Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Douglas Built Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Douglas Built Construction, Inc. and Joel Douglas
Case Number: 3:2014cv01692
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 60 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/8/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S LETTER BY 3/2/15. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. Attorneys Corey J. Cabral and Jeffery Owensby terminated. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (#27 in 3:14-cv-01694-EMC) and (#35 in 3:14-cv-01692-EMC) TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/28/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Douglas Built Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Built Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?