Flenoid v. Statebridge Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: La Juana B. Flenoid
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., Fay Servicing, LLC and Statebridge Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv02729
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 56 Application to Appear Telephonically by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. may appear by telephone at the September 23, 2014 hearing.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted [FRCP 12(b)(6)] filed by Statebridge Company, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/28/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The ADR Unit will notify the parties of the date and time the telephone conference will be held. After the telephone conference, the ADR Unit will advise the Court of its recommendation for further ADR proceedings (see order for further details). (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flenoid v. Statebridge Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Crutchfield Chapman
Represented By: Starlet Joy Japp
Represented By: Tanya C. McCullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statebridge Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Juana B. Flenoid
Represented By: Anton Abramyan
Represented By: Romel Ambarchyan
Represented By: Arda Artinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?