Hernandez v. DMSI Staffing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Martin Hernandez
Defendant: DMSI Staffing, LLC and Ross Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01531
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 75 Stipulation filed by Martin Hernandez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/29/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/2/2016 to 12/1/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 12/17/15 to 6/2/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 39 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Further Case Management Conference filed by Martin Hernandez Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. DMSI Staffing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMSI Staffing, LLC
Represented By: David Brian Simpson
Represented By: Zoe J. Sussman
Represented By: Gregory Donald Wolflick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Stores, Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Simpson
Represented By: Zoe J. Sussman
Represented By: Gregory Donald Wolflick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Hernandez
Represented By: Neal Jordan Fialkow
Represented By: Sahag Majarian, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?