Glazier v. Bay Area Credit Services, LLC.

Plaintiff: Ron Glazier
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Services, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01703
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ron Glazier. Signed by Maria-Elena James on 1/29/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
December 15, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO VACATE DEADLINES PENDING SETTLEMENT. DISMISSAL OR STATUS REPORT SHALL BE FILED BY 2/17/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/15/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
July 11, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 7/31/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/11/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glazier v. Bay Area Credit Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Glazier
Represented By: Timothy Allen Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?