Huricks et al v. Shopkick, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zak Huricks and Trista Robinson
Defendant: Shopkick, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02464
Filed: May 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER AFFORDING PARTIES LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The parties shall file, no later than August 7, 2015, and not to exceed ten pages in length, their respective additional supplemental briefs. The hearing on defendant's motion for summary judgment is continued to August 21, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL RE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.With respect to Exhibit B to the Declaration of George Edwards, the motion is granted. With res pect to the other material, the Court defers ruling thereon in order to afford defendant the opportunity to file, no later than June 12, 2015, a supplemental declaration or other response. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 5, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The hearing on defendant's motion for summary judgment is continued from June 12, 2015 to July 17, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 2, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY OR EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION; EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING HEARING. T he deadline for plaintiffs to file a motion for class certification is extended from April 17, 2015 to July 17, 2015. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 17, 2015, to October 23, 2015, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than October 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 9, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY CLASS COUNSEL AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 24, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 22, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huricks et al v. Shopkick, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zak Huricks
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trista Robinson
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shopkick, Inc.
Represented By: Brian David Buckley
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Represented By: Sean Steven Wikner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?