Bruzzone v. Intel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bruzzone
Defendant: Intel Corporation, Evangelina Almiranterena, Steve Lund, Harley Stock, Andrew Grove, Advanced RISC Machines, Inc., Ian Drew, Yvonne Carey, Eric Shorn, Simon Segars and Ehab Youseff
Case Number: 3:2014cv01279
Filed: March 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 123 Motion for "Case Oversight Review". (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE PRE-FILING REVIEW OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF by Hon. William Alsup denying 118 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING THIRD MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE by Hon. William Alsup denying 109 Motion to Disqualify Judge.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/29/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/13/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/1/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER TO SHOW CASE RE MOTION TO DECLARE MR. BRUZZONE A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. Response due July 29, 2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 22, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
June 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 28, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION (DKT. NO. 37) re 37 MOTION filed by Michael A. Bruzzone Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 1, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruzzone v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bruzzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: William Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelina Almiranterena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced RISC Machines, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Affrunti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Drew
Represented By: Brian Michael Affrunti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Carey
Represented By: Brian Michael Affrunti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Shorn
Represented By: Brian Michael Affrunti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Segars
Represented By: Brian Michael Affrunti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehab Youseff
Represented By: Brian Michael Affrunti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?