Canon Solutions America, Inc. v. Ray Morgan Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Canon Solutions America, Inc.
Defendant: Steve Rieger, Mark Hipperson, Deborah Royston, Ray Morgan Company, Inc., Craig Collins, Anthony Bishop and RMC A Ray Morgan Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv01202
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order 94 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STIPULATION AND ORDER; VACATING THE 8/18/2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 92 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by RMC A Ray Morgan Company LLC, Deborah Royston, Ray Morgan Company, Inc., Craig Collins, Steve Rieger, Canon Solutions America, Inc., Mark Hipperson. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/14/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order 93 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order 63 ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY; SUBSTITUTING JAMES R. BETTS in place of Timothy L. Thompson re 46 Proposed Order filed by Deborah Royston. Attorney William H. Littlewood; Vincenza Rabenn; Timothy John Buchanan and Nikole Elizabeth Cunningham terminated as to representation of Defendant Deborah Royston. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/13/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order 62 ORDER REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Lead Counsel's personal appearance for Meet and Confer Session set for Monday, 5/12/2014 10:00 AM. Defendant Deborah Royston is hereby on notice that her personal appearance may be required Tuesday, 5/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers to address under oath any unresolved issues. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order 60 ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND EXPEDITED DEADLINES [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] re 56 Stipulation, filed by RMC A Ray Morgan Company LLC, Deborah Royston, Ray Morgan Company, Inc., Craig Collins, Anthony Bishop, Steve Rieger, Canon Solutions America, Inc., Mark Hipperson, 59 Proposed Order filed by RMC A Ray Morgan Company LLC, Ray Morgan Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/1/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order 52 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 47 , 48 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN. Telephone Conference set for Monday, 4/28/2014 04:30 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/7/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DOCUMENT COLLECTION AND PRESERVATION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/28/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER REASSIGING CASE: Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/18/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/18/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canon Solutions America, Inc. v. Ray Morgan Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rieger
Represented By: Erin Michelle Farrel Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hipperson
Represented By: Timothy John Buchanan
Represented By: Nikole Elizabeth Cunningham
Represented By: William H. Littlewood
Represented By: Vincenza Rabenn
Represented By: Timothy L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Royston
Represented By: Timothy John Buchanan
Represented By: Nikole Elizabeth Cunningham
Represented By: William H. Littlewood
Represented By: Vincenza Rabenn
Represented By: Timothy L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Morgan Company, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy John Buchanan
Represented By: Nikole Elizabeth Cunningham
Represented By: William H. Littlewood
Represented By: Vincenza Rabenn
Represented By: Timothy L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Collins
Represented By: Erin Michelle Farrel Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bishop
Represented By: Patricia A. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew Kaiho Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC A Ray Morgan Company LLC
Represented By: Timothy John Buchanan
Represented By: Nikole Elizabeth Cunningham
Represented By: William H. Littlewood
Represented By: Vincenza Rabenn
Represented By: Timothy L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canon Solutions America, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Walter Hammell
Represented By: JoLynn Markison
Represented By: David John Murphy
Represented By: Joel O O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?