York -v- Bank of America, et al

Plaintiff: Willie York
Defendant: Bank Of America and Champion Mortgage Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv02471
Filed: May 29, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2018 253 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 251 of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/7/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
March 13, 2018 237 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 236 for the Court to Retain Jurisdiction for Limited Purposes of Enforcing Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/13/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
October 23, 2017 223 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 222 to Extend Discovery Cut-Off. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
September 21, 2017 221 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 220 TO CONTINUE OCTOBER 12, 2017 HEARING ON THE DEFENDANTS RESPECTIVE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ASSOCIATED BRIEFING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/21/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
December 2, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING SURETY BONDING COMPANY OF AMERICAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/2/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
October 5, 2016 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 157 Defendant Surety Bonding Company of America's Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 12, 2016 163 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CORRESPONDING ADR, DISCOVERY AND MOTION DEADLINES. Jury Selection/Trial previously set for 2/27/2017 Continued to 9/11/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richar d Seeborg. Pretrial Conference previously set for 2/9/2017 Continued to 8/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
August 8, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/8/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 3, 2016 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/3/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
June 29, 2016 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend date of mediation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
March 17, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor. Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
February 2, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING BANK OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/2/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
October 20, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
June 8, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
October 20, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CONSOLIDATING HEARINGS. Defendant Champion's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint will now be heard on 11/20/2014 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/20/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014) Modified on 10/20/2014 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/20/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/7/2014 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 23, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 17, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/1/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 5, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/5/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 3, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/30/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 29, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/29/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York -v- Bank of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie York
Represented By: Shirley Hochhausen
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Represented By: Kathleen Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Mortgage Company
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?