Rodriguez v. City of Alameda et al

Plaintiff: Michael Rodriguez
Defendant: City of Alameda and Cameron Miele
Case Number: 3:2014cv02075
Filed: May 6, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause be dismissed with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, with proof of service of a copy to opposing counsel, within ninety (90) days from the da te of this order, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/12/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
August 31, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 43 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Stipulation regarding new trial date to be filed on or before 09/07/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
May 11, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing trial, pretrial conference, and motion hearing dates. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/30/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2016 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing re: 43 Defendants' motion for summary judgment set for 6/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/11/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
March 8, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL ONE WEEK. Jury Selection/Trial reset for 7/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/07/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
July 28, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION AND REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beeler for Settlement. Discovery due by 3/28/2016. Jury Selection/Trial set for 7/12/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated 5-6 days. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/27/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
December 16, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Time to Complete ENE and Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/15/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
July 21, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. City of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alameda
Represented By: Alan M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Miele
Represented By: Alan M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rodriguez
Represented By: John E. Hill
Represented By: Daniel Alvin Stenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?