Johnstech International Corp. v. JF Technology Berhad et al
Plaintiff: Johnstech International Corp.
Defendant: JF Technology Berhad, JF Microtechnology SDN BHD and JFoong Technologies SDN BHD
Case Number: 3:2014cv02864
Filed: June 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER RE DAMAGES AND ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/6/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER RE 267 RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW; NEW TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/8/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge James Donato re 180 and 199 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PROPOSED INITIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/12/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/9/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 128 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 141 Motion for Sanctions. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge James Donato re 113 , 116 , 117 , 131 , 144 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order by Hon. James Donato re 96 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/17/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Judge James Donato granting 57 defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and granting in part and denying in part 30 defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order granting 64 Stipulation to Extend Time to Complete Mediation. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnstech International Corp. v. JF Technology Berhad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnstech International Corp.
Represented By: Lael D. Andara
Represented By: Courtland Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JF Technology Berhad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JF Microtechnology SDN BHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFoong Technologies SDN BHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?