)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 557 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-1, #2 K-2, #3 K-3, #4 K-4, #5 K-5, #6 K-6, #7 K-7, #8 K-8, #9 K-9 PART 1, #10 K-9 PART 2, #11 K-10, #12 K-11, #13 K-12, #14 K-13, #15 K-14, #16 K-15, #17 K-16, #18 K-17, #19 K-18, #20 K-19, #21 K-20)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 556 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-1, #2 Exhibit R-2, #3 Exhibit R-3, #4 Exhibit R-4, #5 Exhibit R-5, #6 Exhibit R-6, #7 Exhibit R-7, #8 Exhibit R-8, #9 Exhibit R-9, #10 Exhibit R-10, #11 Exhibit R-11, #12 Exhibit R-12, #13 Exhibit R-13, #14 Exhibit R-14, #15 Exhibit R-15, #16 Exhibit R-16, #17 Exhibit R-17, #18 Exhibit R-18, #19 Exhibit R-19, #20 Exhibit R-20, #21 Exhibit R-21, #22 Exhibit R-22, #23 Exhibit R-23, #24 Exhibit R-24, #25 Exhibit R-25, #26 Exhibit R-26, #27 Exhibit R-27, #28 Exhibit R-28, #29 Exhibit R-29, #30 Exhibit R-30, #31 Exhibit R-31, #32 Exhibit R-32, #33 Exhibit R-33, #34 Exhibit R-34, #35 Exhibit R-35, #36 Exhibit R-36, #37 Exhibit R-37, #38 Exhibit R-38, #39 Exhibit R-39)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 555 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-9, #2 Exhibit I-31, #3 Exhibit I-32, #4 Exhibit I-33, #5 Exhibit I-34, #6 Exhibit I-35, #7 Exhibit I-36, #8 Exhibit I-37, #9 Exhibit J-1, #10 Exhibit J-3, #11 Exhibit J-4, #12 Exhibit J-5, #13 Exhibit J-6, #14 Exhibit J-7, #15 Exhibit J-8, #16 Exhibit J-9, #17 Exhibit J-10, #18 Exhibit J-11, #19 Exhibit J-12, #20 Exhibit J-13, #21 Exhibit J-14)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 554 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1, #2 Exhibit Q-1, #3 Exhibit Q-2, #4 Exhibit Q-3, #5 Exhibit Q-4, #6 Exhibit Q-5, #7 Exhibit Q-6, #8 Exhibit Q-7, #9 Exhibit Q-8, #10 Exhibit Q-9, #11 Exhibit Q-10, #12 Exhibit Q-11, #13 Exhibit Q-12, #14 Exhibit Q-13, #15 Exhibit Q-14, #16 Exhibit Q-15, #17 Exhibit Q-16, #18 Exhibit Q-17, #19 Exhibit Q-18, #20 Exhibit Q-19, #21 Exhibit Q-20, #22 Exhibit Q-21, #23 Exhibit Q-22, #24 Exhibit Q-23, #25 Exhibit Q-24, #26 Exhibit Q-25, #27 Exhibit Q-26, #28 Exhibit Q-27, #29 Exhibit Q-28, #30 Exhibit Q-29, #31 Exhibit Q-30, #32 Exhibit Q-31, #33 Exhibit Q-32, #34 Exhibit Q-33, #35 Exhibit Q-34)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 553 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-31, #2 Exhibit I-32, #3 Exhibit I-33, #4 Exhibit I-34, #5 Exhibit I-35, #6 Exhibit I-36, #7 Exhibit I-37, #8 Exhibit J-1, #9 Exhibit J-2, #10 Exhibit J-3, #11 Exhibit J-4, #12 Exhibit J-5, #13 Exhibit J-6, #14 Exhibit J-7, #15 Exhibit J-8, #16 Exhibit J-9, #17 Exhibit J-10, #18 Exhibit J-11, #19 Exhibit J-12, #20 Exhibit J-13, #21 Exhibit J-14)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 552 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N-1, #2 Exhibit N-2, #3 Exhibit N-3, #4 Exhibit O-1, #5 Exhibit O-2, #6 Exhibit O-3, #7 Exhibit O-4, #8 Exhibit O-5, #9 Exhibit O-6, #10 Exhibit O-7, #11 Exhibit O-8, #12 Exhibit O-9, #13 Exhibit O-10, #14 Exhibit O-11, #15 Exhibit O-12, #16 Exhibit O-13, #17 Exhibit O-14, #18 Exhibit O-15, #19 Exhibit O-16, #20 Exhibit O-17, #21 Exhibit O-18, #22 Exhibit O-19)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 551 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-15 PART 1, #2 Exhibit I-15 PART 2, #3 Exhibit I-15 PART 3, #4 Exhibit I-15 PART 4, #5 Exhibit I-15 PART 5, #6 Exhibit I-16, #7 Exhibit I-17 PART 1, #8 Exhibit I-17 PART 2, #9 Exhibit I-18, #10 Exhibit I-19, #11 Exhibit I-20, #12 Exhibit I-21, #13 Exhibit I-23, #14 Exhibit I-24, #15 Exhibit I-25, #16 Exhibit I-26 PART 1, #17 Exhibit I-26 PART 2, #18 Exhibit I-26 PART 3, #19 Exhibit I-27, #20 Exhibit I-28, #21 Exhibit I-29, #22 Exhibit I-30 PART 1, #23 Exhibit I-30 PART 2, #24 Exhibit I-30 PART 3, #25 Exhibit I-30 PART 4, #26 Exhibit I-30 PART 5, #27 Exhibit I-30 PART 6, #28 Exhibit I-30 PART 7, #29 Exhibit I-30 PART 8)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 550 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M-1, #2 Exhibit M-2, #3 Exhibit M-3, #4 Exhibit M-4, #5 Exhibit M-5, #6 Exhibit M-6, #7 Exhibit M-7, #8 Exhibit M-8, #9 Exhibit M-9, #10 Exhibit M-10, #11 Exhibit M-11, #12 Exhibit M-12, #13 Exhibit M-13, #14 Exhibit M-14, #15 Exhibit M-15, #16 Exhibit M-16, #17 Exhibit M-17 part 1, #18 Exhibit M-17 part 2, #19 Exhibit M-17 part 3, #20 Exhibit M-17 part 4, #21 Exhibit M-18, #22 Exhibit M-19, #23 Exhibit M-20, #24 Exhibit M-21, #25 Exhibit M-22, #26 Exhibit M-23, #27 Exhibit M-24, #28 Exhibit M-25)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 549 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-39, #2 Exhibit K-40, #3 Exhibit K-41, #4 Exhibit K-42, #5 Exhibit K-43, #6 Exhibit K-44)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 548 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-12, #2 Exhibit G-13, #3 Exhibit I-2, #4 Exhibit I-3, #5 Exhibit I-4, #6 Exhibit I-5, #7 Exhibit I-6 PART 1, #8 Exhibit I-6 PART 2, #9 Exhibit I-7, #10 Exhibit I-8, #11 Exhibit I-10, #12 Exhibit I-11, #13 Exhibit I-12 PART 1, #14 Exhibit I-12 PART 2, #15 Exhibit I-13, #16 Exhibit I-14)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 547 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-33, #2 Exhibit K-34, #3 Exhibit K-35, #4 Exhibit K-36, #5 Exhibit K-37, #6 Exhibit K-38)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 546 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in support of #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Omar Aguilar, Edgardo Baez, Craig Bennigson, Daniel Britt, Matt Daly, Leonard Davis, Jose Diaz, Grant Duff, Matt Frevert, Lauren Gagnier, Jon Gaston, Nick Giarraputo, Matt Gorgen, Brandon Henderson, Mitch Hilligoss, Ryan Hutson, Jorge Jimenez, Witer Jimenez, Jake Kahaulelio, Ryan Khoury, Ryan Kiel, Matt Lawson, Matt Lewis, Michael Liberto, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Brad McAtee, Aaron Meade, Jorge Minyety, Justin Murray, Jeff Nadeau, Joseph Newby, Brett Newsome, Kyle Nicholson, Oliver Odle, Jake Opitz, Roberto Ortiz, Tim Pahuta, Dustin Pease, Brandon Pinckney, David Quinowski, Gaspar Santiago, Aaron Senne, Lee Smith, Brad Stone, Helder Velaquez, Mark Wagner, Kris Watts, Kyle Woodruff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F-31, #2 Exhibit F-32, #3 Exhibit F-33, #4 Exhibit F-34, #5 Exhibit F-35, #6 Exhibit F-36 PART 1, #7 Exhibit F-36 PART 2, #8 Exhibit F-37, #9 Exhibit F-38, #10 Exhibit F-39, #11 Exhibit F-40, #12 Exhibit F-41, #13 Exhibit F-42 PART 1, #14 Exhibit F-42 PART 2, #15 Exhibit F-42 PART 3, #16 Exhibit F-42 PART 4, #17 Exhibit F-42 PART 5)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016) Modified on 3/7/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2016 Filing 545 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-15, #2 Exhibit K-16, #3 Exhibit K-17, #4 Exhibit K18, #5 Exhibit K19, #6 Exhibit K-20, #7 Exhibit K-21, #8 Exhibit K-22, #9 Exhibit K-23, #10 Exhibit K-24, #11 Exhibit K-25, #12 Exhibit K-26, #13 Exhibit K-27, #14 Exhibit K-28, #15 Exhibit K-29, #16 Exhibit K-30, #17 Exhibit K-31, #18 Exhibit K-32)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 544 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-1, #2 Exhibit K-2, #3 Exhibit K-3, #4 Exhibit K-4, #5 Exhibit K-5, #6 Exhibit K-6, #7 Exhibit K-7, #8 Exhibit K-8, #9 Exhibit K-9, #10 Exhibit K-10, #11 Exhibit K-11, #12 Exhibit K-12, #13 Exhibit K-13, #14 Exhibit K-14)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 543 EXHIBITS re #542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOmar Aguilar, Edgardo Baez, Craig Bennigson, Daniel Britt, Matt Daly, Leonard Davis, Jose Diaz, Grant Duff, Matt Frevert, Lauren Gagnier, Jon Gaston, Nick Giarraputo, Matt Gorgen, Brandon Henderson, Mitch Hilligoss, Ryan Hutson, Jorge Jimenez, Witer Jimenez, Jake Kahaulelio, Ryan Khoury, Ryan Kiel, Matt Lawson, Matt Lewis, Michael Liberto, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Brad McAtee, Aaron Meade, Jorge Minyety, Justin Murray, Jeff Nadeau, Joseph Newby, Brett Newsome, Kyle Nicholson, Oliver Odle, Jake Opitz, Roberto Ortiz, Tim Pahuta, Dustin Pease, Brandon Pinckney, David Quinowski, Gaspar Santiago, Aaron Senne, Lee Smith, Brad Stone, Helder Velaquez, Mark Wagner, Kris Watts, Kyle Woodruff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F-16, #2 Exhibit F-17, #3 Exhibit F-18, #4 Exhibit F-19, #5 Exhibit F-21 Part 1, #6 Exhibit F-21 Part 2, #7 Exhibit F-22, #8 Exhibit F-23, #9 Exhibit F-24, #10 Exhibit F-25, #11 Exhibit F-26, #12 Exhibit F-27, #13 Exhibit F-28, #14 Exhibit F-29, #15 Exhibit F-30)(Related document(s) #542 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Omar Aguilar, Edgardo Baez, Craig Bennigson, Daniel Britt, Matt Daly, Leonard Davis, Jose Diaz, Grant Duff, Matt Frevert, Lauren Gagnier, Jon Gaston, Nick Giarraputo, Matt Gorgen, Brandon Henderson, Mitch Hilligoss, Ryan Hutson, Jorge Jimenez, Witer Jimenez, Jake Kahaulelio, Ryan Khoury, Ryan Kiel, Matt Lawson, Matt Lewis, Michael Liberto, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Brad McAtee, Aaron Meade, Jorge Minyety, Justin Murray, Jeff Nadeau, Joseph Newby, Brett Newsome, Kyle Nicholson, Oliver Odle, Jake Opitz, Roberto Ortiz, Tim Pahuta, Dustin Pease, Brandon Pinckney, David Quinowski, Gaspar Santiago, Aaron Senne, Lee Smith, Brad Stone, Helder Velaquez, Mark Wagner, Kris Watts, Kyle Woodruff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Broshuis Decl, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit D-6, #4 Exhibit D-8, #5 Exhibit D-12, #6 Exhibit D-17, #7 Exhibit F-1, #8 Exhibit F-2 Part 1, #9 Exhibit F-2 Part 2, #10 Exhibit F-3, #11 Exhibit F-4, #12 Exhibit F-5, #13 Exhibit F-6, #14 Exhibit F-7, #15 Exhibit F-8, #16 Exhibit F-9, #17 Exhibit F-10 Part 1, #18 Exhibit F-10 Part 2, #19 Exhibit F-11, #20 Exhibit F-12, #21 Exhibit F-13, #22 Exhibit F-14, #23 Exhibit F-15 Part 1, #24 Exhibit F-15 Part 2)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 541 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-1, #2 Exhibit J-2, #3 Exhibit J-3, #4 Exhibit J-4, #5 Exhibit J-5, #6 Exhibit J-6, #7 Exhibit J-7, #8 Exhibit J-8, #9 Exhibit J-9, #10 Exhibit J-10, #11 Exhibit J-11, #12 Exhibit J-12, #13 Exhibit J-13, #14 Exhibit J-14, #15 Exhibit J-15, #16 Exhibit J-16, #17 Exhibit J-17, #18 Exhibit J-18, #19 Exhibit J-19)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 540 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-1, #2 Exhibit I-2, #3 Exhibit I-3, #4 Exhibit I-4, #5 Exhibit I-5, #6 Exhibit I-6, #7 Exhibit I-7, #8 Exhibit I-8, #9 Exhibit I-9, #10 Exhibit I-10, #11 Exhibit I-11, #12 Exhibit I-12, #13 Exhibit I-13, #14 Exhibit I-14, #15 Exhibit I-15, #16 Exhibit I-16, #17 Exhibit I-17, #18 Exhibit I-18, #19 Exhibit I-19, #20 Exhibit 1-20, #21 Exhibit I-21, #22 Exhibit 1-22, #23 Exhibit I-23, #24 Exhibit I-24, #25 Exhibit I-25, #26 Exhibit I-26, #27 Exhibit I-27, #28 Exhibit I-28, #29 Exhibit I-29, #30 Exhibit I-30, #31 Exhibit I-31, #32 Exhibit 1-32, #33 Exhibit I-33, #34 Exhibit I-34, #35 Exhibit 1-35, #36 Exhibit I-36, #37 Exhibit I-37)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 539 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-1, #2 Exhibit G-2, #3 Exhibit G-3, #4 Exhibit G-4, #5 Exhibit G-5, #6 Exhibit G-6, #7 Exhibit G-7, #8 Exhibit G-8, #9 Exhibit G-9, #10 Exhibit G-10, #11 Exhibit G-11, #12 Exhibit G-12, #13 Exhibit G-13, #14 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 538 EXHIBITS re #537 Declaration in Support,, #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F-1, #2 Exhibit F-2, #3 Exhibit F-3, #4 Exhibit F-4, #5 Exhibit F-5, #6 Exhibit F-6, #7 Exhibit F-7, #8 Exhibit F-8, #9 Exhibit F-9, #10 Exhibit F-10, #11 Exhibit F-11, #12 Exhibit F-12, #13 Exhibit F-13, #14 Exhibit F-14, #15 Exhibit F-15, #16 Exhibit F-16, #17 Exhibit F-17, #18 Exhibit F-18, #19 Exhibit F-19, #20 Exhibit F-21, #21 Exhibit F-22, #22 Exhibit F-23, #23 Exhibit F-24, #24 Exhibit F-25, #25 Exhibit F-26, #26 Exhibit F-27, #27 Exhibit F-28, #28 Exhibit F-29, #29 Exhibit F-30, #30 Exhibit F-31, #31 Exhibit F-32, #32 Exhibit F-33, #33 Exhibit F-34, #34 Exhibit F-35, #35 Exhibit F-36, #36 Exhibit F-37, #37 Exhibit F-38, #38 Exhibit F-39, #39 Exhibit F-40, #40 Exhibit F-41, #41 Exhibit F-42)(Related document(s) #537 , #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 537 Declaration of Garrett Broshuis in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part2, #4 Exhibit C - Part 1, #5 Exhibit C - Part 2, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit D-3, #9 Exhibit D-4, #10 Exhibit D-5, #11 Exhibit D-6, #12 Exhibit D-7, #13 Exhibit D-8, #14 Exhibit D-9, #15 Exhibit D-10, #16 Exhibit D-11, #17 Exhibit D-12, #18 Exhibit D-13, #19 Exhibit D-14, #20 Exhibit D-15, #21 Exhibit D-16, #22 Exhibit D-17, #23 Exhibit D-18, #24 Exhibit D-19, #25 Errata D-20)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 536 Proposed Order re #496 MOTION to Certify Class by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 535 Declaration of Kyle Woodruff in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 534 Declaration of Joel Weeks in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 533 Declaration of Kris Watts in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 532 Declaration of Brad Stone in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 531 Declaration of Les Smith in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 530 Declaration of Aaron Senne in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 529 Declaration of Gaspar Santiago in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 528 Declaration of David Quinowski in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 527 Declaration of Brandon Pinckney in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 526 Declaration of Dustin Pease in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 525 Declaration of Tim Pahuta in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 524 Declaration of Roberto Ortiz in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 523 Declaration of Jake Opitz in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 522 Declaration of Oliver Odle in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 521 Declaration of Kyle Nicholson in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 520 Declaration Brett Newsome filed byAaron Senne. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 519 Declaration of Joseph Newby in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 518 Declaration of Aaron Dott in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 517 Declaration of Justin Murray in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 516 Declaration of Aaron Meade in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 515 Declaration of Michael Liberto in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 514 Declaration of Matt Lawson in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 513 Declaration of Ryan Kiel in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 512 Declaration of Ryan Khoury in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 511 Declaration of Jake Kahaulelio in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 510 Declaration of Ryan Hutson in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 509 Declaration of Mitch Hilligoss in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 508 Declaration of Brandon Henderson in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 507 Declaration of Nick Giarraputo in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 506 Declaration of Jon Gaston in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 505 Declaration of Matt Frevert in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 504 Declaration of Grant Duff in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 503 Declaration of Matt Daly in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 502 Declaration of Daniel Britt in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 501 Declaration of Craig Benningson in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 500 Declaration of Bruce Simon in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 499 Declaration of Stephen Tillery in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 498 Declaration of J. Michael Dennis in Support of #497 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #497 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 497 Declaration of Kriegler in Support of #496 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAaron Senne. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 496 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/18/2016. Replies due by 3/25/2016. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 495 MOTION Motion to Decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/1/2016. Replies due by 4/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Exhibit SS, #47 Exhibit TT, #48 Exhibit UU, #49 Exhibit VV, #50 Exhibit WW, #51 Exhibit XX, #52 Exhibit YY, #53 Exhibit ZZ, #54 Exhibit AB, #55 Exhibit AC, #56 Exhibit AD, #57 Exhibit AE, #58 Exhibit AF, #59 Exhibit AG, #60 Exhibit AH, Document removed per court order. Replaced with Document #585 # 61 Exhibit AI, #62 Exhibit AJ, #63 Exhibit AK, #64 Exhibit AL, #65 Exhibit AM, #66 Exhibit AN, #67 Exhibit AO, #68 Exhibit AP, #69 Exhibit AQ, #70 Exhibit AR, #71 Exhibit AS, #72 Exhibit AT)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 3/4/2016) Modified on 3/10/2016 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 2/25/2016 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 4/4/2016 at 11:00 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 494 NOTICE by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P. OF NAME CHANGE AND EMAIL ADDRESS CHANGE (Santoro, Rachel) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 493 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 492 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 16, 2016 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled on 2/18/2016, has been rescheduled to 2/25/2016, at 11:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 491 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 490 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 489 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-29-2016, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (486 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER RE: RULINGS ON DISCOVERY ISSUES AND FURTHR CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re: #461 Discovery Letter Brief; granting #462 Discovery Letter Brief; granting #480 Discovery Letter Brief. Updated joint case management conference statement due 5/13/16. Further case management conference set for 5/20/16 at 9:30 AM. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 487 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P. for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 486 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aaron Senne for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 485 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2016 re #462 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Document Production and Interrogatory Responses filed by Aaron Senne, #480 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' 30(b)(6) Depositions and ESI Production filed by Aaron Senne, #461 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Opt-In Discovery filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP, Further Case Management Conference held on 1/29/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court 40 M. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/1/2016)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Order, signed 1/29/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #482 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Noa M. Baddish.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER, signed 1/28/16, GRANTING re #481 Letter filed by Aaron Senne for Bobby Pouya to appear by phone on 1/29/16 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/28/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 482 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Noa M. Baddish ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10168911.) filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baddish, Noa) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 481 Letter from Bobby Pouya re Appearance by Telephone at the January 29, 2016 Case Management Conference and Hearing re Discovery Letter Brief. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 480 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' 30(b)(6) Depositions and ESI Production filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 479 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 25, 2016 Filing 478 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 477 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER GRANTING re #475 Letter filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Allan Huber Selig, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP for Elise Bloom and Adam Lupion to appear by phone on 1/29/16 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 01/22/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 475 Letter regarding telephonic appearance at Case Management Conference and hearing on pending discovery matters on January 29, 2016 by Elise M. Bloom and Adam M. Lupion. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 474 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 11, 2016 Filing 473 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Order, signed 1/7/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Support of Joint Letter Brief Re: Defendants' Document Production and Interrogatory Responses.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 471 Declaration of Bart Waldman in Support of #468 Order, in Response to December 30, 2015 Order to Show Cause filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Related document(s) #468 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 470 Declaration of Jack Bair in Support of #468 Order, in Response to December 30, 2015 Order to Show Cause filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Related document(s) #468 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 5, 2016 Filing 469 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING HEARING as to #462 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Document Production and Interrogatory Responses and #461 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Opt-In Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. The Further Case Management Conference, previously set for 1/29/16 at 2:00 PM, has been re-set for 1/29/2016 at 09:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF JOINT LETTER BRIEF SHOULD NOT BE DENIED. Defendants may file supplemental declaration in support of request to seal no later than January 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 30, 2015. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 30, 2015 Filing 467 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 28, 2015 Filing 466 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 28, 2015 Filing 465 Statement re #463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Document Production and Interrogatory Responses Defendants' Statement In Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion To File Certain Documents Under Seal In Support Of The Joint Letter Brief. by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 28, 2015 Filing 464 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom in Support of #463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Document Production and Interrogatory Responses filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Related document(s) #463 ) (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Document Production and Interrogatory Responses filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Documents Sought to be Sealed, #4 Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to be Sealed, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 462 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Document Production and Interrogatory Responses filed by Aaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-H)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 461 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Opt-In Discovery filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 460 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 459 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Withdrawal of FLSA Consent Form (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 458 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Lee Simon (Simon, Alexander) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 457 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 12/11/2015 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 2/18/2016 at 11:00 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 456 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 455 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 454 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 453 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled for 12/2/15 has been reset to 12/11/15 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific. Dial-in information remains the same. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 452 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 451 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER of USCA (15-72971) that the petition is denied. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 449 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 10, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on November 10, 2015 with Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for December 2, 2015 at Noon. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 448 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 20, 2015 Filing 447 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #414 Motion for Conditional Certification Pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #446 . *** ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #414 Motion For Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015) Modified on 10/20/2015 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2015 Filing 444 NOTICE of Change of Address by D. Gregory Valenza (Valenza, D.) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 443 MOTION to Compel filed by Omar Aguilar, Edgardo Baez, Craig Bennigson, Daniel Britt, Matt Daly, Leonard Davis, Jose Diaz, Grant Duff, Matt Frevert, Lauren Gagnier, Jon Gaston, Nick Giarraputo, Matt Gorgen, Brandon Henderson, Mitch Hilligoss, Ryan Hutson, Jorge Jimenez, Witer Jimenez, Jake Kahaulelio, Ryan Khoury, Ryan Kiel, Matt Lawson, Matt Lewis, Michael Liberto, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Brad McAtee, Aaron Meade, Jorge Minyety, Justin Murray, Jeff Nadeau, Joseph Newby, Brett Newsome, Kyle Nicholson, Oliver Odle, Jake Opitz, Roberto Ortiz, Tim Pahuta, Dustin Pease, Brandon Pinckney, David Quinowski, Gaspar Santiago, Aaron Senne, Lee Smith, Brad Stone, Helder Velaquez, Mark Wagner, Kris Watts, Kyle Woodruff. Responses due by 10/28/2015. Replies due by 11/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel (part 2 of 3), #2 Motion to Compel (part 3 of 3)) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Order by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting third-party discovery, signed on October 14, 2015. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 441 Letter from Bobby Pouya and Elise M. Bloom Joint Letter re Indians Third-Party Discovery. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 8, 2015 Filing 440 NOTICE by Aaron Senne of Filing FLSA Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 439 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2016. Motion for Class Cert and Defendants' Motion to Decertify FLSA Collective due by 3/4/2016. Replies for both motions due by 4/15/2016. Responses/Oppositions to both motions due by 4/1/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing on both motions set for 5/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/7/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 438 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/2/15, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporteruntil the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #434 Transcript Order,,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (Related documents(s) #434 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 437 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aaron Senne for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 436 USCA Number: 15-72971 for Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 435 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2015 re: #414 MOTION Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to The Fair Labor Standards Act filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Submitted. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2016. Motion for Class Cert and Defendants' Motion to Decertify FLSA Collective due by 3/4/2016. Replies for both motions due by 4/15/2016. Responses/Oppositions to both motions due by 4/1/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing on both motions set for 5/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.Court Reporter Name Joann Bryce. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 434 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 433 Statement re #414 MOTION Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to The Fair Labor Standards Act Joint Submission of Proposed FLSA Notices by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 432 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Regarding October 2, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by Aaron Senne. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 431 REPLY (re #414 MOTION Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to The Fair Labor Standards Act ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 430 RESPONSE (re #414 MOTION Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to The Fair Labor Standards Act ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Elise M. Bloom, #10 Declaration of Brian Chattin, #11 Declaration of Tom Flanagan, #12 Declaration of Ian Levin, #13 Declaration of Scott Sharp, #14 Declaration of Zach Wilson, #15 Declaration of Peter Woodfork)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harrison Pearson (Pearson, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 428 NOTICE by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #421 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Docket Nos. 235, 236 and 292 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015).
July 22, 2015 Filing 426 RESPONSE (re #421 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 425 RESPONSE (re #421 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ) Defendants' Opposition to Marti Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Allan Huber Selig, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 424 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/10/2015, before Judge Joseph Spero. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number 415-264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (422 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order, (423 in 3:14-cv-00608-JCS) Transcript Order,,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 15, 2015 Filing 423 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P. for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 14, 2015 Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aaron Senne for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 421 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez. (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #410 AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT IN PART FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 419 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/10/2015. Discovery Hearing re: Joint Discovery Letter #403 held on 7/10/2015. Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2015 re #410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Padres L.P., Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., New York Yankees P'ship, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Rangers Baseball, LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, AZPB L.P., Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P., Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Angels Baseball LP Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 418 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion for Reconsideration by Edgardo Baez, Jose Diaz, Jorge Jimenez, Yadel Marti, Edwin Maysonet, Jorge Minyety, Helder Velaquez (Kornhauser, Samuel) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 417 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Regarding July 10, 2015 Status Conference filed by Aaron Senne. (Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 416 Declaration of Tim Pahuta in Support of #414 MOTION Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to The Fair Labor Standards Act filed byTim Pahuta. (Related document(s) #414 ) (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 29, 2015 Filing 415 Declaration of Justin Murray in Support of #414 MOTION Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to The Fair Labor Standards Act filed byJustin Murray. (Related document(s) #414 ) (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 414 MOTION Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to The Fair Labor Standards Act filed by Aaron Senne. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 8/21/2015. Replies due by 9/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya in Suppot of Plaintiffs' Motion for Notice to the Class and Conditional Certification Pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act, #2 Declaration of Omar Aguilar, #3 Declaration of Craig Bennigson, #4 Declaration of Daniel Britt, #5 Declaration of Matt Daly, #6 Declaration of Leonard Davis, #7 Declaration of Grant Duff, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service of Matt Frevert, #9 Declaration of Lauren Gagnier, #10 Declaration of Jon Gaston, #11 Declaration of Nick Giarraputo, #12 Declaration of Brandon Henderson, #13 Declaration of Mitch Hilligoss, #14 Declaration of Ryan Hutson, #15 Declaration of Witer Jimenez, #16 Declaration of Jake Kahaulelio, #17 Declaration of Ryan Khoury, #18 Declaration of Ryan Kiel, #19 Declaration of Matt Lawson, #20 Declaration of Matthew Lewis, #21 Declaration of Michael Liberto, #22 Declaration of Brad McAtee, #23 Declaration of Aaron Meade, #24 Declaration of Jeff Nadeau, #25 Declaration of Joseph Newby, #26 Declaration of Brett Newsome, #27 Declaration of Kyle Nicholson, #28 Declaration of Oliver Odle, #29 Declaration of Jake Opitz, #30 Declaration of Roberto Ortiz, #31 Declaration of Dustin Pease, #32 Declaration of Brandon Pinckney, #33 Declaration of David Quinowski, #34 Declaration of Gaspar Santiago, #35 Declaration of Aaron Senne, #36 Declaration of Les Smith, #37 Declaration of Brad Stone, #38 Declaration of Mark Wagner, #39 Declaration of Kris Watts, #40 Declaration of Joel Weeks, #41 Declaration of Kyle Woodruff, #42 Proposed Order)(Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 10/20/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2015 Filing 413 REPLY (re #410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim ) filed byAZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held with Howard Herman on 6/16/2015. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 10:00 AM. Call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 12, 2015 Filing 412 RESPONSE (re #410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim ) filed byAaron Senne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Zigler)(Broshuis, Garrett) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 411 CLERK'S NOTICE : Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero as to #403 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by AZPB L.P., Angels Baseball LP, Athletics Investment Group, LLC, Baseball Club of Seattle, LLLP, The, Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Cincinnati Reds, LLC, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Detroit Tigers, Inc., Houston Baseball Partners LLC, Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., Los Angeles Dodgers Holding Company LLC, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, Miami Marlins, L.P., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins, LLC, New York Yankees P'ship, Padres L.P., Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express, LLC, Rangers Baseball, LLC, Rogers Blue Jays Baseball Partnership, San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., San Francisco Baseball Associates, LLC, St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Sterling Mets L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/12/2015. Replies due by 6/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Adam M. Lupion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam M. Lupion, #3 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 409 Answer to Amended Complaint #382 Amended Complaint,,,,,, byMilwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P.. (Bloom, Elise) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015