Cywee Group LTD v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Cywee Group LTD
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01853
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cywee Group LTD. Apple Inc. served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. Proof of Service of Summons (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cywee Group LTD identifying Other Affiliate SBCVC F-II, Other Affiliate SBCVC F-II, Other Affiliate Annex L.P, Other Affiliate Zhou Ye for Cywee Group LTD. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8556570.). Filed byCywee Group LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cywee Group LTD v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin George Damstedt
Represented By: Neil Nalin Desai
Represented By: Timothy S. Teter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cywee Group LTD
Represented By: Alfonso Garcia Chan
Represented By: Jill Fawn Kopeikin
Represented By: Valerie Margo Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?