DataQuill Limited v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: DataQuill Limited
Defendant: Apple Inc
Special_master: Karl Bayer
Case Number: 3:2014cv02975
Filed: June 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0100
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2014 Filing 93 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Consent/Declination Form) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 92 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 91 Stipulation Regarding the Confidentiality of Certain Discovery.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Confidentiality of Certain Discovery filed by Apple Inc. (Gross, Gabriel) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of Plaintiff Dataquill Limited (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 89 CLERKS NOTICE acknowledging receipt of transferred action; copy mailed to non e-filers. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 88 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 87 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:13-cv-00706. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 48 Motion to Transfer Case; DENYING 61 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ESI STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
June 6, 2014 Filing 83 STIPULATION ESI STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Apple Inc.. (Gross, Gabriel)
June 2, 2014 Filing 82 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on March 3, 2014, Proceedings Transcribed: Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/23/2014, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2014, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014, (Reznik, Lily)
June 2, 2014 Filing 81 Sealed Transcript filed (This transcript is not available electronically) (Reznik, Lily)
May 20, 2014 Filing 80 Sealed Notice Regarding Suppliers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Declaration) (dm)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 78 Motion for Leave to File Notice Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
May 19, 2014 Filing 78 Motion for leave to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Notice Regarding Suppliers and Supporting Materials (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Exhibit A - Apple Inc.'s Notice Regarding Suppliers, # 2 Sealed Document Exhibit B - Exhibit 1 to Apple Inc.'s Notice Regarding Suppliers, # 3 Sealed Document Exhibit C - Declaration of Gabriel S. Gross In Support of Apple Inc.'s Notice Regarding Suppliers, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal) (Albright, Alan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE by DataQuill Limited (Larson, Blaine)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Regarding Apple "Suppliers". Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
May 2, 2014 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2014 re 61 Sealed Motion filed filed by DataQuill Limited, 48 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Apple Inc. Motions taken under advisement, written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm)
May 2, 2014 Filing 74 Sealed Reply in Support of Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4) (dm)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING 72 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
May 1, 2014 Filing 72 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Reply In Support of Motion, # 3 Declaration of Andres Healy, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4) (Healy, Andres)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING 68 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 3. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 66 Motion for Leave to File Certain Portions of Apple's Reply Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 28, 2014 Filing 68 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 Supporting Apple's Opposition to Dataquill's Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order) (Albright, Alan)
April 28, 2014 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re 61 Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff DataQuill Limited (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Gabriel S. Gross (Gross Decl.), # 2 Exhibit 1 to Gross Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Gross Decl., # 4 Exhibit 4 to Gross Decl., # 5 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2014: # 6 Sealed Exhibit, # 7 Sealed Exhibit) (dm).
April 28, 2014 Filing 66 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order) (Albright, Alan)
April 28, 2014 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re 48 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Gabriel S. Gross (2nd Gross Decl.), # 2 Exhibit 3 to 2nd Gross Decl., # 3 Exhibit 4 to 2nd Gross Decl., # 4 Exhibit 5 to 2nd Gross Decl.)(Albright, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2014: # 5 Sealed Exhibit A, # 6 Sealed Exhibit B, # 7 Sealed Exhibit C, # 8 Sealed Exhibit D) (dm).
April 28, 2014 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 49 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Portions of the Declaration of Mark Buckley Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for 48 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California ( Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2014 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks,). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 23, 2014 Filing 61 Sealed Motion to Compel by Dataquill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17) (dm)
April 23, 2014 Filing 60 Sealed Opposition and Response to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34) (dm)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 57 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Compel Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 56 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 21, 2014 Filing 57 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Motion to Compel Under Seal(Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document, # 3 Sealed Document, # 4 Sealed Document, # 5 Sealed Document, # 6 Sealed Document, # 7 Sealed Document, # 8 Sealed Document, # 9 Sealed Document, # 10 Sealed Document, # 11 Sealed Document, # 12 Sealed Document, # 13 Sealed Document, # 14 Sealed Document, # 15 Sealed Document, # 16 Sealed Document, # 17 Sealed Document, # 18 Sealed Document, # 19 Sealed Document, # 20 Sealed Document, # 21 Sealed Document) (Healy, Andres)
April 21, 2014 Filing 56 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Under Seal its Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document, # 3 Sealed Document, # 4 Sealed Document, # 5 Sealed Document, # 6 Sealed Document, # 7 Sealed Document, # 8 Sealed Document, # 9 Sealed Document, # 10 Sealed Document, # 11 Sealed Document, # 12 Sealed Document, # 13 Sealed Document, # 14 Sealed Document, # 15 Sealed Document, # 16 Sealed Document, # 17 Sealed Document, # 18 Sealed Document, # 19 Sealed Document, # 20 Sealed Document, # 21 Sealed Document, # 22 Sealed Document, # 23 Sealed Document, # 24 Sealed Document, # 25 Sealed Document, # 26 Sealed Document, # 27 Sealed Document, # 28 Sealed Document, # 29 Sealed Document, # 30 Sealed Document, # 31 Sealed Document, # 32 Sealed Document, # 33 Sealed Document, # 34 Sealed Document, # 35 Sealed Document, # 36 Sealed Document, # 37 Sealed Document) (Payne, Leslie)
April 14, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alan D Albright. (jk)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER, Technical Tutorial Hearing set for 10/29/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks, Markman Hearing set for 10/30/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk)
March 26, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 48 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California Stipulated by DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Healy, Andres)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Blaine A. Larson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
March 24, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan J. Davis for Blaine A. Larson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6343796) by on behalf of DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Nathan)
March 20, 2014 Filing 49 Motion for leave to File Certain Portions of the Declaration of Mark Buckley Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) (Albright, Alan)
March 20, 2014 Filing 48 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mark Buckley, # 2 Affidavit of Gabriel S. Gross, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Gross Decl., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Gross Decl., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Gross Decl., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Gross Decl., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Gross Decl., # 8 Exhibit 6 to Gross Decl., # 9 Exhibit 7 to Gross Decl., # 10 Exhibit 8 to Gross Decl., # 11 Exhibit 9 to Gross Decl., # 12 Exhibit 10 to Gross Decl., # 13 Exhibit 11 to Gross Decl., # 14 Exhibit 12 to Gross Decl., # 15 Exhibit 13 to Gross Decl., # 16 Exhibit 14 to Gross Decl., # 17 Exhibit 15 to Gross Decl., # 18 Exhibit 16 to Gross Decl., # 19 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2014: # 20 Sealed Exhibit A) (dm).
March 20, 2014 Filing 47 Proposed Scheduling Order re Claim Construction by Apple Inc.. (Albright, Alan)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER appointing Special Master Karl Bayer. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall submit an agreed Markman scheduling order within FIFTEEN DAYS (15) of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
March 3, 2014 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Scheduling Conference held on 3/3/2014 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm)
February 24, 2014 Filing 44 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by DataQuill Limited. (Folse, Parker)
February 24, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(f) by DataQuill Limited (Folse, Parker)
February 17, 2014 Filing 42 ANSWER to 39 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DataQuill Limited.(Folse, Parker)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks,). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
February 3, 2014 Filing 40 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Gross, Gabriel)
February 3, 2014 Filing 39 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against DataQuill Limited by Apple Inc..(Gross, Gabriel)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dale Chang. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy J. O'Brien. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Philip X. Wang. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michelle R. Ma. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew John Moore. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gabriel Simeone Gross. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas Ethan Lumish. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam M. Greenfield. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
January 10, 2014 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Dale Chang ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6151434) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 10, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Timothy O'Brien ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6150882) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 10, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Philip Wang ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6150867) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 10, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Michelle Ma ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6150855) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 10, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Matthew Moore ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6150840) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 10, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Gabriel Gross ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6150827) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 10, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Douglas Lumish ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6150799) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 10, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct , MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Adam Greenfield ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6150699) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, ; Apple Inc. answer due 2/3/2014. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
December 28, 2013 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Folse, Parker)
December 12, 2013 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECTUED by DataQuill Limited 3 Summons Issued (Healy, Andres) Modified on 12/12/2013 (dm).
December 12, 2013 Set Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 1/2/2014. (dm)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED that plaintiff shall file proof of service with the Clerk of this Court on or before December 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Leslie V. Payne. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Andres Healy. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Floyd G. Short. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Parker C. Folse III. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk)
August 21, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph S. Grinstein for Floyd G. Short ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5785767) by on behalf of DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
August 21, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph S. Grinstein for Andres Healy ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5785737) by on behalf of DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
August 20, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph S. Grinstein (filing fee $25 receipt number 0542-5783457) for Parker C. Folse, III on behalf of DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph) Modified on 8/20/2013 (dm).
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Allan Bullwinkel. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan J. Davis. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
August 20, 2013 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DataQuill Limited. (Wilson, Douglas)
August 19, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie V. Payne ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5780352) by on behalf of DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Payne, Leslie)
August 19, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan J. Davis ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5778053) by on behalf of DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Nathan)
August 19, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas R. Wilson for Robert Allan Bullwinkel ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5778025) by on behalf of DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Douglas)
August 16, 2013 Filing 5 Letters regarding admission status of Parker Folse III, Leslie Payne, Nathan J. Davis and Robert Allan Bullwinkel. (dm)
August 16, 2013 Filing 4 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dm)
August 16, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (dm)
August 16, 2013 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DataQuill Limited. (Wilson, Douglas)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-5774656), filed by DataQuill Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5-1, # 6 Exhibit 5-2, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Douglas)
August 16, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DataQuill Limited v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DataQuill Limited
Represented By: Robert Allan Bullwinkel
Represented By: Nathan J. Davis
Represented By: Parker C. Folse, III
Represented By: Joseph S. Grinstein
Represented By: Andres Healy
Represented By: Michael F. Heim
Represented By: Blaine A. Larson
Represented By: Leslie V. Payne
Represented By: Marc M. Seltzer
Represented By: Floyd G Short
Represented By: Douglas R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Alan D. Albright
Represented By: Dale Chang
Represented By: Adam Michael Greenfield
Represented By: Gabriel S. Gross
Represented By: Gabriel Simeone Gross
Represented By: Douglas Ethan Lumish
Represented By: Michelle R Ma
Represented By: Matthew Moore
Represented By: Timothy James O'Brien
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Karl Bayer
Represented By: Karl O. Bayer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?