Henderson v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: |
Johndell Henderson |
Defendant: |
A. Hedgpeth, R. Grounds, V.J. Solis, B. Hendricks, W. Muniz, E. Moore, M. Moore, C. Hernandez, J. Young and M. Herra |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01857 |
Filed: |
April 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
Monterey |
Presiding Judge: |
PSLC MSH |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon S. Tigar |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 16, 2019 |
Filing
157
Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case settled. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 10/16/2019. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
|
August 8, 2019 |
Filing
148
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY CASE SCHEDULE DEADLINES / TO ORDER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
|
February 13, 2019 |
Filing
138
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 136 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue the Case Schedule filed by W. L. Muniz, Jared D. Lozano, Carolyn Hernandez, M. Hodges. Fact-Discovery Cut Off 6/7/2019. Expert Disclosures & Expert Reports Due 6/28 /2019. Expert-Discovery Cut Off 7/26/2019. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures & Rebuttal Reports Due 8/30/2019. Summary-Judgment Deadline 10/25/2019. Pretrial Conference StatementDue 1/24/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 2:00 PM in Oaklan d, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Trial set for 2/24/2020 at 8:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
|
December 4, 2018 |
Filing
132
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY OR RESCIND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
|
December 3, 2018 |
Filing
131
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 130 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Case Schedule filed by Johndell Henderson. Close of fact discovery 3/1/2019. Expert disclosures and opening expert reports due 3/15/2019. Rebuttal expert disclosures and rebuttal reports due 3/29/2019. Close of expert discovery 4/12/2019. Deadline for summary-judgment motions 5/3/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 3, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
|
May 30, 2018 |
Filing
125
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by W. L. Muniz, Carolyn Hernandez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
|
April 26, 2018 |
Filing
120
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 119 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference 21 Days, to 05/30/2018 filed by Johndell Henderson Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?