Ham v. Hain Celestial Group, Inc.

Defendant: Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ana Belen Ham
Case Number: 3:2014cv02044
Filed: May 2, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/30/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
June 20, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re 61 Status Report filed by Hain Celestial Group, Inc. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
December 10, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, as modified, 58 STIPULATION TO STAY CASE. Status Report due by 6/10/2016 and every six months thereafter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/10/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
October 6, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 STIPULATION to extend deadlines re: 51 MOTION for Class Certification. Response due by 11/30/2015. Reply due by 12/11/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/6/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
March 31, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/31/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
October 24, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 3, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 25 MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING PARTIES' REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Hon. William H. Orrick. Ham's breach of contract (sixth) and quasi-contract/unjust enrichment (eighth) causes of action and request for injunctive relief are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Ham's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND to the extent that they are based on alleged misrepresentations on Hain's Facebook or www.earthbest.com websites. Hain's motion to dismiss Ham's FAL (first), CLRA (second), fraud (third), negligent misrepresentation (fourth), breach of express warranty (fifth), and UCL (seventh) causes of action is DENIED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ham v. Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Belen Ham
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?