Adkins et al v. Apple Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Patricia Sue Adkins, Jennifer Galindo and Fabrienne English
Defendant: Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc and Apple CSC Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv01619
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2017 365 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 6/25/14; 9/10/14; 10/14/15; 2/09/16; 7/19/16; 12/14/16 before Judge WHO, (Court's Errata to MSJ Transcript) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 4/2/2017)
March 22, 2017 364 USCA Case Number 17-15493 for 363 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Fabrienne English. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 18, 2017 363 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Fabrienne English. Appeal of Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Recusal, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge 360 , MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT JUDGE WILLIAM H. ORRICK [28 U.S.C. §§ 455(a), (b)(1); 28 U.S.C. § 144] MOTION for Recusal of Judge Orrick MOTION to Disqualify Judge Orrick 345 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11243488 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/18/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2017: # 2 USCA NUMBER 17-15493) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2017 362 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 06/25/14; 09/10/14; 10/14/15; 02/09/16; 07/19/16; 12/14/16 before Judge WHO, re 346 Notice of Appeal, 347 Amended Notice of Appeal, (Court's Errata to MSJ Transcript 325 at 361 ) Transcript due by 4/10/2017. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 2, 2017 361 NOTICE OF ERRATA CORRECTING DECEMBER 14, 2016 HEARING TRANSCRIPT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 355 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 28, 2017 360 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 345 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 27, 2017 359 REPLY (re 355 MOTION to Amend/Correct 325 Transcript,,, 279 Transcript Order ) filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF RENEE KENNEDY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PARTIALLY UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CORRECT AND AMEND THE COURT REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF DECEMBER 14, 2016, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 27, 2017 358 REPLY (re 345 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT JUDGE WILLIAM H. ORRICK [28 U.S.C. §§ 455(a), (b)(1); 28 U.S.C. § 144] MOTION for Recusal of Judge Orrick MOTION to Disqualify Judge Orrick ) filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF RENEE KENNEDY IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT JUDGE WILLIAM H. ORRICK, # 2 Exhibit A)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 24, 2017 357 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 355 MOTION to Amend/Correct 325 Transcript,,, 279 Transcript Order ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 2 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 23, 2017 356 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 345 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT JUDGE WILLIAM H. ORRICK [28 U.S.C. §§ 455(a), (b)(1); 28 U.S.C. § 144] MOTION for Recusal of Judge Orrick MOTION to Disqualify Judge Orrick ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 21, 2017 355 MOTION to Amend/Correct 325 Transcript,,, 279 Transcript Order filed by Fabrienne English. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/7/2017. Replies due by 3/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF RENEE KENNEDY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PARTIALLY UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CORRECT AND AMEND THE COURT REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF DECEMBER 14, 2016, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 354 NOTICE of Change of Address by Renee Fagan Kennedy (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 353 RESPONSE to 288 Motion for Summary Judgment, [304-3] Opposition to Summary Judgment but now Redacted; Ex. G Original ECF [304-15] but now Redacted, Ex. N Original ECF [304-17] but now Redacted by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G Redacted, # 2 Exhibit N Redacted)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 16, 2017 352 CLERK'S NOTICE RE 339 ORDER - The Clerk will unseal the documents for which unredacted versions have already been provided: 304-4, 304-6, 304-7, 304-8, 304-15, 304-16, 304-18, and 304-21. No additional filings are required by counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 15, 2017 351 Proposed Order Re: 344 Opposition to Defendants' Costs by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 14, 2017 350 USCA Case Number 17-15251 for 347 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Fabrienne English, 346 Notice of Appeal filed by Fabrienne English. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 11, 2017 349 EXHIBITS re 348 Notice (Other) Correction of Docket # [348-2] filed byFabrienne English. (Related document(s) 348 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/11/2017)
February 11, 2017 348 NOTICE by Fabrienne English re 338 Bill of Costs also re 344 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 See Docket Number 349 for Correct Attachment Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/11/2017) Modified on 2/13/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2017 347 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Fabrienne English as to 336 Judgment . Appeal Record due by 2/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2017: # 2 USCA NUMBER 17-15251) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 346 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Fabrienne English. Appeal of Judgment 336 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11144684 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/9/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2017: # 2 USCA NUMBER 17-15251) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 345 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT JUDGE WILLIAM H. ORRICK [28 U.S.C. §§ 455(a), (b)(1); 28 U.S.C. § 144], MOTION for Recusal of Judge Orrick, MOTION to Disqualify Judge Orrick filed by Fabrienne English. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. Responses due by 2/24/2017. Replies due by 3/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF RENEE KENNEDY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT JUDGE WILLIAM H. ORRICK, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT COURT JUDGE WILLIAM H. ORRICK)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 8, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 344 MOTION Opposition to Bill of Costs re 338 Bill of Costs filed by Fabrienne English (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 8, 2017 344 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR COST; re 338 Bill of Costs filed by Fabrienne English. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/22/2017. Replies due by 3/8/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/8/2017) Modified on 2/9/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2017 343 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Clarification and Request that the Court Be the One to Unlock/Unseal re 342 Order, 339 Order, 334 Sealed Document, So Record is Not Unnecessarily Muddied for the Appellate Court by the Assignment of New ECF#'s to Exhibits Which Do Not Correlate with Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Fabrienne English. Responses due by 2/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 3, 2017 342 Featured Case ORDER CLARIFYING PRIOR SEALING ORDER re 334 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 3, 2017 341 EXHIBITS re 320 Reply to Opposition/Response, Exhibit D to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel ISO Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication, Re-Filed Pursuant to Court Orders (ECF Nos. 334, 339) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Related document(s) 320 ) (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 3, 2017 340 Brief re 320 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendants' Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication, Re-Filed Pursuant to Court Orders (ECF Nos. 334, 339) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Related document(s) 320 ) (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 27, 2017 339 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' SEALING REQUESTS re 334 Sealed Document and 337 Brief. The unredacted Order will be unsealed by the Court. The parties are directed to re-file unredacted versions of documents in accordance with the "Administrative Motions" portion of the 334 Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 25, 2017 338 BILL OF COSTS by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. Objections due by 2/8/2017 (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 18, 2017 337 Brief re 334 Sealed Document, 335 Order Dismissing Case, Defendants' Response to Order Denying Certain Sealing Requests filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 334 , 335 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 11, 2017 336 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/11/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 335 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION UNDER FRCP 56(d) AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/11/2017. (Redacted of confidential information.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 334 Featured Case UNDREDACTED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION UNDER FRCP 56(d) AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/11/2017. This document is restricted to case participants only. See 335 for order redacted of confidential information. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 333 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS IN THE "OPPOSED MOTION" AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE THE REQUESTS by Judge William H. Orrick re 329 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 330 Motion to Compel, and 331 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 9, 2017 332 ERRATA re 331 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Administrative Motion to: (1) Extend Time for Defendants to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Under L.R. 79-5(e) and (2) Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's "Motion to Compel" (ECF No. by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 6, 2017 331 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Administrative Motion to: (1) Extend Time for Defendants to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Under L.R. 79-5(e) and (2) Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's "Motion to Compel" (ECF No. 329) filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to: (1) Extend Time for Defendants to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Under L.R. 79-5(e) and (2) Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's "Motion to Compel" (ECF No. 329), # 2 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Administrative Motion to: (1) Extend Time for Defendants to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Under L.R. 79-5(e) and (2) Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's "Motion to Compel" (ECF No. 329))(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 5, 2017 330 MOTION to Compel , MOTION to compel disclosure, additional opposition to summary judgment briefing, and additional summary judgment hearing re 329 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposed Motion to Compel and Decl. ISO filed by Fabrienne English. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 1/19/2017. Replies due by 1/26/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 329 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposed Motion to Compel and Decl. ISO filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A placeholder, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Motion, # 5 Exhibit B placeholder, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Declaration)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 1, 2017 328 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12.14.16 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Fabrienne English, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 1/1/2017)
January 1, 2017 327 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 324 Motion Hearing, ), by Fabrienne English. Court will send to Renee Kennedy at reneekennedy.esq@gmail.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-11042209). (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 1/1/2017)
December 16, 2016 326 Minute Entry for settlement conference held on 12/16/2016 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case did not settle. FTR Time: Not Recorded Plaintiff Attorney: Renee KennedyDefendant Attorneys: Purvi Patel and Penelope Preovolos This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 325 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 14, 2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 323 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2017. (Related documents(s) 323 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 14, 2016 324 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2016 re 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. FTR Time 2:03-2:50. Plaintiff Attorney Renee Kennedy. Defendant Attorneys Purvi Patel and Maggie Mayo. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2016) Modified on 12/15/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2016 323 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/14/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 14, 2016 322 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - Proceedings set for 2:00 p.m. today (12/14/2016) will be conducted in Courtroom 12 on the 19th Floor.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
November 23, 2016 321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 320 REPLY (re 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi Patel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Declaration of Mitch Garbutt, # 9 Declaration of Christ Theodore Schaeffer)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pami Vyas, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Defendants MSJ Reply, # 4 Redacted Defendants MSJ Reply, # 5 Unredacted Exhibit D to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 6 Redacted Exhibit D to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 7 Unredacted Declaration of Mitch Garbutt, # 8 Redacted Declaration of Mitch Garbutt)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 21, 2016 318 Featured Case ORDER Denying Motion to Continue the Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: denying 317 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 19, 2016 317 OPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re 287 Order, Set Hearings , MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference filed by Fabrienne English. Responses due by 11/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Renee Kennedy ISO, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 11/19/2016) Modified on 11/21/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2016 316 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 315 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 16, 2016 315 EXHIBITS re 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEAL, DECLARATION AND ALSO LEAVE, OPPOSED IN PART AND UNOPPOSED IN PART, TO FILE BATHENA DIXONS CORRECTED DECLARATION, BRIAN DALRYMPLES DECLARATION (WITH, 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pami Vyas In Support of Sealing Portions of Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e), # 2 Exhibit Highlighted Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 304-3], # 3 Exhibit Highlighted Exhibit G to Kennedy Declaration [ECF No. 304-13], # 4 Exhibit Highlighted Exhibit N to Kennedy Declaration [ECF No. 304-17], # 5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 310 , 304 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 5, 2016 314 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Errata for [ECF 304 -3] Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Renee Kennedy ISO, # 2 Exhibit A (Notice of Errata), # 3 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 11/5/2016) Modified on 11/7/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2016 313 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEAL, DECLARATION AND ALSO LEAVE, OPPOSED IN PART AND UNOPPOSED IN PART, TO FILE BATHENA DIXONS CORRECTED DECLARATION, BRIAN DALRYMPLES DECLARATION (WITH ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Response, # 2 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 312 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 309 Unopposed Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Declaration in Support of Sealing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fabrienne English re 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEAL, DECLARATION AND ALSO LEAVE, OPPOSED IN PART AND UNOPPOSED IN PART, TO FILE BATHENA DIXONS CORRECTED DECLARATION, BRIAN DALRYMPLES DECLARATION (WITH (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 2, 2016 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEAL, DECLARATION AND ALSO LEAVE, OPPOSED IN PART AND UNOPPOSED IN PART, TO FILE BATHENA DIXONS CORRECTED DECLARATION, BRIAN DALRYMPLES DECLARATION (WITH EXHIBITS), AND EX. L ISO OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEAL, DECLARATION AND ALSO LEAVE, OPPOSED IN PART AND UNOPPOSED IN PART, TO FILE BATHENA DIXONS CORRECTED DECLARATION, BRIAN DALRYMPLES DECLARATION (WITH EXHIBITS), AND EX. L ISO OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 Exhibit A (REDACTED Bathena Dixon's Declaration), # 3 Exhibit A - Unredacted Bathena Dixon's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit L (Redacted Morrison's Deposition Excerpts), # 10 Exhibit L Undredacted Morrison's Deposition Excerpts, # 11 Proposed Order TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEAL, DECLARATION AND ALSO LEAVE, OPPOSED IN PART AND UNOPPOSED IN PART, TO FILE BATHENA DIXONS CORRECTED DECLARATION, BRIAN DALRYMPLES DECLARATION (WITH EXHIBITS), AND EX. L ISO OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 11/2/2016) Modified on 11/3/2016 to restrict 310-4 at counsel request (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2016 309 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Pursuant to L.R. 79-5(e) re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 308 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fabrienne English re 305 Opposition/Response to Motion, 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Summary Judgment and Exhibits (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 31, 2016 307 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TESTING OF THE IPHONE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 299 Administrative Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 306 EXHIBITS re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected for Higher Quality Resolution and Legibility filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Errata C Resolution better, # 2 Errata D Resolution better)(Related document(s) 304 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 29, 2016 305 RESPONSE (re 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byFabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/29/2016)
October 28, 2016 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Opposition to Summary Judgment, # 4 Declaration ISO Opposition, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B-1, # 7 Exhibit B-2, # 8 Exhibit B-3, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 27, 2016 303 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RENEE KENNEDY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NOTICE OF NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE; filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 301 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/27/2016) Modified on 10/31/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2016 302 RESPONSE (re 299 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re 298 Statement Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Testing of Plaintiff's iPhone and Guidance on a Testing Protocol, 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Response, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Response, # 3 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 24, 2016 301 Featured Case ORDER granting 293 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 24, 2016 300 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Orrick re 290 Motion for Extension of Time, 296 MOTION for Leave to File, 295 MOTION for Leave to File, and 293 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Declaration. Opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 10/28/2016. Reply due by 11/23/2016.(wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2016 299 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re 298 Statement Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Testing of Plaintiff's iPhone and Guidance on a Testing Protocol filed by Fabrienne English. Responses due by 10/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kennedy ISO, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/22/2016)
October 22, 2016 298 Statement REGARDING TESTING PLAINTIFFS IPHONE AND COURT GUIDANCE AS TO PROTOCOL by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/22/2016)
October 20, 2016 297 Letter from Parties / Joint Statement "Letter" REGARDING CERTAIN REQUESTS CONTAINED IN PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NO. 2 AND PLAINTIFFS [CORRECTED] REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NO. 5. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 19, 2016 296 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE JOHN R. PARKER, JR.'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S 290 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME AND FOR THE SUPPLEMENTAL 295 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND TESTING OF NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE; filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kennedy ISO, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/19/2016) Modified on 10/20/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2016 295 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion to Extend Tme to File an Opposoition Biref to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and to Allow Texting of Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/18/2016) Modified on 10/19/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2016 294 RESPONSE (re 293 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Granting Leave to File A Supplemental Declaration re 290 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF PURVI G. PATEL # 2 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 10/18/2016) Modified on 10/19/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2016 293 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Declaration re 290 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment Administrative Motion to Extend Time, 291 Proposed Order, 292 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Motion for Leave to File Supplementary Declaration and/or Notice of Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Fabrienne English. Responses due by 10/21/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kennedy Supplemental Decl, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B, # 4 Exhibit Ex. C, # 5 Exhibit Ex. D, # 6 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 14, 2016 292 RESPONSE (re 290 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment Administrative Motion to Extend Time ) DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN OPPOSITION BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF PURVI G. PATEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 Proposed Order DENYING PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN OPPOSITION BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 10, 2016 291 Proposed Order re 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 290 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment Administrative Motion to Extend Time Order to Extend Time by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/10/2016)
October 10, 2016 290 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment Administrative Motion to Extend Time filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kennedy Decl ISO, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/10/2016)
October 6, 2016 289 Statement JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED INTERROGATORIES SET SIX AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NUMBER SIX [CORRECTED] by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 23, 2016 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/24/2016. Replies due by 11/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Purvi G. Patel, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 287 NOTICE of Settlement and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 12/16/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 14, 2016 286 EXHIBITS re 285 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 13 N-1, Original Document ID (232-10) re 285 filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Related document(s) 285 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 8, 2016 Remark: documents unsealed - Order 285 . (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 7, 2016 285 Featured Case ORDER ON OUTSTANDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick re 232 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 31, 2016 284 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 29, 2016 283 Featured Case ORDER of USCA The court has received and reviewed petitioner's "motion for clarification, or in the alternative, reconsideration of the court's June 9, 2016" ("Motion"). Within 21 days after the date of this order, petitioner may resubmit in a separate filing the documents referenced in the Motion that she seeks to be publicly filed. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 15, 2016 282 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 07/19/16, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number 8584537590. Tape Number: FTR 2:35 - 2:53. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 279 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. (Related documents(s) 279 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 12, 2016 281 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 278 Administrative Motion. The Clerk shall reassign Maldonado v. Apple Inc., No. 16-cv-04067-NC (N.D. Cal. filed Jul. 20, 2016), to this Court. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 11, 2016 280 RESPONSE (re 278 Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Cases Not Be Related re 277 Proposed Order, 276 Notice (Other), ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 9, 2016 279 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/19/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Fabrienne English, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 8, 2016 278 Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Cases Not Be Related re 277 Proposed Order, 276 Notice (Other), filed by Fabrienne English. Responses due by 8/22/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO AMENDED NOTICE AND AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER TO RELATE AND REQUEST NOT TO RELATE, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 7, 2016 277 Proposed Order re 276 Notice (Other), And Admin Mot To Consider Whether Cases Should be Related and Request That They Not Be Found Related by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 8/7/2016)
August 7, 2016 276 NOTICE by Fabrienne English And Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related And Request that the Cases Be Found Not To Be Related (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kennedy ISO Notice and Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 8/7/2016)
July 21, 2016 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 19, 2016 275 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 7/19/2016. Motion schedule adopted. Case referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference after 9/23/2016. FTR Time 2:35-2:53. Plaintiff Attorney Renee Kennedy. Defendant Attorney Purvi Patel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2016)
June 28, 2016 274 CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephonic Case Management Conference rescheduled for 7/19/2016 02:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 20, 2016 273 CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 16, 2016 272 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 15, 2016 271 Featured Case ORDER of USCA Respondent's motion to seal the petition and its exhibits is granted. Respondent's request to seal petitioner's motion to withdraw and opposition to respondent's motion to seal, contained in respondent's reply is granted. The motion to withdraw petitioner's motion to seal (Docket Entry No.13) is granted. Petitioner's motion to seal (Docket Entry No. 2) is withdrawn. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district court's January 5, 2016 order denying class action certification. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016) Re 267 USCA NUMBER 16-80041
April 15, 2016 270 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. This matter is STAYED until plaintiff's petition is resolved by the Ninth Circuit, except with respect to the parties' efforts to resolve the discovery dispute discussed in the Joint Case Management Conference. The Case Management Conference scheduled for April 19, 2016 is VACATED. The parties shall notify Ms. Davis, Courtroom Deputy, as soon as the Ninth Circuit grants or denies plaintiff's petition, and shall file a Status Report within one week of the Ninth Circuit's action. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/15/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 269 Statement re 268 Case Management Statement Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement re Joint Case Management Statement by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 12, 2016 268 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 6, 2016 267 United States Court of Appeals Number 16-80041 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 265 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 265 EXHIBITS re 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Reconsideration Response to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pami Vyas, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit HIGHLIGHTED Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, # 4 Exhibit HIGHLIGHTED Kennedy Declaration Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit HIGHLIGHTED Kennedy Declaration Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 256 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 22, 2016 264 REPLY (re 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Reconsideration ) Reply to Defense Objections filed byFabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 22, 2016 263 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 233 Motion for Reconsideration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 262 CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b), the Court has decided that plaintiff's 233 Motion for Reconsideration is appropriate for determination without oral argument. Therefore, the hearing set for March 23, 2016 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 261 OBJECTIONS to re 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Reconsideration, 257 Declaration in Support,,,, Defendants' Objections to Reply Evidence Submitted With Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Motion for Reconsideration by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 18, 2016 260 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 259 Motion for Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Sealing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 17, 2016 259 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e) filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Margaret Mayo, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fabrienne English re 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Reconsideration (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 257 Declaration of Renee Kennedy In Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Redacted, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Redacted, # 4 Exhibit D (MFN), # 5 Exhibit E Redacted, # 6 Exhibit F-1 Redacted, # 7 Exhibit F-2 Redacted, # 8 Exhibit F-3 Redacted, # 9 Exhibit G Redacted, # 10 Exhibit H Redacted, # 11 Exhibit I Redacted, # 12 Exhibit J Redacted, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N-1 Redacted, # 17 Exhibit N-2 Redacted, # 18 Exhibit N-3 Redacted, # 19 Exhibit N-4 Redacted, # 20 Exhibit N-5 Redacted, # 21 Exhibit N-6 Redacted, # 22 Exhibit N-7, # 23 Exhibit N-8 Redacted, # 24 Exhibit N-9 Redacted, # 25 Exhibit N-10 Redacted, # 26 Exhibit N-11 Redacted, # 27 Exhibit N-12 Redacted, # 28 Exhibit N-13 Redacted, # 29 Exhibit N-14 Redacted, # 30 Exhibit N-15 Redacted, # 31 Exhibit O-1 Redacted, # 32 Exhibit O-2 Redacted, # 33 Exhibit O-3 Redacted, # 34 Exhibit O-4 Redacted, # 35 Exhibit P, # 36 Exhibit Q)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Reconsideration filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Renee Kennedy, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Reply Brief, # 4 Exhibit A Redacted, # 5 Exhibit A Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit C Redacted, # 7 Exhibit C Unredacted, # 8 Exhibit D - MFN, # 9 Exhibit E Redacted, # 10 Exhibit E Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit F-1 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit F-1 Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit F-2 Redacted, # 14 Exhibit F-2 Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit F-3 Redacted, # 16 Exhibit F-3 Unredacted, # 17 Exhibit G Redacted, # 18 Exhibit G Unredacted, # 19 Exhibit H Redacted, # 20 Exhibit H Unredacted, # 21 Exhibit I Redacted, # 22 Exhibit I Unredacted, # 23 Exhibit J Redacted, # 24 Exhibit J Unredacted, # 25 Exhibit N-1 Redacted, # 26 Exhibit N-1 Unredacted, # 27 Exhibit N-2 Redacted, # 28 Exhibit N-2 Unredacted, # 29 Exhibit N-3 Redacted, # 30 Exhibit N-3 Unredacted, # 31 Exhibit N-4 Redacted, # 32 Exhibit N-4 Unredacted, # 33 Exhibit N-5 Redacted, # 34 Exhibit N-5 Unredacted, # 35 Exhibit N-6 Redacted, # 36 Exhibit N-6 Unredacted, # 37 Exhibit N-8 Redacted, # 38 Exhibit N-8 Unredacted, # 39 Exhibit N-9 Redacted, # 40 Exhibit N-9 Unredacted, # 41 Exhibit N-10 Redacted, # 42 Exhibit N-10 Unredacted, # 43 Exhibit N-11 Redacted, # 44 Exhibit N-11 Unredacted, # 45 Exhibit N-12 Redacted, # 46 Exhibit N-12 Unredacted, # 47 Exhibit N-13 Redacted, # 48 Exhibit N-13 Unredacted, # 49 Exhibit N-14 Redacted, # 50 Exhibit N-14 Unredacted, # 51 Exhibit N-15 Redacted, # 52 Exhibit N-15 Unredacted, # 53 Exhibit O-1 Redacted, # 54 Exhibit O-1 Unredacted, # 55 Exhibit O-2 Redacted, # 56 Exhibit O-2 Unredacted, # 57 Exhibit O-3 Redacted, # 58 Exhibit O-3 Unredacted, # 59 Exhibit O-4 Redacted, # 60 Exhibit O-4 Unredacted)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 10, 2016 255 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 3, 2016 254 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 253 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 2, 2016 253 EXHIBITS re 232 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Certain Documents Under Seal filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pami Vyas, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Highlighted (232-10) Ex. 13 N-1, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted (232-12) Ex. 13 N-2, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Highlighted (232-22) Ex. 13 W)(Related document(s) 232 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 2, 2016 252 RESPONSE (re 233 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Fabrienne English on Behalf of Herself and All Others Similarly Situated ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 2 Exhibit A)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 24, 2016 251 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Fabrienne English. /Amended Certificate of Service [232-25] and per Order, Docket No. 248 . (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 24, 2016 250 EXHIBITS /Ex. 13A (Declaration of Laurel Pallock) to the Declaration of Renee Kennedy in Support of the Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [233-16] as per Order, Docket No. 248 filed byFabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 22, 2016 249 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 244 Motion for Leave to File An Errata Adding Call/Log Numbers. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 248 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 242 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Declaration of Laurel Pallock. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 20, 2016 247 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 02/09/16, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:16 - 2:25. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 246 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2016. (Related documents(s) 246 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2016)
February 17, 2016 246 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 245 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 244 MOTION for Leave to File An Errata Adding Call Log Numbers That Were Already Filed with Other Confidential Documents [Ex. 13AA] and Served on 2/9/16 [ECF 232-24] filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Renee Kennedy, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Order Supplemental)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 243 Featured Case ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 233 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs reply brief shall be filed by March 16, 2016. The maximum length of the reply brief is extended to 17.5 pages. The hearing on the reconsideration motion remains set for March 23, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. 241 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 242 MOTION for Leave to File /Administrative Motion for Leave to File Corrected Declaration of Lauren Pallock [Original ECF 233-16] and Amended Certificate of Service [Original ECF 232-25] filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Renee Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 15, 2016 241 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Page 104 to Linthicum Exhibit filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration And Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/15/2016)
February 15, 2016 240 Declaration of Renee Kennedy in Support of 238 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, 233 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Plaint filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 238 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/15/2016)
February 15, 2016 239 RESPONSE (re 238 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, 233 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Plaint ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File a Reply Brief and for an Increase of Page Length, # 2 Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File a Reply Brief and for an Increase of Page Length)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 2/15/2016)
February 13, 2016 238 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, 233 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Fabrienne English on Behalf of Herself and All Others Similarly Situated And Extension of Page Length filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/13/2016)
February 11, 2016 237 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 11, 2016 236 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 10/14/15, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 3:14 - 4:05. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 234 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2016. (Related documents(s) 234 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 9, 2016 235 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 2/9/2016. Briefing schedule set as to 233 Motion for Reconsideration: Response due by 3/2/2016. Reply due by 3/9/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. The trial date of August 15, 2016 and other deadlines are VACATED, pending the motion for reconsideration and possible appeal, and will be reset as appropriate. FTR Time 2:16-2:25. Plaintiff Attorney Renee Kennedy. Defendant Attorneys Purvi Patel and Maggie Mayo. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2016)
February 9, 2016 234 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 9, 2016 233 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Fabrienne English on Behalf of Herself and All Others Similarly Situated filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Renee Kennedy, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7 (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit 8 (REDACTED), # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11A, # 14 Exhibit 11B, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13A, # 17 Exhibit 13B, # 18 Exhibit 13C (REDACTED), # 19 Exhibit 13D, # 20 Exhibit 13E, # 21 Exhibit 13F, # 22 Exhibit 13G, # 23 Exhibit 13H, # 24 Exhibit 13I, # 25 Exhibit 13J, # 26 Exhibit 13K, # 27 Exhibit 13L, # 28 Exhibit 13M, # 29 Exhibit 13N-1 (REDACTED), # 30 Exhibit 13N-2 (REDACTED), # 31 Exhibit 13O, # 32 Exhibit 13P, # 33 Exhibit 13Q (REDACTED), # 34 Exhibit 13R (REDACTED), # 35 Exhibit 13S (REDACTED), # 36 Exhibit 13T (REDACTED), # 37 Exhibit 13U, # 38 Exhibit 13V, # 39 Exhibit 13W (REDACTED), # 40 Exhibit 13X, # 41 Exhibit 13Y-1, # 42 Exhibit 13Y-2, # 43 Exhibit 13Z, # 44 Exhibit 13AA (REDACTED))(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 9, 2016 232 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Renee Kennedy, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 7 (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit 7 (UNREDACTED), # 5 Exhibit 8 (REDACTED), # 6 Exhibit 8 (UNREDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 13C (REDACTED), # 8 Exhibit 13C (UNREDACTED), # 9 Exhibit 13N-1 (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit 13N-1 (UNREDACTED0, # 11 Exhibit 13N-2 (REDACTED0, # 12 Exhibit 13N-2 (UNREDACTED), # 13 Exhibit 13Q (REDACTED), # 14 Exhibit 13Q (UNREDACTED), # 15 Exhibit 13R (REDACTED), # 16 Exhibit 13R (UNREDACTED), # 17 Exhibit 13S (REDACTED), # 18 Exhibit 13S (UNREDACTED), # 19 Exhibit 13T (REDACTED), # 20 Exhibit 13T (UNREDACTED), # 21 Exhibit 13W (REDACTED), # 22 Exhibit 13W (UNREDACTED), # 23 Exhibit 13AA (REDACTED), # 24 Exhibit 13AA (UNREDACTED), # 25 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 5, 2016 231 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Renee Fagan Kennedy (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 2, 2016 230 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 25, 2016 229 NOTICE by Fabrienne English NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 21, 2016 227 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 5, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
January 5, 2016 226 Featured Case UNREDACTED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2016. (Restricted to case participants only.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016) Modified on 1/5/2016 to adjust security settings.
January 5, 2016 225 Featured Case REDACTED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William H. Orrick denying 181 Motion to Certify Class; addressing 208 , 211 , 213 , 214 , and 220 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal; and granting 217 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. A Case Management Conference is set for February 9, 2016 at 2 p.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement by February 2, 2016 proposing a schedule to address the remaining issues in this case. (NOTE: this order has been redacted of confidential information; an unredacted version of the order will be filed, but will be restricted to case participants only.)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2016: # 1 Main Document) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2015 224 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 223 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 19, 2015 223 DECLARATION OF PAMI VYAS IN SUPPORT OF SEALING PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLY PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5(e) - EXHIBITS re 214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification Declaration of Pami Vyas in Support of Sealing Portions of Plaintiff's Class Certification Reply Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Highlighted Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Highlighted Ex. 2, # 4 Sealed Ex. 3, # 5 Sealed Ex. 4, # 6 Sealed Ex. 5, # 7 Sealed Ex. 6, # 8 Highlighted Ex. 8-1, # 9 Sealed Ex. 8-2, # 10 Sealed Ex. 8-3, # 11 Highlighted Ex. 9-1, # 12 Sealed Ex. 9-2, # 13 Sealed Ex. 9-3, # 14 Sealed Ex. 9-4, # 15 Highlighted Ex. 10-1, # 16 Sealed Ex. 10-2, # 17 Sealed Ex. 10-3, # 18 Sealed Ex. 10-4, # 19 Highlighted Ex. 15, # 20 Highlighted Rebuttal to Pradeep Lall's Expert Report, # 21 Highlighted Declaration of Gabriel Tapia, # 22 Sealed Ex. to Tapia Declaration, # 23 Highlighted Corrected Ex. 8-1, # 24 Sealed Corrected Ex. 8-2, # 25 Sealed Corrected Ex. 8-3, # 26 Highlighted Corrected Ex. 9-1, # 27 Sealed Corrected Ex. 9-2, # 28 Sealed Corrected Ex. 9-3, # 29 Sealed Corrected Ex. 9-4, # 30 Sealed Corrected Ex. 9-5)(Related document(s) 214 , 220 , 213 , 211 ) (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 10/19/2015) Modified on 10/20/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 222 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2014 re 181 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. Court Reporter Name Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney Brooks Cutter, John Parker and Renee Kennedy. Defendant Attorney Penelope A. Preovolos, Purvi Patel, and Margaret Mayo. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2015)
October 13, 2015 221 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - The motion hearing scheduled for 2:00 p.m. 10/14/2015 will be in conducted in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 12, 2015 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (1 of4) to Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (2 of4) to Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (3 of4) to Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (4 of4) to Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of JRP ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 9 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER to Seal Documents, # 10 Motion For Leave to File Notice of Errata, # 11 Declaration Declaration of JRP ISO Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Notice of Errata, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of JRP ISO Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Notice of Errata, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Corrected to Exhibit A, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Corrected (1 of 4) to Exhibit A, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Corrected (2 of 4) to Exhibit A, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Corrected (3 of 4) to Exhibit A, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Corrected (4 of 4) to Exhibit A, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 Corrected to Exhibit A, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 20 Corrected to Exhibit A, # 20 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER Granting Leave to File, # 21 Response to Apple's Objection to Evidence)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/12/2015)
October 7, 2015 219 OBJECTIONS to re 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification, 214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 212 Reply to Opposition/Response,, Defendants' Objections to Reply Evidence Submitted with Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 218 ERRATA re 209 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Notice of Lodging of Corrected Exhibits X and Y to the Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit Y to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 217 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR 209 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' [Proposed] Surreply in Further Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Purvi G. Patel)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 10/7/2015) Modified on 10/8/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2015 216 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 215 Motion for Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Sealing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 215 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Portions of Plaintiff's Class Certification Reply filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Margaret Mayo, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 1, 2015 214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Rebuttal to Pradeep Lall's Report, # 2 Declaration of Gabriel Tapia, # 3 Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 11 Exhibit 8 (1 of 2) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 12 Exhibit 8 (2 of 2) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 13 Exhibit 9 (1 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 14 Exhibit 9 (2 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 15 Exhibit 9 (3 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 16 Exhibit 9 (4 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 17 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 18 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 19 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 20 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 21 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 22 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 23 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 24 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 25 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea, # 26 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Sea)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 9 Exhibit 9 (1 of 2) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 10 Exhibit 9 (2 of 2) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 11 Exhibit 10 (1 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 12 Exhibit 10 (2 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 13 Exhibit 10 (3 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 14 Exhibit 10 (4 of 4) to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 16 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 17 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 18 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 19 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 20 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 21 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 22 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 23 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of John R. Parker, Jr. ISO Motion for Class Certification)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 30, 2015 212 REPLY (re 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification ) Declaration of Renee Kennedy ISO of Motion for Class Certification filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: *** # 1 Declaration of Christian Tregillis ISO Motion for Class Certification DOCUMENTS LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENTS TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christian Tregillis ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Declaration of Fabrienne English ISO Motion for Class Certification)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John R. Parker ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification, # 4 C. Brooks Cutter Declaration, # 5 Exhibit to C. Brooks Cutter's Declarion)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 10, 2015 210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 9, 2015 209 RESPONSE (re 181 MOTION to Certify Class PLACEHOLDER ) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Declaration of Tara Ford, # 31 Declaration of Mitch Garbutt, # 32 Declaration of Jackie Healy, # 33 Exhibit A, # 34 Declaration of Michael Lanigan, # 35 Declaration Ferdinand Macariola, # 36 Declaration of Tim O'Neil, # 37 Exhibit A, # 38 Cox Report, # 39 Lall Report)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
September 9, 2015 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pami Vyas, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Opposition, # 4 Redacted Opposition, # 5 Unredacted Ex. B to Patel Declaration, # 6 Redacted Ex. B to Patel Declaration, # 7 Unredacted Ex. C to Patel Declaration, # 8 Redacted Ex. C to Patel Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Ex. E to Patel Declaration, # 10 Redacted Ex. E to Patel Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Ex. S to Patel Declaration, # 12 Unredacted Ex. U to Patel Declaration, # 13 Redacted Ex. U to Patel Declaration, # 14 Unredacted Ex. Z to Patel Declaration, # 15 Unredacted Garbutt Declaration, # 16 Redacted Garbutt Declaration, # 17 Unredacted Lanigan Declaration, # 18 Redacted Lanigan Declaration, # 19 Unredacted Macariola Declaration, # 20 Redacted Macariola Declaration, # 21 Unredacted O'Neil Declaration, # 22 Redacted O'Neil Declaration, # 23 Unredacted Ex. A O'Neil Declaration, # 24 Redacted Ex. A O'Neil Declaration, # 25 Unredacted Lall Report, # 26 Redacted Lall Report)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 31, 2015 207 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 14, 2015 206 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 205 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 13, 2015 205 EXHIBITS re 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto Revised Declaration of Pami Vyas filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 186-1, # 2 Exhibit Coversheet for ECF 186-1, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-8, # 4 Exhibit Coversheet for ECF 180-8, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-23, # 6 Exhibit Coversheet for ECF 180-23, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-31, # 8 Exhibit Coversheet for ECF 180-31, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 183-5, # 10 Exhibit Coversheet for ECF 183-5, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 183-6, # 12 Exhibit Coversheet for ECF 183-6)(Related document(s) 197 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 12, 2015 204 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 203 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Seth Wesley Wiener terminated. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 10, 2015 203 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Pro Hac Vice Sponsorship filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Renee Kennedy in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 6, 2015 202 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SEALING OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William H. Orrick re 180 , 182 , and 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 31, 2015 201 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Parker, Jr and C. Brooks Cutter (Parker, John) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 24, 2015 200 NOTICE by Fabrienne English re 196 Amended MOTION to Relate Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (McRight v Apple))(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 23, 2015 199 RESPONSE (re 196 Amended MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 21, 2015 198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 20, 2015 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 186-1, # 2 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-8, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-10, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-23, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-31, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 180-37, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 183-5, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted ECF 183-6, # 9 Declaration of Pami Vyas, # 10 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, # 11 Exhibit A to Patel Declaration, # 12 Exhibit B to Patel Declaration, # 13 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 196 Amended MOTION to Relate Case filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 19, 2015 195 MOTION to Relate Case pursuant to LR 3-12 & LR 7-11 filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/19/2015)
July 16, 2015 194 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 188 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file opposition to 181 MOTION to Certify Class. Response due by 9/9/2015. Reply due by 9/30/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 15, 2015 193 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS JULY 14, 2015 FILINGS re 189 , 190 , 191 [(re 188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's July 14, 2015 Filings, # 2 Proposed Order Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/15/2015) Modified on 7/16/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2015 192 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/11/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 3:00 p.m. - 3:07 p.m. = 7 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 14, 2015 191 ERRATA re 190 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 14, 2015 190 RESPONSE/Opposition in Part and Response in Support in Part (re 188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Renee Kennedy in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/14/2015) Modified on 7/15/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2015 189 EXHIBITS re 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Class Certification, 182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Motion to Seal Motion for Certification CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [180-6, 180-22] filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1 Pecht Report [was 180-6], # 2 Exhibit Exh 17 Allman Report [was 180-22])(Related document(s) 180 , 182 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 13, 2015 188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 10, 2015 187 EXHIBITS re 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Class Certification, 182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Motion to Seal Motion for Certification Errata re # [186-1] filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Errata to 186-1)(Related document(s) 180 , 182 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 9, 2015 186 EXHIBITS re 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Class Certification, 182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Motion to Seal Motion for Certification CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [180-3, 180-4] filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement)(Related document(s) 180 , 182 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 6, 2015 185 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 184 Motion for Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Filing Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 2, 2015 184 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Filing under Seal Pursuant to L.R. 79-5(e) filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Extend Time to File Declaration in Support of Filing under Seal Pursuant to L.R. 79-5(e), # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Extend Time to File Declaration in Support of Filing under Seal Pursuant to L.R. 79-5(e))(Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 2, 2015 183 EXHIBITS re 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Class Certification, 182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Motion to Seal Motion for Certification CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 180 Exhibits 6, 9, 15, 16, 19, 21 filed byFabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 180 , 182 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 2, 2015 182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Motion to Seal Motion for Certification filed by Fabrienne English. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 1, 2015 181 MOTION to Certify Class PLACEHOLDER filed by Fabrienne English. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/15/2015. Replies due by 7/22/2015. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
July 1, 2015 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Class Certification filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration re Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order re Motion to Seal, # 3 Supplement Motion for Cert Redacted, # 4 Supplement Motion for Cert Unredacted, # 5 Declaration re Motion for Cert Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit 1 unredacted, # 7 Exhibit 2 unredacted, # 8 Exhibit 3 unredacted, # 9 Exhibit 4 unredacted, # 10 Exhibit 5 unredacted, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 23, 2015 179 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 177 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 22, 2015 178 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 06/25/14, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:53 - 3:18. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 175 Transcript Order, 176 Transcript Order, 174 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (Related documents(s) 175 , 176 , 174 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
June 22, 2015 177 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (10 pages beyond the limit) filed by Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
June 20, 2015 176 ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/20/2015) Modified on 6/22/2015 (djc, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2015 175 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 174 ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/19/2015) Modified on 6/22/2015 (djc, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2015 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fabrienne English for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 16, 2015 172 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 16, 2015 171 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Renee Fagan Kennedy on behalf of Thomas J. Brandi and (Brandi Law Firm) Terence D. Edwards, Brian J. Malloy, and Jason B. Friedman (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 16, 2015 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Fagan Kennedy on behalf of Peter Kafin (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 11, 2015 169 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 6/11/2015. The issue in docket no. 157 is resolved. ***The hearing was held under seal but the transcript may be released to counsel present at the hearing.***(FTR Time 3:00-3:07- Sealed) Plaintiff Attorney: Renee Kennedy via Court Call Defendant Attorneys: Penelope Preovolos; Purvi Patel via Court CallThis is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 168 Sealed Transcript of the official sound recording Proceedings held on 06/02/15, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 1:36 - 2:09. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2015. (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 9, 2015 167 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Discovery Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for June 11, 2015 at 3:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. Ms. Kennedy may appear by telephone and shall contact the courtroom deputy at 1-415-522-2015 to provide a contact number. Ms. Kennedys experts does not need to appear. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 8, 2015 166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 4, 2015 165 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE OVER RULE 30(b)(6) WITNESSES by Judge William H. Orrick (Re: Dkt. Nos. 159, 160). (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 2, 2015 164 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 6/2/2015. Parties to submit in-camera documents to chambers by June 5, 2015. The Court will then schedule a further hearing. ***The hearing was held under seal but the transcript may be released to counsel present at the hearing.***(FTR Time 1:36-2:09- Sealed) Plaintiff Attorney: Renee Kennedy (Megan Zazieh & Harry Potter, advisors to Ms. Kennedy were also present) Defendant Attorneys: Penelope Preovolos; Purvi Patel; Paami Vyas. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2015)
June 1, 2015 163 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steven Richard Weinmann (Weinmann, Steven) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Fagan Kennedy for Thomas J. Brandi and The Brandi Law Firm (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 29, 2015 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc re 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 160 Statement Joint Statement Regarding Witnesses Provided as to "Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Deposition of Person Most Qualified of Apple, Inc. Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6)" [Redacted] by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Patel Declaration, # 2 Vyas Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 (Redacted) Joint Statement, # 5 (Unredacted) Joint Statement)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 158 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Telephone Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a telephone conference is set for June 2, 2015 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Parties shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Limited Purpose of dispute resolution. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 28, 2015 157 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERENCE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE - This case is to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Corley for purposes of resolving the dispute submitted in camera on May 21, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/28/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
April 10, 2015 156 FURTHER RULINGS REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2015 as to discovery dispute. Court Reporter: n/a. Plaintiff Attorneys Penelope Preovolos, Purvi Patel, and Margaret Mayo. Defendant Attorney Renee Kennedy. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2015)
April 9, 2015 154 TENTATIVE RULING REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 149 Order, 152 Supplemental Brief, 153 Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/09/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 7, 2015 153 Supplemental Brief re 149 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Plaintiff's Brief Re FRCP 30(b)(6) Depositions and Scope of Discovery filed byFabrienne English. (Related document(s) 149 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 7, 2015 152 Supplemental Brief re 148 Statement, 149 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 148 , 149 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 6, 2015 151 Answer to Amended Complaint 139 Amended Complaint, Third Amended Class Action Complaint byApple CSC Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 150 Answer to Amended Complaint 139 Amended Complaint, Third Amended Class Action Complaint byApple Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 1, 2015 149 Featured Case ORDER ON 148 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION - On or before April 7, 2015, each party shall submit a brief of no more than ten pages, double-spaced, addressing the disputes over the 30(b)(6) topics. I am particularly interested in how the withdrawal of former class representative Karen Lowthert impacts the appropriate scope of discovery in this case, if at all. A telephone hearing on this matter is set for 4/10/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 4/1/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 27, 2015 148 Statement Regarding "Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Depositon of Person Most Qualified of Apple, Inc. Fed.R.Civ.P.30(B)(6)" by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 24, 2015 147 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES re 140 Response and 142 Response. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 20, 2015 146 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Mark Philip Meuser CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 145 (Meuser, Mark) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 20, 2015 145 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Mark Philip Meuser (Meuser, Mark) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 144 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Karen Lowthert filed by Fabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 17, 2015 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Richard Weinmann (Weinmann, Steven) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 142 RESPONSE to re 140 Response ( Non Motion ) to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief regarding Discovery Disputes by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 10, 2015 141 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES - Defendants shall file a responsive brief of no more than five pages, double spaced by noon March 17, 2015, to plaintiffs' 140 Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 9, 2015 140 RESPONSE to re 138 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief to Joint Letter by Fabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 139 AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byKaren Lowthert, Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Venue Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit B - AC+ T&Cs, # 3 Exhibit C - APP T&Cs, # 4 Exhibit D - Repair T&Cs, # 5 Exhibit E - English Receipt, # 6 Exhibit F - Adkins Affidavit, # 7 Exhibit G - Lowthert Receipt)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 2, 2015 138 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PARTIES' JOINT STATEMENT ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 129 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint on or before March 6, 2015. Defendants shall have 30 days from the date the third amended complaint is filed to respond. The hearing on plaintiffs' motion set for March 11, 2015 is VACATED. No later than noon (Pacific Standard Time) on March 9, 2015, plaintiffs may file a supplemental brief of no more than five pages, double spaced, to the 136 Joint Statement that explains why any of the disputed discovery is necessary for plaintiffs' class certification motion. Defendants shall not reply. After review of the supplemental briefing, the Court will determine if further briefing or a hearing is required. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 17, 2015 137 REPLY (re 129 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byFabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of R Kennedy in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 136 Letter from the Parties Regarding Certain Requests Contained in Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 2 and Plaintiffs' [Corrected] Request for Production No. 5. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 13, 2015 135 RESPONSE (re 129 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 9, 2015 134 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR STAY OF DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 133 Declaration of Renee Kennedy in Support of 129 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 130 filed byFabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 5, 2015 Set Deadlines as to 129 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Responses due by 2/17/2015. Replies due by 2/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Deadlines omitted from filer's docketing entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 117 Exhibits, 116 Amended Document filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion for Stay of Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 3, 2015 131 Proposed Order re 129 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Fabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 3, 2015 130 SEE DOCKET NUMBER 133 FOR CORRECTED E-FILING Declaration of Renee Kennedy in Support of 129 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2015 129 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Fabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 28, 2015 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Philip Meuser (Meuser, Mark) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 27, 2015 127 Featured Case AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OFDISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 126 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Pozderac's deposition is rescheduled from January 30, 2015 to March 2, 2015. The parties shall otherwise follow the proposed deposition schedule set out in 122 Apple's letter. Apple shall identify the specific names of its 30(b)(6) witnesses, and the specific dates of their depositions, as soon as that information is available and no later than 10 days before the depositions. If the parties are not able to resolve the dispute over certain training materials and other documents relevant to Pozderac's deposition on their own, they shall submit a joint letter by February 17, 2015 specifically describing the dispute and their respective positions. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 125 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 23, 2015 124 Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 123 Letter from Plaintiffs Regarding Deposition Schedule . (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 122 Letter from Defendants Regarding Deposition Schedule. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 121 Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 20, 2015 120 Featured Case ORDER re 118 Letter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/20/2015. The parties will finish meeting and conferring and either file a Stipulated Protective Order or separate proposed protective orders by January 23, 2015. Defendants shall respond to the outstanding document requests on or before February 3, 2015 and shall produce the documents described on page 5 of the Joint Letter, as well as such other documents that they have identified and can reasonably produce by that date. Agreed upon depositions shall be completed by March 31, 2015. If the parties are unable to stipulate to the dates for these depositions by January 23, 2015,the Court will set the dates. The parties shall review the Guidelines for Professional Conduct for this Court on the Courts website. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 1/20/2015. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding agreed upon deponents and to set a schedule for depositions by January 23, 2015 which will allow all the agreed upon depositions to be completed by March 31, 2015. Defense should produce to plaintiffs by February 3, 2015 those documents responsive to requests for production which were outlined in the joint letter. If there are trailing disagreements as to documents to be produced, the parties may address these in a joint letter to be filed by February 17, 2015. By January 23, 2015 the parties should submit a stipulated protective order for the Court's approval. Court Reporter: n/a. Plaintiff Attorney Renee Kennedy. Defendant Attorneys Purvi Patel and Penelope Preovolos. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 118 Letter from the Parties Joint Letter Regarding Case Management. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 17, 2015 117 EXHIBITS re 116 Amended Document Exhibit I Lowthert Receipt filed byFabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Related document(s) 116 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 1/17/2015)
January 17, 2015 116 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; by Fabrienne English, Karen Lowthert. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 1/17/2015) Modified on 1/20/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 115 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, REQUIRING MEET AND CONFER AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Plaintiff's 110 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint is granted. Defendants shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to respond. The hearing date of January 21, 2015 is VACATED. Parties to file a joint letter of not more than five pages in ECF describing the agreements reached on the discovery issues and any competing proposals regarding discovery matters to which the parties have been unable to agree by 1/20/2015. Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Last day to amend the complaint is 2/3/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/14/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
December 31, 2014 114 Declaration of Renee Kennedy in Support of 110 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [110-2] filed byPatricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Related document(s) 110 ) (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 28, 2014 113 REPLY (re 110 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byPatricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of R Kennedy in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 12/28/2014)
December 19, 2014 112 RESPONSE (re 110 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Purvi Patel in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 9, 2014 111 CLERK'S NOTICE - Setting Deadlines and Hearing as to 110 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Responses due by 12/22/2014. Replies due by 12/29/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 8, 2014 110 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Renee Kennedy in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order Order Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
November 18, 2014 109 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 107 , 108 Statements. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2014. Plaintiffs' request for an order compelling defendants to produce ESI in native format is DENIED. Defendants may produce the requested ESI in the form proposed in their individual statement. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 18, 2014 108 Statement re 106 Order,, Plaintiffs' Individual Statement re ESI Discovery Dispute by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 17, 2014 107 Statement re 106 Order,, Individual Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute Regarding Format of Electronic Discovery by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 13, 2014 106 Featured Case ORDER re 105 Letter. Plaintiffs' request for an immediate telephone conference is DENIED. By November 17, 2014, pursuant to the Standing Order, the parties are ordered to submit to the court a concise joint statement of five pages or less, stating the nature and status of their discovery dispute, and certifying that they have met the meet-and-confer requirement. If a joint statement is not possible, each side may submit a brief individual statement of two pages or less, certifying compliance with the meet-and-confer requirement and explaining why a joint statement was not possible. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/13/201. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 12, 2014 105 Letter from Plaintiffs regarding Defendants' Production Urgently Requesting Telephone Conference with the Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
October 28, 2014 104 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 09/10/14, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc./Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:07 - 2:23. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 102 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2015. (Related documents(s) 102 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 24, 2014 103 Featured Case CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 23, 2014 102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
September 15, 2014 101 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' 82 MOTION TO IDENTIFY CLASS MEMBERS by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 11, 2014 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Mayo (Mayo, Margaret) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 10, 2014 99 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re 88 Amended Opposed Motion to Identify Class Members held on 9/10/2014 before William H. Orrick. Discovery cut-off: 1/8/2016. Dispositive motions and Daubert motions to be heard by 5/18/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2016 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/15/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Court Reporter FTR 2:07-2:32) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2014)
September 5, 2014 98 NOTICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc of Withdrawal of Attorney (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 4, 2014 97 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' 96 Statement Regarding Defendants' Proposed Motion for Leave to File a Surreply by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 96 Statement re 88 Amended MOTION Opposed Motion to Identify Class Members re 83 Notice (Other), 81 First MOTION Identify Class Members , 82 Pretrial Memorandum , 90 Opposition/Response to Motion, 93 Reply to Opposition/Response,, Defendants' Unauthorized and Opposed Motion for Leave to file Surreply by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 3, 2014 95 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 29, 2014 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 19, 2014 93 REPLY (re 88 Amended MOTION Opposed Motion to Identify Class Members re 83 Notice (Other), 81 First MOTION Identify Class Members , 82 Pretrial Memorandum ) filed byPatricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Adkins Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B iPhone News Article, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Apple Press Info, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D CashCall Order, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E Proposed Notice - Short Version)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 13, 2014 92 CLERKS NOTICE - Case Management Conference and Hearing as to 88 Amended MOTION to Identify Class Members rescheduled for 9/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Proceedings set for 9/3/2014 VACATED.) This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 91 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of 90 Opposition/Response to Motion, To Identify Class Members filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 90 RESPONSE (re 88 Amended MOTION Opposed Motion to Identify Class Members re 83 Notice (Other), 81 First MOTION Identify Class Members , 82 Pretrial Memorandum ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 29, 2014 89 Statement re 83 Notice (Other), 88 Amended MOTION Opposed Motion to Identify Class Members re 83 Notice (Other), 81 First MOTION Identify Class Members , 82 Pretrial Memorandum , 81 First MOTION Identify Class Members , 82 Pretrial Memorandum Plaintiffs' Statement to the Court Regarding Alleged Discovery Dispute by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 88 Amended MOTION Opposed Motion to Identify Class Members re 83 Notice (Other), 81 First MOTION Identify Class Members , 82 Pretrial Memorandum filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/12/2014. Replies due by 8/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 23, 2014 87 Answer to Amended Complaint 38 Amended Complaint, byApple CSC Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 23, 2014 86 Answer to 38 First Amended Complaint byApple Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/27/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER granting 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/23/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 21, 2014 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 80 Declaration in Support, 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference (Amended Stipulation) filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 83 NOTICE by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo of Proposed Letter to Class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Letter, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Letter)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 82 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM in Support of 81 Motion to Identify Class Members by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/21/2014) Modified on 7/27/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2014 81 First MOTION Identify Class Members filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/4/2014. Replies due by 8/11/2014. (Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 18, 2014 80 Declaration of Penelope A. Preovolos in Support of 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 3, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 68 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AND DENYING IN PART by Hon. William H. Orrick. Plaintiffs' second, third, and eighth causes of action are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs' sixth cause of action is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND as to plaintiffs Adkins and Galindo, but survives as to plaintiff English. Paragraphs 24, 25, 25b, 31, 66, 66a, 66b, 66c, and 66d are STRUCK from the first amended complaint. Apple's 69 request for judicial notice is GRANTED. Apple shall file an answer to the remaining causes of action and paragraphs of plaintiffs' first amended complaint by July 23, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 25, 2014 77 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2014 before William H. Orrick re 68 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. (Court Reporter FTR 2:53-3:18.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2014)
June 11, 2014 76 REPLY (re 68 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 25, 2014 75 RESPONSE (re 68 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byPatricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 5/25/2014)
May 9, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 68 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. Response due by 5/28/2014. Reply due by 6/11/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 73 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 5, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Renee Kennedy.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 1, 2014 71 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Renee Kennedy, lead counsel ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8582880.) filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kennedy, Renee) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2014 70 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of 68 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Related document(s) 68 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 69 Request for Judicial Notice re 68 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 68 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/14/2014. Replies due by 5/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 67 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to PlaintiffsFirst Amended Complaint on or before April 30, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 16, 2014 66 NOTICE by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc of Withdrawal of Attorneys (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 14, 2014 65 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/14/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on April 14, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 11, 2014 63 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 62 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY NO. 62, PLEASE GO TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 63 INSTEAD CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014) Modified on 4/11/2014 (igS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2014 61 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel in Support of 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed byApple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Related document(s) 60 ) (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 59 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc.. (Patel, Purvi) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 58 CLERKS NOTICE re transfer of case (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 9, 2014 57 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2014 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 56 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 3:13-cv-00402. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 4/11/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 4/3/2014, filed. (glyons, 4)
April 3, 2014 55 Featured Case ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE granting 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
March 31, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Motion to Transfer Venue. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
March 31, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
March 28, 2014 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to 49 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply, filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi)
March 23, 2014 51 SURREPLY to 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit D English Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit E wired.com article, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F Statesman article, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit G Apple Facilities Report, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit H Business Info Form, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit I Economic Development Agrmnt, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit J Economic Growth Summary, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit K WebLOCI, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit L Council Mtg Transcript, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit M CNN Money article, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit N Ordinance, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit O TX Busn Enterprise Fund Appl)(Kennedy, Renee)
March 23, 2014 50 PROPOSED ORDER re: 49 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply, filed.(Kennedy, Renee)
March 22, 2014 49 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2014. (Kennedy, Renee)
February 25, 2014 48 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/4/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. (bthomas, 4)
February 19, 2014 47 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 3/7/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. (bthomas, 4)
February 14, 2014 46 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed.(Patel, Purvi)
February 14, 2014 45 REPLY in Support of 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, filed by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Authorities)(Patel, Purvi)
February 12, 2014 44 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Renee)
February 12, 2014 43 STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' UNAUTHORIZED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss , 38 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix of Authorities)(Jahann, Sai)
February 10, 2014 42 PROPOSED ORDER denying Defendants' Motion to Transfer re: 41 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(Kennedy, Renee)
February 10, 2014 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Adkins Affidavit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Adkins Affidavit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Galindo Affidavit)(Kennedy, Renee)
February 10, 2014 40 PROPOSED ORDER denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: 39 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(Kennedy, Renee)
February 10, 2014 39 RESPONSE in Opposition to 34 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo. (Attachments: # 1 continued, part 2 of 6, # 2 continued, part 3 of 6, # 3 continued, part 4 of 6, # 4 continued, part 5 of 6, # 5 continued, part 6 of 6)(jdav, 4)
February 10, 2014 38 AMENDED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Jennifer Galindo, Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 exhibit C, # 4 exhibit D, # 5 exhibit E, # 6 exhibit F, # 7 exhibit G, # 8 exhibit H)(jdav, 4)
January 7, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond; Motion-related deadline set. (Responses due by 2/10/2014) re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 6, 2014 36 PROPOSED ORDER re: 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue, filed.(Kennedy, Renee)
January 6, 2014 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2014. (Kennedy, Renee)
December 23, 2013 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1, # 2 Appendix Exhibit 2)(Patel, Purvi)
December 23, 2013 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Appendix Exhibit 4)(Patel, Purvi)
December 5, 2013 32 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 29, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sai Jahann for Apple Inc., Applecare Service Company, and Apple CSC Inc..(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 29, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Penelope Preovolos for Applecare Service Company, Apple Inc., and Apple CSC Inc.. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 29, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Purvi Patel for Apple Inc. AppleCare Service Company, and Apple CSC Inc.. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 25, 2013 28 MOTION for Sai Jahann to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2013. (Patel, Purvi)
November 25, 2013 27 MOTION for to Appear, MOTION for Penelope A. Preovolos to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Motion Docket Date 12/16/2013.) by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed. (Patel, Purvi)
November 25, 2013 26 MOTION for Purvi G. Patel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2013. (Patel, Purvi)
November 25, 2013 25 Letter, filed by all plaintiffs. (olindor, 4) Modified on 11/25/2013 (olindor, 4).
November 21, 2013 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed.(Kennedy, Renee)
November 21, 2013 23 Filed in error. Correct document filed at entry 24. CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Patricia Sue Adkins, filed.(Kennedy, Renee)
November 21, 2013 22 NOTICE of Change of Address by Renee Kennedy, counsel for Jennifer Galindo, filed. (Kennedy, Renee)
November 21, 2013 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Renee Kennedy, counsel for Fabrienne English, filed. (Kennedy, Renee)
November 21, 2013 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Renee Kennedy, counsel for Patricia Sue Adkins, filed. (Kennedy, Renee)
November 20, 2013 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed.(Trent, Thomas)
November 18, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Apple CSC Inc 12/23/2013; Apple Inc 12/23/2013; Applecare Service Company Inc 12/23/2013.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 18, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice to re-urging after the scheduling conference 2 Motion to Certify Class.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 15, 2013 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple CSC Inc identifying Apple Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Allen, Benjamin)
November 15, 2013 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Applecare Service Company Inc identifying Apple Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Allen, Benjamin)
November 15, 2013 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc, filed.(Allen, Benjamin)
November 15, 2013 13 PROPOSED ORDER re: 12 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, filed.(Trent, Thomas)
November 15, 2013 12 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by Apple CSC Inc, Apple Inc, Applecare Service Company Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2013. (Trent, Thomas)
November 12, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion for Renee Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 7, 2013 10 RETURN of Service Executed as to Renee Kennedy on 11/6/13, filed. (rnieto, 1)
November 7, 2013 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo on 11/5/2013 re: Summons, Complaint, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
November 5, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/21/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Attachments: # 1 Judge's Procedure) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 5, 2013 7 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Parties notified, filed. (ccarnew, 3)
November 5, 2013 6 Featured Case RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Gregg Costa recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(ccarnew, 3)
November 4, 2013 5 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re: 2 MOTION to Certify Class by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(lusmith, 3)
November 4, 2013 4 NOTICE Of Correction of Defendant's Name re: 1 Complaint, by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed. (lusmith, 3)
November 4, 2013 3 MOTION for Renee Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2013. (ltrevino, 3)
November 4, 2013 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
November 4, 2013 Filing Filing fee: $400.00 re: 1 Complaint,, receipt number GAL001901, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
November 4, 2013 2 MOTION to Certify Class by Patricia Sue Adkins, Fabrienne English, Jennifer Galindo, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2013. (ltrevino, 3)
November 4, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Patricia Sue Adkins, Jennifer Galindo, Fabrienne English. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(ltrevino, 3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2013: # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ltrevino, 3). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/13/2013) (ltrevino, 3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins et al v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Sue Adkins
Represented By: Renee Fagan Kennedy
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Galindo
Represented By: Renee Fagan Kennedy
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabrienne English
Represented By: Renee Fagan Kennedy
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Sai Jahann
Represented By: Purvi Govindlal Patel
Represented By: Penelope A Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applecare Service Company Inc
Represented By: Sai Jahann
Represented By: Purvi Govindlal Patel
Represented By: Penelope A Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple CSC Inc
Represented By: Sai Jahann
Represented By: Purvi Govindlal Patel
Represented By: Penelope A Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?