Willams v. Quality Loan Services Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen C. Willams
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corp., Chase Bank/JP Morgan, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 3:2014cv02228
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER EXCUSING PERSONAL ATTENDANCE, see 68 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/17/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 28 USC SECTION 1915 WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended complaint shall be filed within 45 days. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 17, 2014. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/29/2014 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/18/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willams v. Quality Loan Services Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen C. Willams
Represented By: Stephan C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank/JP Morgan, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?