Quine v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Rodney James Quine
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Grounds, J. Walker, P. Didbal and L. D. Zamora
Case Number: 3:2014cv02726
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Referring Judge: PSLC MSH
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 150 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
July 12, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule for Motion to Intervene and Brief in Support of Writ of Mandate filed by S. Pajong, M.D., D. Bright, J. Dunlap, J. Walker, Scott Kernan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
May 22, 2017 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 118 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Briefing Deadlines Regarding Motion for Writ of Mandate and Declaratory Injunctive Relief filed by Rodney James Quine. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 22, 2017. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
April 28, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO ENFORCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
March 23, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 98 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement Regarding Resetting Hearing Date filed by Rodney James Quine. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
October 11, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by S. Pajong, M.D., D. Bright, J. Dunlap, CDCR, J. Walker, Scott Kernan. Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
June 9, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Implementation of Settlement. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/9/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 24, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 68 Letter filed by Rodney James Quine. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 20, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE JOINT LETTER BRIEF re 64 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 20, 2016. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
December 29, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CORRESPONDENCE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2015: # 1 Letter) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CORRESPONDENCE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2015: # 1 Letter) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery Deadlines; Request for Referral to Magistrate Judge Vadas for Settlement Conference filed by S. Pajong, M.D., D. Bright, J. Dunlap, Jeffrey Beard. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 4, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Rule 35 Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff filed by S. Pajong, M.D., D. Bright, J. Dunlap, Jeffrey Beard, J. Lewis. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 4, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
February 25, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Bench Trial set for 1/4/2016 - 1/20/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 10, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 16 Amended Complaint, 17 Order of Service; Stipulation Regarding Defendants Named in First Amended Complaint filed by S. Pajong, M.D., D. Bright, J. Dunlap, Jeffrey Beard, J. Lewis. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
December 19, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING MARSHAL TO SERVE PROCESS re 16 Amended Complaint filed by Rodney James Quine. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quine v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney James Quine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Didbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?