Schock vs City of Lafayette
Plaintiff: Michael Schock
Defendant: City of Lafayette, County of Contra Costa, Eric Christensen, Steve Harrison and Michael Marshall
Case Number: 3:2014cv01902
Filed: April 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. EXTENDING STAY Re 40 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STAYING ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SAME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schock vs City of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schock
Represented By: Adam Michael Carlson
Represented By: Stan Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?