Corral v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Esperanza Corral
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U.S. Bank
Case Number: 3:2014cv02251
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 referral to determine whether cases are related. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/1/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/13/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/31/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. Second Amended Complaint due 8/28/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/1/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING FINAL DEADLINE FOR OPPOSITION: Response must be e-filed by 7/2/2014 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/1/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/3/2014 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/19/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corral v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Corral
Represented By: Anthony George Graham
Represented By: Michael Joseph Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bao M Vu
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Represented By: Bao M Vu
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?