Andersen et al v. Griswold International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Jenkins, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, The KPeters Group, South Bay Care, LLC, Holly Anderson, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Ken Peters, Mark Andersen, Kerry Peters, Michael Geisler, Michael McKaig, M & E Family Care, LLC, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., Thelen Enterprise, Inc., Hinders Home Care Inc., Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, Charlayne Redmon, CS Family Ventures Inc., Dwayne Redmon, James Thelen, James J. Carlson, Barry Howland, Dave Hinders and Wade Luders
Defendant: Thomas Monaghan, Michael Magid, Graham Weihmiller, Griswold International, LLC, Diane Walker, Greg Bast and Patrick Spaan
Case Number: 3:2014cv02560
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2016 Filing 85 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 5/19/2016) Modified on 5/20/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting Motion to Amend Case Management and Pretrial Order signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #83 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 83 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management and Pretrial Order filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. Responses due by 11/20/2015. Replies due by 11/27/2015. (Bass, Ronald) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
September 9, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Gina Marie Fornario in place of Cameron R. Cloar (Fornario, Gina) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 81 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint by Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 4/20/2015) Modified on 4/21/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #61 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Defendants' motion for leave to file a sur-reply #67 is denied as moot. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting Stipulated Protective Order Governing the Confidentiality of Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #78 Stipulation (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER GOVERNING THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY filed by Griswold International, LLC, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: denying #58 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Re Plaintiffs' 3/24/15 Letter #74 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Court will consider the Ninth Circuit's decision in Picot v. Weston, but not the analysis contained in Plaintiffs' letter. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 75 Joint Discovery Letter BriefPursuant to Docket #70 filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 74 Letter from Michael Garner to Judge LaPorte regarding the pending motion of Defendants to dismiss Graham Weihmiller. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 73 Letter from W. Michael Garner to Judge Elizabeth D. LaPorte pursuant to Docket # 70. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 72 AMENDED ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint by Griswold International, LLC. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 3/11/2015) Modified on 3/12/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting Defendant Griswold International, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #69 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/10/2015 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding Defendants' motion to dismiss #58 and Plaintiffs' motion to compel #61 . The Court takes the motion to dismiss under submission. Counsel to meet and confer regarding the motion to compel and file a joint update of no more than 10 pages by 3/17/2015. FTR Time 9:52 - 10:10 Plaintiff Attorney: W. Michael Garner Defendant Attorneys: Arthur Pressman and Cameron Cloar This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [UNOPPOSED] filed by Griswold International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint)(Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 68 RESPONSE (re #67 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to File a Sur-Reply filed byMark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed by Griswold International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply)(Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 66 REPLY (re #61 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories; Memornadum in Support Thereof ) Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed byMark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 20, 2015 Filing 65 RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories; Memornadum in Support Thereof ) filed byGriswold International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arthur L. Pressman in Support)(Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #60 Motion.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time ) filed byGriswold International, LLC. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 13, 2015 Filing 62 REPLY (re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Stay Discovery Pending its Resolution ) filed byGriswold International, LLC, Graham Weihmiller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [AMENDED])(Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories; Memornadum in Support Thereof filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 2/20/2015. Replies due by 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of W. Michael Garner, #2 Proposed Order)(Garner, W.) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, W.) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 6, 2015 Filing 59 RESPONSE (re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Stay Discovery Pending its Resolution ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Stay filed byMark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Garner, W.) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
January 23, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Stay Discovery Pending its Resolution filed by Griswold International, LLC, Graham Weihmiller. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 2/6/2015. Replies due by 2/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron Cloar in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 Filing 57 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint byGriswold International, LLC. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 1/23/2015) Modified on 1/26/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2015 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Griswold International, LLC, Graham Weihmiller. Filed byBarry Howland, The KPeters Group, Michael Geisler, Thelen Enterprise, Inc., South Bay Care, LLC, Holly Anderson, Charlayne Redmon, Mark Andersen, Michael McKaig, Dwayne Redmon, Wade Luders, James Thelen, James Carlson LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Dave Hinders, Gigi Howland, Kerry Peters, M & E Family Care, LLC, James J. Carlson, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Hinders Home Care Inc., Ken Peters, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Garner, W.) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part #25 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying #46 Defendants' Motion to Sever. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
November 12, 2014 Filing 54 Letter from W. Michael Garner to Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte pursuant to Doc. #53. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (Date Filed: 11/5/2014). (Recording #9:19 - 9:45.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 52 REPLY (re #46 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byGreg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 51 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byGreg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 10/17/2014. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 48 RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims filed byMark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Garner, W.) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 46 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 10/8/2014. Replies due by 10/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (Date Filed: 9/24/2014). Jury Trial shall begin 12/5/2016 at 08:30 AM and the Pretrial Conference is set for 11/8/2016 at 02:00 PM (Recording #10:49 - 11:01.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller re #40 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the September 23, 2014 Further Case Management Conference and Order NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 43 RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byMark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Claims Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REVISED filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the September 23, 2014 Further Case Management Conference and Order filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Granting #38 Plaintiffs' request to appear telephonically at the 9/23/14 Case Management Conference signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Plaintiffs' Request to Appear Telephonically at the September 23, 2014 Further Case Management Conference and Order filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 37 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/2/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (Date Filed: 9/4/2014). Updated Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #10:19-10:37.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Initial Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Garner, W.) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #32 joint motion to extend the briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to dismiss signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER adopting the parties' stipulation selecting ADR process signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Extend the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 9/2/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller.. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #26 Application to Appear Telephonically by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #24 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #23 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Plaintiffs' Request To Appear Telephonically At The September 2, 2014 Case Management Conference And Order filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 8/27/2014. Replies due by 9/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron Cloar, #2 Exhibit A-C to Declaration of Cameron Cloar, #3 Proposed Order)(Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Arthur Pressman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8840275.) filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Eric Walz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8826549.) Filing fee previously paid on 08-06-2014 filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #2 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #3 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #4 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #5 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #6 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #7 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #8 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #9 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #10 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #11 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #12 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #13 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #14 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #15 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #16 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #17 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #18 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #19 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #20 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #21 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #22 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #23 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #24 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #25 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel, #26 ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel)(Garner, W.) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 19 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Eric Walz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8826549.) filed by Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 8/6/2014) Modified on 8/7/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2014 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by August 15, 2014. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this entry. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 17 STIPULATION [JOINT] FOR ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND EXTENSION OF DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (Cloar, Cameron) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. Griswold International, LLC served on 6/12/14 by serving Michael Magid. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Patrick Spaan, filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. Griswold International, LLC served on 6/12/14 by serving Diane Walker. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Thomas Monaghan on 6/12/14, filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Graham Weihmiller on 6/12/14, filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. (Garner, W.) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Graham Weihmiller on 6/24/14, filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. . (Garner, W.) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. Griswold International, LLC served on 6/12/14.(Garner, W.) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc... (Bass, Ronald) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8677760.) filed by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certiificate of Good Standing)(Garner, W.) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Andersen, Holly Anderson, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc., James J. Carlson, Michael Geisler, Dave Hinders, Hinders Home Care Inc., Barry Howland, Gigi Howland, James Carlson LLC, Christopher Jenkins, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Wade Luders, M & E Family Care, LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Michael McKaig, Ken Peters, Kerry Peters, Charlayne Redmon, Dwayne Redmon, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson, South Bay Care, LLC, The KPeters Group, James Thelen, Thelen Enterprise, Inc. identifying Corporate affiliate HHC Investors, LLC for plaintiffs. (Bass, Ronald) (Filed on 6/4/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Greg Bast, Griswold International, LLC, Michael Magid, Thomas Monaghan, Patrick Spaan, Diane Walker, Graham Weihmiller. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2014 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bass, Ronald) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8666144.). Filed byBarry Howland, The KPeters Group, Michael Geisler, Thelen Enterprise, Inc., South Bay Care, LLC, Holly Anderson, Charlayne Redmon, Mark Andersen, Michael McKaig, Dwayne Redmon, Wade Luders, Christopher Jenkins, James Thelen, James Carlson LLC, MHA Family Holdings, Inc., Dave Hinders, Gigi Howland, Kerry Peters, CS Family Ventures Inc., CSAB Management, Inc, M & E Family Care, LLC, James J. Carlson, Ledgewood Enterprises Inc., Hinders Home Care Inc., Ken Peters, Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bass, Ronald) (Filed on 6/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen et al v. Griswold International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Jenkins
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigi Howland
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carlson LLC
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The KPeters Group
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Bay Care, LLC
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Anderson
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MHA Family Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Peters
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Andersen
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Peters
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Geisler
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McKaig
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M & E Family Care, LLC
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledgewood Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSAB Management, Inc.
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelen Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hinders Home Care Inc.
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn N. Roach-Carlson
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlayne Redmon
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CS Family Ventures Inc.
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Redmon
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thelen
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Carlson
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Howland
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Hinders
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Luders
Represented By: Janice Seyoung Yi
Represented By: Sandra Levine Benabou
Represented By: Ronald B. Bass
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Monaghan
Represented By: Cameron Robert Cloar
Represented By: Gregory E. Schopf, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J Walz,
Represented By: Arthur L. Pressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Magid
Represented By: Cameron Robert Cloar
Represented By: Gregory E. Schopf, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J Walz,
Represented By: Arthur L. Pressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Weihmiller
Represented By: Cameron Robert Cloar
Represented By: Gregory E. Schopf, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J Walz,
Represented By: Gina Marie Fornario
Represented By: Arthur L. Pressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griswold International, LLC
Represented By: Cameron Robert Cloar
Represented By: Gregory E. Schopf, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J Walz,
Represented By: Gina Marie Fornario
Represented By: Arthur L. Pressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Walker
Represented By: Cameron Robert Cloar
Represented By: Gregory E. Schopf, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J Walz,
Represented By: Arthur L. Pressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bast
Represented By: Cameron Robert Cloar
Represented By: Gregory E. Schopf, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J Walz,
Represented By: Arthur L. Pressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Spaan
Represented By: Cameron Robert Cloar
Represented By: Gregory E. Schopf, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J Walz,
Represented By: Arthur L. Pressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?