MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.
Defendant: Apple Inc
Mediator: David Folsom
Case Number: 3:2014cv02300
Filed: May 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Filing 39 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. re 34 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Proof of Service of Documents (Jagai, Deborah) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp... (Huff, Winston) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE: re Advising Counsel of Receipt of Action from the Eastern District of Texas. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 34 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:13-cv-00518. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Change Venue. It is therefore ORDERED that the above-styled cause of action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/21/14. (mrm, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. re 26 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Notice of Compliance (Huff, Winston)
December 20, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. [Notice of Service of Paragraph 1 of Initial Disclosures] (Rahebi, Bita)
December 15, 2013 Filing 29 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Winston Oliver Huff, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Winston Oliver Huff, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Winston Oliver Huff)(Huff, Winston)
December 5, 2013 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Rahebi, Bita)
November 25, 2013 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2014., Complete Expert Discovery due by 1/19/2015., Expert Witness List due by 1/9/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 11/19/2013., Markman Hearing set for 9/29/2014 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 3/9/2015., Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2013., Jury Selection set for 4/13/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2015 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/13. (ehs, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/13. (ehs, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/13. (ehs, )
November 12, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Alex S. Yap in Support of Motion to Transfer, # 2 Affidavit of Andrew Bright in Support of Motion to Transfer, # 3 Affidavit of Mark Buckley in Support of Motion to Transfer, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer)(Rahebi, Bita)
November 12, 2013 Filing 22 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Huff, Winston)
November 12, 2013 Filing 21 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling Order by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Huff, Winston)
November 12, 2013 Filing 20 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Huff, Winston)
November 5, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom, filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Huff, Winston)
October 29, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/13. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
October 29, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/13. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (jml)
October 29, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Apple Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
October 10, 2013 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/9/2013. (ch, )
October 1, 2013 Filing 16 ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp..(Huff, Winston)
October 1, 2013 NOTICE that document #15 was filed in error per attorney for by Apple Inc., Please ignore (ehs, )
October 1, 2013 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY please ignore*** ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp..(Huff, Winston) Modified on 10/1/2013 (ehs, ).
September 26, 2013 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple Inc.. (Rahebi, Bita)
September 26, 2013 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita)
September 26, 2013 Filing 12 APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. by Apple Inc..(Rahebi, Bita)
August 19, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alex S Yap on behalf of Apple Inc. (Yap, Alex)
August 19, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bita Rahebi on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita)
August 19, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Belusko on behalf of Apple Inc. (Belusko, Vincent)
August 14, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. Apple Inc. served on 8/6/2013, answer due 9/26/2013. (ehs, )
August 14, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 9/26/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 13, 2013 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
July 31, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, )
June 24, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 24, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
June 21, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah Jagai on behalf of MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Jagai, Deborah)
June 21, 2013 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Huff, Winston)
June 21, 2013 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Huff, Winston)
June 21, 2013 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Huff, Winston)
June 21, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4192904.), filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Huff, Winston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2013: # 3 CORRECTED) (ch, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.
Represented By: Lewis Emery Hudnell, III
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Represented By: Deborah Jagai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Vincent J. Belusko
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr.
Represented By: Bita Rahebi
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Alex S. Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?