OneBeacon Insurance Company v. Plant Insulation Company
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company and Transport Insurance Company
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson and USBC Manager-San Francisco
Appellee: Plant Insulation Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Plant Insulation Company and Charles B Renfrew
Appellant: OneBeacon Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company and Safety National Casualty Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv01200
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER TERMINATING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR APPELLANTS TO APPEAL FROM ORDER AFFIRMING CONFIRMATION OF AMENDED AND RESTATED SECOND AMENDED PLAN OF REORGANIZATION OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATED JOINT MOTION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR APPELLANTS TOAPPEAL FROM ORDER AFFIRMING CONFIRMATION OF AMENDED AND RESTATED SECOND AMENDED PLAN F REORGANIZATION OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/11/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF EQUITABLE MOOTNESS AS TO APPEAL AND REVIEW OF MODIFIED CONFIRMATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/20/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER AFFIRMING CONFIRMATION OF REVISED PLAN OF REORGANIZATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/18/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OneBeacon Insurance Company v. Plant Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Plant Insulation Company
Represented By: Ryan T. Routh
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Lori Sinanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Plant Insulation Company
Represented By: Michael H. Ahrens
Represented By: Michael Magayne Lauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charles B Renfrew
Represented By: Gary Scott Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OneBeacon Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Day Soper
Represented By: Philip Aloysius O'Connell, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Millner
Represented By: Meeghan Leahy Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Clinton Earl Cameron
Represented By: Seth Martin Erickson
Represented By: Chad A. Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Safety National Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Paul Joseph Killion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Randall James Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Randall James Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Randall James Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Represented By: Kathrine A. McLendon
Represented By: Terry Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Insurance Company
Represented By: Ray L. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?