Hayes v. Magnachip Semiconductor Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Hayes
Defendant: Magnachip Semiconductor Corp., Sang Park, Tae Young Hwang and Margaret Sakai
Case Number: 3:2014cv01160
Filed: March 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 340 Motion for Settlement; granting 341 Motion for Attorney Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING SECOND RENEWED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 335 Motion for Settlement. Fairness Hearing set for 5/10/2018 at 2:00 PM. in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 331 Motion for Settlement. Motion due by 12/22/2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL AND DENYING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH AVENUE CAPITAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 321 Motion for Settlement; granting 324 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 317 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed by Avenue Capital Management II, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 306 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Avenue Capital Management II, L.P. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 299 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding expert disclosure deadlines filed by Keith Thomas, Herb Smith. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 294 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 292 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding briefing of anticipated motion to strike filed by Keith Thomas, Herb Smith. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 231 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 251 Motion for Settlement; granting 252 Motion for Attorney Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Avenue Capital Management II, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 221 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 218 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Order Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Standard Litigation filed by Avenue Capital Management II, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 203 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Avenue Capital Management II, L.P., Michael Elkins, Randal Klein filed by Avenue Capital Management II, L.P., Randal Klein, Michael Elkins. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF A CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 185 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 198 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT AVENUE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT II, L.P.'S TIME TO ANSWER THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Avenue Capital Management II, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 185 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PARTIAL CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Oklahoma Police Pensio n & Retirement System, Keith Thomas, Herb Smith, Richard Hayes. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying without prejudice 121 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 123 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 126 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 130 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 155 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 186 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ON CONFIDENTIALITY filed by Oklahoma Police Pension & Retirement System, Keith Thomas, Herb Smith, Richard Hayes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER VACATING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AS MOOT re 176 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION: (1) TO AUTHORIZE SERVICE ON UNSERVED DEFENDANTS LOCATED ABROAD PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4( f)(3); OR (2) IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO PARTIALLY LIFT THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY filed by Oklahoma Police Pension & Retirement System, Keith Thomas, Herb Smith, Richard Hayes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 176 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION: (1) TO AUTHORIZE SERVICE ON UNSERVED DEFENDANTS LOCATED ABROAD PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(f)(3) filed by Oklahoma Police Pension & Retirement System, Keith Thomas, Herb Smith, Richard Hayes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER RE: SERVICE DEADLINES re 166 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Oklahoma Police Pension & Retirement System, Keith Thomas, Herb Smith, Richard Hayes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER RE: SERVICE DEADLINES re 161 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Oklahoma Police Pension & Retirement System, Keith Thomas, Herb Smith, Richard Hayes. Status Report due by 11/30/2015. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: UNTIMELY FILING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Show Cause Response due by 11/17/2015. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER AMENDING PLAINTIFFS PAGE LIMIT FOR THEIR OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Keith Thomas, Herb Smith, Richard Hayes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JASON C. HEGT PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Correction of docket 118.(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER RE MOTION TO COORDINATE AND PARTIALLY CONSOLIDATE A RELATED ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (78) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:14-cv-01160-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Corrected Amended Class Action Complaint filed by R. Douglas Norby, Nader Tavakoli, Ilbok Lee, Magnachip Semiconductor Corp. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO CORRECTED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Magnachip Semiconductor Corp. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Regarding Deadline for Amended Complaint filed by Magnachip Semiconductor Corp. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO APPROVE LEAD PLAINTIFF filed by Magnachip Semiconductor Corp. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 23, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Magnachip Semiconductor Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hayes
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnachip Semiconductor Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sang Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae Young Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Sakai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?